Harden v. Saul
Plaintiff: Tabitha Michelle Harden
Defendant: Andrew M. Saul
Not Classified By Court: Social Security Administration
Case Number: 6:2020cv00063
Filed: July 1, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Georgia
Office: Statesboro Office
Presiding Judge: R Stan Baker
Referring Judge: Brian K Epps
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 28, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 28, 2020 Filing 8 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Affidavit of Service of Summons and Complaint served on U.S. Attorney, U.S. Attorney General, Regional Chief Counsel Social Security Administration on 08/28/2020, filed by Tabitha Michelle Harden. (Claxton, Edward)
July 8, 2020 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Andrew M. Saul, U.S. Attorney, and U.S. Attorney General. (jlh)
July 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis subject to objection. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brian K. Epps on 07/08/2020. (jlh)
July 7, 2020 Judge District Judge R. Stan Baker added. Judge Judge Dudley H. Bowen no longer assigned to case. (jlh)
July 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER that this case re the #1 Complaint be transferred to the Statesboro Division (and is assigned to civil action no. CV 620-063). Signed by Magistrate Judge Brian K. Epps on 07/07/2020. (jlh)
July 1, 2020 Filing 4 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Local Rule 7.1.1 by Tabitha Michelle Harden. (thb)
July 1, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Submitted. (thb)
July 1, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Tabitha Michelle Harden. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Text of Proposed Order)REFERRED to Judge Brian K. Epps.(thb)
July 1, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Andrew M. Saul, filed by Tabitha Michelle Harden. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(thb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Harden v. Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew M. Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tabitha Michelle Harden
Represented By: Edward B. Claxton, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?