Rock v. Social Security Adminstration
Plaintiff: Antonio Rock
Defendant: Social Security Adminstration
Not Yet Classified: Social Security Administration
Case Number: 6:2019cv00096
Filed: October 24, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: R Stan Baker
Referring Judge: Benjamin W Cheesbro
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 2, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 20, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines: Social Security Adminstration answer due 2/20/2020. (evk)
November 15, 2019 Filing 6 U.S. Marshal Return Executed as to Social Security Adminstration signed by Rosa Oates on 11/12/2019. (evk)
November 13, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Bradford Collins Patrick on behalf of Social Security Adminstration (Patrick, Bradford)
November 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting #3 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis and directing service of complaint and order by USMS. Signed by Magistrate Judge Benjamin W. Cheesbro on 11/7/19. (slt) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/7/2019: #1 USM 285 forms) (slt).
November 1, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Antonio Rock. REFERRED to Judge Benjamin W. Cheesbro.(jrb)
October 24, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines: Filing Fee/IFP due by 11/14/2019. (loh)
October 24, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Filing Fee Deficiency re #1 Complaint. (loh)
October 24, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Social Security Adminstration, filed by Antonio Rock. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(loh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rock v. Social Security Adminstration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Social Security Adminstration
Represented By: Bradford Collins Patrick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Antonio Rock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?