Brantley et al v. Smtih et al
Plaintiff: |
Leroy Brantley, JR, Harold H. Ricks, Roger Smith and Shon Butler |
Defendant: |
Handi-House MFG. CO., Handi-House Financial Corporation, Handi-House Rent to Own, LLC, James Akridge, John Wilkerson, Donald Flanders, Stephanie Flanders and Brenda Monroe Williamson |
Case Number: |
6:2017cv00089 |
Filed: |
June 29, 2017 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Southern District of Georgia |
Office: |
Statesboro Office |
County: |
Emanuel |
Presiding Judge: |
J. Randal Hall |
Presiding Judge: |
G. R. Smith |
Nature of Suit: |
Fair Labor Standards Act |
Cause of Action: |
42 U.S.C. ยง 1981 |
Jury Demanded By: |
Plaintiff |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
March 28, 2019 |
Filing
139
JUDGMENT signed by District Judge R. Stan Baker on 03/28/2019. (evk)
|
March 25, 2019 |
Filing
138
ORDER denying Plaintiffs motion to add a RICO claim against Mr. Flanders ( 96 , pg.9) and granting 87 - 88 Motion for Summary Judgment. The Clerk of Court is DIRECTED to ENTER a final judgment in favor of Defendants and CLOSE this case. Signed by District Judge R. Stan Baker on 03/25/2019. (evk) Modified on 3/25/2019 (evk).
|
November 28, 2018 |
Filing
131
ORDER re 108 Appeal of Magistrate Judge Decision to District Court. The Court reaffirms its prior denial of the 65 Sanctions Motion. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brian K. Epps on 11/28/2018. (jlh)
|
August 22, 2018 |
Filing
115
ORDER granting 102 Motion to Substitute Party. Malik Brantley, Administrator of the Estate of Leroy Brantley, Jr. added. Leroy Brantley, Jr. terminated. Signed by Chief Judge J. Randal Hall on 08/22/2018. (jlh)
|
July 27, 2018 |
Filing
109
ORDER denying 40 Motion to Conditionally Certify a Collective Action Class and to Certify a Rule 23 Class; denying 50 Motion to Strike Doc. 40-10, Doc. 40-21, and Portions of Doc. 40-7. Signed by Chief Judge J. Randal Hall on 07/27/2018. (jlh)
|
July 11, 2018 |
Filing
106
ORDER denying 65 Motion for Sanctions and finding Defendants neither knew nor should have known Plaintiffs were in fact contemplating litigation prior to filing the complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brian K. Epps on 07/11/2018. (jlh)
|
May 15, 2018 |
Filing
85
ORDER dismissing without prejudice Counts 7 and 10 of Plaintiffs' 1 Complaint and Plaintiffs' claims against all defendants except Handi-House Mfg. Co. and Donald Flanders upon consideration of the parties' 83 Stipulation of Dis missal. Parties Handi-House Financial Corporation, Handi-House Rent to Own, LLC, John Wilkerson, Brenda Monroe Williamson, James Akridge and Stephanie Flanders are terminated. Signed by Chief Judge J. Randal Hall on 05/15/2018. (jlh) Modified on 5/15/2018 (jlh).
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Georgia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Search for this case: Brantley et al v. Smtih et al |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Plaintiff: Leroy Brantley, JR |
Represented By: |
John J. Czura |
Represented By: |
V. Sharon Edenfield |
Represented By: |
Joe Edward Mathews, Jr. |
Represented By: |
Travers W. Paine, III |
Represented By: |
Jeffrey Francis Peil |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Plaintiff: Harold H. Ricks |
Represented By: |
John J. Czura |
Represented By: |
V. Sharon Edenfield |
Represented By: |
Joe Edward Mathews, Jr. |
Represented By: |
Travers W. Paine, III |
Represented By: |
Jeffrey Francis Peil |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Plaintiff: Roger Smith |
Represented By: |
John J. Czura |
Represented By: |
V. Sharon Edenfield |
Represented By: |
Joe Edward Mathews, Jr. |
Represented By: |
Travers W. Paine, III |
Represented By: |
Jeffrey Francis Peil |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Plaintiff: Shon Butler |
Represented By: |
John J. Czura |
Represented By: |
V. Sharon Edenfield |
Represented By: |
Joe Edward Mathews, Jr. |
Represented By: |
Travers W. Paine, III |
Represented By: |
Jeffrey Francis Peil |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Defendant: Handi-House MFG. CO. |
Represented By: |
Larry Evans |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Defendant: Handi-House Financial Corporation |
Represented By: |
Larry Evans |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Defendant: Handi-House Rent to Own, LLC |
Represented By: |
Larry Evans |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Defendant: James Akridge |
Represented By: |
John Kendall Gross |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Defendant: John Wilkerson |
Represented By: |
John Kendall Gross |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Defendant: Donald Flanders |
Represented By: |
Larry Evans |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Defendant: Stephanie Flanders |
Represented By: |
Larry Evans |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Defendant: Brenda Monroe Williamson |
Represented By: |
Larry Evans |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?