Taylor v. Wal-Mart Stores East, LP et al
Plaintiff: Tonya Taylor
Defendant: Wal-Mart Stores, Inc. and Wal-Mart Stores East, LP
Case Number: 6:2019cv00067
Filed: July 21, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Georgia
Office: Statesboro Office
Presiding Judge: R Stan Baker
Referring Judge: Christopher L Ray
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 17, 2019 Filing 12 ANSWER to Amended Complaint by Wal-Mart Stores East, LP.(Higgins, Lisa)
September 17, 2019 Filing 11 ANSWER to Complaint by Wal-Mart Stores East, LP.(Higgins, Lisa)
September 17, 2019 Filing 10 ANSWER to Amended Complaint by Wal-Mart Stores East, LP.(Higgins, Lisa) PDF Error - See corrected document at #12 . Modified on 9/17/2019 (slt).
September 17, 2019 Filing 9 ANSWER to Complaint by Wal-Mart Stores East, LP.(Higgins, Lisa) PDF Error - See corrected document at #11 . Modified on 9/17/2019 (slt).
September 11, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines: Wal-Mart Stores East, LP answer due 9/18/2019; Wal-Mart Stores, Inc. answer due 9/18/2019. (jrb)
September 11, 2019 Filing 8 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons/Complaint served on Walmart Stores East, LP on 8/28/19, filed by Tonya Taylor. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit of Service for Defendant Walmart Stores East, LP)(Painter, Paul)
September 11, 2019 Filing 7 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons/Complaint served on Walmart Stores, Inc. on 8/28/19, filed by Tonya Taylor. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit of Service for Defendant Walmart Stores, Inc.)(Painter, Paul)
July 31, 2019 Filing 6 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Local Rule 7.1.1 by Tonya Taylor. (Painter, Paul)
July 31, 2019 Filing 5 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Tonya Taylor.(Painter, Paul)
July 22, 2019 Notice to All Counsel of Record : Magistrate Judge Christopher L. Ray has updated the Standard Procedures for Discovery Disputes and Settlement Conferences, Notice of Discovery Dispute Form and Request for Settlement Conference Form. #CLICK HERE TO READ. (loh)
July 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 RULE 26 INSTRUCTION ORDER. Signed by District Judge R. Stan Baker on 7/22/19. (loh)
July 22, 2019 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Tonya Taylor. (loh)
July 22, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Wal-Mart Stores East, LP. (loh)
July 22, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Wal-Mart Stores, Inc. (loh)
July 21, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Tonya Taylor. Receipt # 113J-2646025. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(loh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Taylor v. Wal-Mart Stores East, LP et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tonya Taylor
Represented By: Paul W. Painter, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.
Represented By: Michael L. Miller
Represented By: Lisa Nicole Higgins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wal-Mart Stores East, LP
Represented By: Michael L. Miller
Represented By: Lisa Nicole Higgins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?