Swain v. Weinstien et al
Plaintiff: Pamela D Swain
Defendant: Anthony Robbins, Alan Dershowitz, The Former Weinstein Company, Harvey Weinstien, Kiwifarms Social Media site and Harvey Weinstein
Case Number: 6:2020cv00082
Filed: September 1, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: J Randal Hall
Referring Judge: Christopher L Ray
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 17, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER AND REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS Dismissing re #1 Complaint filed by Pamela D Swain. ( Objections to R&R due by 11/6/2020). Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher L. Ray on 10/23/2020. (loh)
October 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting re #5 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher L. Ray on 10/23/2020. (loh)
October 13, 2020 Filing 6 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Alan Dershowitz, Anthony Robbins, The Former Weinstein Company, Harvey Weinstien, filed by Pamela D Swain.(pts)
October 13, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Pamela D Swain. REFERRED to Judge Christopher L. Ray.(pts)
September 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 RULE 26(f) ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher L. Ray on 9/1/20. (wwp)
September 1, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Filing Fee Deficiency. Set/Reset Deadlines: Compliance due by 9/22/2020. (Attachments: #1 AO 239)(pts)
September 1, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Pamela D Swain.(pts)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Swain v. Weinstien et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anthony Robbins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alan Dershowitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Former Weinstein Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Harvey Weinstien
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kiwifarms Social Media site
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Harvey Weinstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pamela D Swain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?