Richardson v. United States of America

Case Number: 6:2017cv00108
Filed: August 8, 2017
Court: Georgia Southern District Court
Office: Statesboro Office
County: Coffee
Referring Judge: G. R. Smith
Presiding Judge: Lisa G. Wood
Nature of Suit: Motions to Vacate Sentence
Cause of Action: 28:2255
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 5, 2017 5 Opinion or Order of the Court CLERK'S JUDGMENT. Signed by Deputy Clerk and Approved by Judge Lisa G. Wood on 9/5/17. (jlm)
August 31, 2017 4 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS 2 . COA is denied. Signed by Judge Lisa G. Wood on 8/31/17. (slt)
August 21, 2017 2 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS dismissing with prejudice 1 Motion to Vacate/Set Aside/Correct Sentence (2255) filed by Jeremiah Jones Richardson. Objections to R&R due by 9/4/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge G. R. Smith on 8/21/17. (jlm)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Richardson v. United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?