Martin v. Ogeechee Area Hospice, Inc
Plaintiff: Dawn Martin
Defendant: Ogeechee Area Hospice, Inc
Case Number: 6:2019cv00064
Filed: July 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Georgia
Office: Statesboro Office
Presiding Judge: J Randal Hall
Referring Judge: Christopher L Ray
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 13, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER denying #12 Motion for More Definite Statement. Signed by Chief Judge J. Randal Hall on 9/13/2019. (pts)
September 9, 2019 Filing 15 Litigants' Bill of Rights by Dawn Martin. (Beasley, Elizabeth)
September 9, 2019 Filing 14 Joint MOTION for Settlement Approval by Ogeechee Area Hospice, Inc. Responses due by 9/23/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Goodman, Kristen)
September 4, 2019 Filing 13 RESPONSE in Opposition re #12 First MOTION for More Definite Statement Plaintiff's Opposition to Motion for More Definite Statement filed by Dawn Martin. (Beasley, Elizabeth)
August 22, 2019 MOTIONS REFERRED: #12 First MOTION for More Definite Statement. (loh)
August 22, 2019 Filing 12 First MOTION for More Definite Statement by Ogeechee Area Hospice, Inc. Responses due by 9/5/2019. (Bowman, Catherine)
August 22, 2019 Filing 11 Litigants' Bill of Rights by Ogeechee Area Hospice, Inc. (Bowman, Catherine)
August 9, 2019 Filing 10 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Local Rule 7.1.1 by Dawn Martin. (Blair, Elizabeth)
August 9, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines: Compliance due by 8/23/2019. (jrb)
August 9, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Filing Deficiency re #7 Answer to Complaint. (jrb)
August 8, 2019 Filing 8 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Local Rule 7.1.1 by Ogeechee Area Hospice, Inc. (Bowman, Catherine)
August 8, 2019 Filing 7 Defensive Motions and ANSWER to Complaint by Ogeechee Area Hospice, Inc.(Bowman, Catherine)
July 23, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Dawn Martin. (Blair, Elizabeth)
July 23, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Dawn Martin. Ogeechee Area Hospice, Inc served on 7/22/2019, answer due 8/12/2019. (Blair, Elizabeth)
July 17, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Ogeechee Area Hospice, Inc. (jrb)
July 16, 2019 Notice to All Counsel of Record : Magistrate Judge Christopher L. Ray has updated the Standard Procedures for Discovery Disputes and Settlement Conferences, Notice of Discovery Dispute Form and Request for Settlement Conference Form. #CLICK HERE TO READ. (loh)
July 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 GENERAL ORDER: Report of Rule 26(f) planning meeting. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher L. Ray on 7/16/19. (loh)
July 16, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Submitted (Blair, Elizabeth)
July 16, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Ogeechee Area Hospice, Inc., filed by Dawn Martin. Receipt # 113J-2641672. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, B, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(loh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Martin v. Ogeechee Area Hospice, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dawn Martin
Represented By: Elizabeth Carlisle Blair
Represented By: Elizabeth Carlisle Beasley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ogeechee Area Hospice, Inc
Represented By: Kristen W. Goodman
Represented By: Catherine M. Bowman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?