Beasley v. Jemmott et al
Plaintiff: Alene Elene Beasley
Defendant: Sherlan Stanley Jemmott, J&J Trucking Enterprises, Inc. and Berkshire Hathaway Direct Insurance Company
Case Number: 6:2024cv00011
Filed: March 13, 2024
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Brian K Epps
Referring Judge: J Randal Hall
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity of citizenship
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 8, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 8, 2024 Filing 22 Litigants' Bill of Rights by Berkshire Hathaway Direct Insurance Company. (Nelson, David)
May 8, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 21 SCHEDULING ORDER: Amended Pleadings due by 5/20/2024; Discovery due by 9/16/2024; Motions due by 10/16/2024; Expert Witness Report (Plaintiff) due by 7/29/2024; Expert Witness Report (Defendant) due by 8/28/2024; and Status Report due by 9/16/2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brian K. Epps on 05/08/2024. (jlh)
May 6, 2024 Filing 20 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Snipes, Daniel)
May 6, 2024 MOTIONS REFERRED to Magistrate Judge: #20 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (kjm)
April 29, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 19 The Court ORDERS the parties to conduct a conference within fourteen days of the date of this Order and to file a joint 26(f) Report within seven days of the conference. The Court DIRECTS the CLERK to attach the standard RULE 26(f) REPORT to this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brian K. Epps on 4/29/24. (Attachments: #1 Rule 26(f) Report) (loh)
April 19, 2024 Filing 18 Corporate Disclosure Statement (LR 7.1.1) by Alene Elene Beasley. (Snipes, Daniel)
April 19, 2024 Filing 17 Litigants' Bill of Rights by Alene Elene Beasley. (Snipes, Daniel)
April 10, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER denying as moot re #10 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal, granting #15 Consent MOTION to Withdraw re #10 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Alene Elene Beasley. Signed by Chief Judge J. Randal Hall on 4/10/24. (loh)
April 8, 2024 Filing 15 Consent MOTION to Withdraw #10 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Alene Elene Beasley by Alene Elene Beasley. Responses due by 4/22/2024. (Snipes, Daniel)
April 8, 2024 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel B. Snipes on behalf of Alene Elene Beasley (Snipes, Daniel)
April 1, 2024 Filing 13 Corporate Disclosure Statement (LR 7.1.1) by Berkshire Hathaway Direct Insurance Company, J&J Trucking Enterprises, Inc., Sherlan Stanley Jemmott. (Nelson, David)
April 1, 2024 Filing 12 RESPONSE to #10 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Alene Elene Beasley filed by Alene Elene Beasley filed by Berkshire Hathaway Direct Insurance Company, J&J Trucking Enterprises, Inc., Sherlan Stanley Jemmott. (Nelson, David)
March 25, 2024 Filing 11 NOTICE of Filing Deficiency re #10 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal. If action is required, after 14 days of noncompliance a notice will be submitted to a judicial officer for possible sanctions, to include dismissal. Compliance due by 4/8/2024. (thb)
March 22, 2024 Filing 10 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Alene Elene Beasley (Merritt, Julia)
March 20, 2024 Filing 9 NOTICE of Filing by Berkshire Hathaway Direct Insurance Company, J&J Trucking Enterprises, Inc., Sherlan Stanley Jemmott Amended Certificate of Service (Nelson, David)
March 20, 2024 Filing 8 NOTICE of Filing Deficiency re 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement (LR 7.1.1). If action is required, after 14 days of noncompliance a notice will besubmitted to a judicial officer for possible sanctions, to include dismissal.Compliance due by 4/3/2024. (Attachments: #1 Disclosure Statement)(thb)
March 20, 2024 Filing 7 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Berkshire Hathaway Direct Insurance Company, J&J Trucking Enterprises, Inc., Sherlan Stanley Jemmott. (Nelson, David)
March 20, 2024 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint by Berkshire Hathaway Direct Insurance Company.(Nelson, David)
March 13, 2024 Filing 4 NOTICE by J&J Trucking Enterprises, Inc., Sherlan Stanley Jemmott Consent to Notice of Removal (Nelson, David)
March 13, 2024 Filing 3 REMOVAL NOTICE to All Counsel of Record. (maa)
March 13, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 2 RULE 26(f) ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brian K. Epps on 3/13/2024. (maa)
March 13, 2024 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Berkshire Hathaway Direct Insurance Company, Sherlan Stanley Jemmott, J&J Trucking Enterprises, Inc. from State Court of Toombs County, case number 23SV00172. Filing fee $405 receipt number AGASDC-3785723. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1 - State Court Pleadings, #3 State Court Notice of Removal)(maa)
March 13, 2024 Set/Reset Deadlines: Berkshire Hathaway Direct Insurance Company answer due 3/20/2024. Compliance (State Court Motions) due by 3/27/2024. (maa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Beasley v. Jemmott et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alene Elene Beasley
Represented By: Julia A. Merritt
Represented By: Daniel B. Snipes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sherlan Stanley Jemmott
Represented By: Christina McMahon Curreli
Represented By: David N. Nelson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J&J Trucking Enterprises, Inc.
Represented By: Christina McMahon Curreli
Represented By: David N. Nelson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Berkshire Hathaway Direct Insurance Company
Represented By: Christina McMahon Curreli
Represented By: David N. Nelson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?