Neville v. McCaghren

Plaintiff: Robert Neville
Defendant: Elizabeth C. McCaghren
Case Number: 6:2017cv00075
Filed: May 17, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Georgia
Office: Statesboro Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: J. Randal Hall
Presiding Judge: G. R. Smith
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 83 ORDER finding the fees sought by Ms. Cox and Mr. Lavoie to be reasonable in both time spent and rate charged re [81-1] Affidavit of Susan W. Cox; therefore, attorneys' fees in the amount of $1,750.00 are awarded to Defendant for her expenses incurred as a result of the Rule 11 motion for sanctions. Signed by Chief Judge J. Randal Hall on 03/07/2019. (jlh)
January 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 78 ORDER denying Plaintiff's 47 - 51 , 53 - 54 , 60 , 64 - 65 , 70 and 73 Motions; terminating 42 Motion to Vacate; granting in part and denying in part Defendant's 63 Motion for Sanctions and sanctions are hereby imposed and enumerated in this Order. This case shall remain closed. Signed by Chief Judge J. Randal Hall on 01/03/2019. (jlh)
May 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 36 CLERK'S JUDGMENT. This case stands closed. Signed by Deputy Clerk on 05/01/2018. (jlh)
August 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER denying 6 Motion for leave to serve ; granting 2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. The Clerk is directed to send plaintiff a USM 285 form and a summons form. Signed by Magistrate Judge G. R. Smith on 8/22/17. (wwp)
May 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER instructing the plaintiff to file additional financial information within 14 days of the filing of this order re 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Robert Neville. Signed by Magistrate Judge G. R. Smith on 5/19/17. (jrb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Neville v. McCaghren
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Neville
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elizabeth C. McCaghren
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?