Fails v. Social Security Administration

Plaintiff: Patricia Fails
Defendant: Commissioner Social Security Administration and Andrew M. Saul
Not Yet Classified: Social Security Administration
Case Number: 6:2019cv00046
Filed: May 21, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: J Randal Hall
Referring Judge: Christopher L Ray
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 5, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines: Andrew M. Saul answer due 10/9/2019. (wwp)
July 5, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Patricia Fails. Andrew M. Saul served on 7/1/2019, answer due 8/30/2019. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit proof of service)(Martin, Charles)
July 2, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Otto Woelke Leithart on behalf of Andrew M. Saul (Leithart, Otto)
June 4, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to United States Attorney, Attorney General, SSA Office of Regional Chief Counsel-Region IV. (loh)
May 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher L. Ray on 5/21/19. (jrb)
May 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 GENERAL ORDER FOR SOCIAL SECURITY APPEALS. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher L. Ray on 5/21/19. (loh)
May 21, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Patricia Fails. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)REFERRED to Judge Christopher L. Ray.(loh)
May 21, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Social Security Administration, filed by Patricia Fails. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(loh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fails v. Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew M. Saul
Represented By: Otto Woelke Leithart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patricia Fails
Represented By: Charles L. Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?