Taylor v. Barns et al
Plaintiff: Patrick Alonzo Taylor
Defendant: Officer Mr. Barns, Darrius Simmon and Mr. Barns
Case Number: 6:2021cv00082
Filed: November 12, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: R Stan Baker
Referring Judge: Brian K Epps
Nature of Suit: Prisoner - Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 30, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER Directing Monthly Payments be made from Prison Account of Patrick Alonzo Taylor. The Court orders Plaintiff to pay an initial filing fee of $10.60 within thirty days from the date of this Order. Compliance due by 1/29/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brian K. Epps on 12/30/2021. (jlh)
December 30, 2021 Filing 13 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Patrick Alonzo Taylor. (jrb)
December 30, 2021 Filing 12 Inmate Account Statement by Patrick Alonzo Taylor. (jrb)
December 30, 2021 Filing 11 CONSENT by Prisoner Patrick Alonzo Taylor to collection of fees. (csr)
December 9, 2021 Filing 10 Inmate Account Statement by Patrick Alonzo Taylor. (kjm)
December 1, 2021 Filing 9 Inmate Account Statement by Patrick Alonzo Taylor. (jlh)
November 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #5 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Plaintiff must return both the Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement and the Consent to Collection of Fees from Trust Account to the Clerk within thirty days of this Order. PLRA due by 12/30/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brian K. Epps on 11/30/21. (loh)
November 29, 2021 Filing 7 Case Reassigned to Magistrate Judge Brian K. Epps. District Judge R. Stan Baker no longer assigned to the case. (jlh)
November 29, 2021 Filing 5 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, by Patrick Alonzo Taylor. REFERRED to Judge Brian K. Epps. (jlh)
November 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER re Magistrate Assignment as to Mr. Barns, Darrius Simmon. Plaintiff Statement Re Assignment Due on 11/30/2021. Signed by District Judge R. Stan Baker on 11/16/2021. (Attachments: #1 Party's Statement) (ca)
November 16, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE of Filing Fee Deficiency re #1 Complaint. Set Deadline: Compliance due by 12/7/2021. (ca)
November 12, 2021 Filing 2 Entered in error (jrb).
November 12, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Patrick Alonzo Taylor.(jrb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Taylor v. Barns et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patrick Alonzo Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer Mr. Barns
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Darrius Simmon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mr. Barns
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?