Laufer v. MAA, LLC
Plaintiff: Deborah Laufer
Defendant: MAA, LLC and GLENNVILLE HOSPITALITY, LLC
Case Number: 6:2020cv00069
Filed: July 21, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: R Stan Baker
Referring Judge: Christopher L Ray
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:12117
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 26, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 26, 2020 Set/Reset Deadlines: GLENNVILLE HOSPITALITY, LLC answer due 9/11/2020. (JH)
August 25, 2020 Filing 9 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on David Hollingsworth on 8/21/2020, filed by Deborah Laufer. (Gillespie, Tristan)
August 14, 2020 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to GLENNVILLE HOSPITALITY, LLC. (JH)
August 14, 2020 Filing 7 AMENDED COMPLAINT against GLENNVILLE HOSPITALITY, LLC, filed by Deborah Laufer.(Gillespie, Tristan)
August 13, 2020 Filing 6 Summons Submitted (Gillespie, Tristan)
August 13, 2020 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Deborah Laufer. MAA, LLC served on 7/31/2020, answer due 8/21/2020. (Gillespie, Tristan)
July 22, 2020 Filing fee: $ 400.00, receipt number AGASDC - 2886621. (wwp)
July 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 RULE 26(f)ORDER. Signed by District Judge R. Stan Baker on 7/22/20. (wwp)
July 22, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to MAA, LLC, A Georgia Corporation. (wwp)
July 22, 2020 Notice to All Counsel of Record : Magistrate Judge Christopher L. Ray has updated the Standard Procedures for Discovery Disputes and Settlement Conferences, Notice of Discovery Dispute Form and Request for Settlement Conference Form. #CLICK HERE TO READ. (wwp)
July 21, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against MAA, LLC, A Georgia Corporation, filed by Deborah Laufer. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(wwp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Laufer v. MAA, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Deborah Laufer
Represented By: Tristan Wade Gillespie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MAA, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GLENNVILLE HOSPITALITY, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?