Auto-Owners Insurance Company v. AAA Discount Homes, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Auto-Owners Insurance Company
Defendant: AAA Discount Homes, LLC, Delta Transport & Management, Inc., Dennis W. Driggers, Dewayne Driggers and Heather Way
Case Number: 6:2022cv00043
Filed: June 9, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Brian K Epps
Referring Judge: J Randal Hall
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Insurance Contract
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 5, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 5, 2022 Filing 25 ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE Executed as to #1 Complaint, #21 Answer to Complaint, #2 Summons Issued Acknowledgement filed by Heather Way. (Aaron, Charles)
July 14, 2022 Filing 24 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Heather Way re #21 Answer to Complaint, #22 Disclosure Statement Local Rule 7.1.1, #23 Litigants' Bill of Rights (Aaron, Charles)
July 14, 2022 Filing 23 Litigants' Bill of Rights by Heather Way. (Aaron, Charles)
July 14, 2022 Filing 22 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Local Rule 7.1.1 by Heather Way. (Aaron, Charles)
July 14, 2022 Filing 21 ANSWER to Complaint by Heather Way.(Aaron, Charles)
July 11, 2022 Filing 20 Defendant Dewayne Driggers' ANSWER to Complaint by Dewayne Driggers.(Delgado, Cindy)
July 11, 2022 Filing 19 Defendant Dennis Driggers' ANSWER to Complaint by Dennis W. Driggers.(Delgado, Cindy)
July 11, 2022 Filing 18 Defendant Delta Transport & Management ANSWER to Complaint by Delta Transport & Management, Inc..(Delgado, Cindy)
June 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting re #16 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Nicholas B. Tuz. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brian K. Epps on 6/28/22. (loh)
June 28, 2022 Filing 16 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Nicholas B. Tuz Receipt Number AGASDC-3375327, Fee Amount $200, by Auto-Owners Insurance Company. Responses due by 7/12/2022. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Certificate of Good Standing - Nicholas B. Tuz, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Kendall, Michael)
June 28, 2022 Filing 15 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Auto-Owners Insurance Company. Heather Way served on 6/23/2022, answer due 7/14/2022. (Kendall, Michael)
June 28, 2022 MOTIONS REFERRED: #16 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Nicholas B. Tuz. Receipt Number AGASDC-3375327, Fee Amount $200.00. (csr)
June 23, 2022 Filing 14 Litigants' Bill of Rights by Auto-Owners Insurance Company. (Kendall, Michael)
June 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 TEXT ORDER granting #12 Motion for Leave of Absence. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brian K. Epps on 6/21/2022. (cjc)
June 21, 2022 Filing 12 MOTION for Leave of Absence as to Auto-Owners Insurance Company for dates of : September 1, 2022 through and including September 12, 2022; November 18, 2022 through and including November 28, 2022; December 23, 2022 through and including January 2, 2023 by Auto-Owners Insurance Company. Responses due by 7/5/2022. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Kendall, Michael)
June 21, 2022 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Auto-Owners Insurance Company. Dewayne Driggers served on 6/20/2022, answer due 7/11/2022. (Kendall, Michael)
June 21, 2022 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Auto-Owners Insurance Company. Dennis W. Driggers served on 6/20/2022, answer due 7/11/2022. (Kendall, Michael)
June 21, 2022 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Auto-Owners Insurance Company. Delta Transport & Management, Inc. served on 6/20/2022, answer due 7/11/2022. (Kendall, Michael)
June 21, 2022 MOTIONS REFERRED: #12 MOTION for Leave of Absence as to Auto-Owners Insurance Company for dates of : September 1, 2022 through and including September 12, 2022; November 18, 2022 through and including November 28, 2022; December 23, 2022 through and including January 2, 2023. (JH)
June 20, 2022 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Auto-Owners Insurance Company. AAA Discount Homes, LLC served on 6/17/2022, answer due 7/8/2022. (Kendall, Michael)
June 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #6 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brian K. Epps on 6/15/2022. (pts)
June 15, 2022 Filing 6 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Michael C. Kendall Receipt Number AGASDC-3367566, Fee Amount $200, by Auto-Owners Insurance Company. Responses due by 6/29/2022. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Certificate of Good Standing - Michael C. Kendall, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Kendall, Michael)
June 15, 2022 MOTIONS REFERRED: #6 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Michael C. Kendall Receipt Number AGASDC-3367566, Fee Amount $200. (thb)
June 14, 2022 Filing 5 Certificate of Related Cases 3.1 . (Kendall, Michael)
June 10, 2022 Filing 4 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Local Rule 7.1.1 by Auto-Owners Insurance Company. (Kendall, Michael)
June 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 RULE 26(f) ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brian K. Epps on 06/10/2022. (Attachments: #1 Civil Case Forms.) (jlh)
June 10, 2022 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to AAA Discount Homes, LLC, Delta Transport & Management, Inc., Dennis W. Driggers, Dewayne Driggers, and Heather Way. (jlh)
June 9, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against all Defendants, filed by Auto-Owners Insurance Company. (Fee paid: Receipt # AGASDC-3363647, $402.00.) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Underlying Lawsuit, #2 Exhibit B - Policy, #3 Exhibit C - Return of Receipt to Delta Transport, #4 Exhibit D - 2nd Return of Receipt to Delta Transport, #5 Exhibit E - Return of Receipt to Dewayne Driggers, and #6 Civil Cover Sheet.) (jlh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Auto-Owners Insurance Company v. AAA Discount Homes, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Auto-Owners Insurance Company
Represented By: Michael C. Kendall, II
Represented By: Michael C. Kendall
Represented By: Nicholas B. Tuz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AAA Discount Homes, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Delta Transport & Management, Inc.
Represented By: Cindy C. Delgado
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dennis W. Driggers
Represented By: Cindy C. Delgado
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dewayne Driggers
Represented By: Cindy C. Delgado
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Heather Way
Represented By: George H Rountree
Represented By: Charles Patrick Aaron
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?