State of Hawaii v. Trump Featured Case

Plaintiff: State of Hawaii and Ismail Elshikh
Defendant: Donald J. Trump, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, John F. Kelly, U.S. Department of State, Rex Tillerson and United States of America
Case Number: 1:2017cv00050
Filed: February 3, 2017
Court: Hawaii District Court
Office: Hawaii Office
County: Honolulu
Referring Judge: KENNETH J. MANSFIELD
Presiding Judge: DERRICK K. WATSON
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

We have record of the following docket entries for this case:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 17, 2017 387 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER re 368 - Signed by JUDGE DERRICK K. WATSON on 10/17/2017. (emt, )CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications were served by first class mail on the date of this docket entry
October 16, 2017 386 RESPONSE re 376 Notice (Other), of In Camera, Ex Parte Lodging of Report filed by Ismail Elshikh, John Doe 1, John Doe 2, Muslim Association of Hawaii, Inc., State of Hawaii. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Katyal, Neal)
October 16, 2017 385 EO: Upon consideration of Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to File a Response to Notice of In Camera, Ex Parte Lodging of Report Containing Classified Information ("Motion"), and good cause appearing therefor, the Motion is hereby GRANTED. Dkt. No. 384 . Plaintiffs shall promptly file their Response to Notice of In Camera, Ex Parte Lodging of Report Containing Classified Information in the form attached to Plaintiffs' Motion. IT IS SO ORDERED. (JUDGE DERRICK K. WATSON)(tyk)CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications were served by first class mail on the date of this docket entry
October 16, 2017 384 MOTION for Leave to File Response to Notice of In Camera, Ex Parte Lodging of Report Neal Katyal appearing for Plaintiffs Ismail Elshikh, John Does 1 & 2, Muslim Association of Hawaii, Inc., State of Hawaii (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Proposed Response, # 2 Exhibit Proposed Order, # 3 Certificate of Service)(Katyal, Neal) forwarded to MAGISTRATE JUDGE KEVIN S. CHANG
October 15, 2017 383 Declaration re 368 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order . (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit M, Decl. of Former Nat'l Sec. Officials, # 2 Certificate of Service)(Katyal, Neal)
October 15, 2017 382 REPLY re 368 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Ismail Elshikh, John Does 1 & 2, Muslim Association of Hawaii, Inc., State of Hawaii. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Katyal, Neal)
October 15, 2017 381 (Third) AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Ismail Elshikh, State of Hawaii, John Does 1 & 2, Muslim Association of Hawaii, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Certificate of Service)(Katyal, Neal) Modified on 10/16/2017 (emt, ).
October 14, 2017 380 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING 367 Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to File Third Amended Complaint, Signed by JUDGE DERRICK K. WATSON on 10/14/17. (apg, dist)<hr><center>CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE</center>Participants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications were served by first class mail on the date of this docket entry
October 14, 2017 379 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING 369 Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave for Doe Plaintiffs to Proceed Under Psyeudonym, and for In Camera Review of Doe Plaintiffs' and Doe Declarants' Signed Statements, Signed by JUDGE DERRICK K. WATSON on 10/14/17. (apg, dist)<hr><center>CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE</center>Participants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications were served by first class mail on the date of this docket entry
October 14, 2017 378 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re 368 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by John F. Kelly, Rex Tillerson, Donald J. Trump, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, U.S. Department of State, United States of America. (Bennett, Michelle)
October 13, 2017 377 Clerk's Office NOTICE OF RECEIPT of 376 Government's Report Containing Classified Information. (emt, )
October 13, 2017 376 NOTICE by John F. Kelly, Rex Tillerson, Donald J. Trump, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, U.S. Department of State, United States of America re 371 Link,,, Notice of In Camera, Ex Parte Lodging of Report Containing Classified Information and Objection to Review or Consideration of Report John F. Kelly, Rex Tillerson, Donald J. Trump, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, U.S. Department of State, United States of America. (Schwei, Daniel)
October 11, 2017 375 EO: On 10/11/17, Yuri Fuchs, Reedy C. Swanson, and Sundeep Iyer filed Motions to Appear Pro Hac Vice 372 373 374 . The Court finds that the Motions satisfy the requirements set forth in Rule 83.1(e) of the Local Rules of Practice for the U.S. District Court for the District of Hawaii. Accordingly, the Court GRANTS the Motions and hereby authorizes Messrs. Fuchs, Swanson, and Iyer to appear before this Court in this action. (MAGISTRATE JUDGE KEVIN S.C. CHANG)(chang1)CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications were served by first class mail on the date of this docket entry
October 11, 2017 374 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Sundeep Iyer Filing fee $ 300, receipt number 0975-1941290.Deirdre Marie-Iha appearing for Plaintiff State of Hawaii, Ismail Elshikh (Marie-Iha, Deirdre) Modified on 10/11/2017 (emt, ).
October 11, 2017 373 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Reedy C. Swanson Filing fee $ 300, receipt number 0975-1941274.Deirdre Marie-Iha appearing for Plaintiff State of Hawaii, Ismail Elshikh (Marie-Iha, Deirdre) Modified on 10/11/2017 (emt, ).
October 11, 2017 372 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Yuri Fuchs Filing fee $ 300, receipt number 0975-1941260.Deirdre Marie-Iha appearing for Plaintiff Ismail Elshikh, State of Hawaii (Marie-Iha, Deirdre) Modified on 10/11/2017 (emt, ).
October 10, 2017 371 EO: The Government is ordered to provide, with its response to Plaintiffs' filings, a copy of the September 15, 2017 Report submitted by the Secretary of Homeland Security, which is referenced in Section 1(h) of Proclamation No. 9645 entitled "Enhancing Vetting Capabilities and Processes for Detecting Attempted Entry Into the United States by Terrorists or Other Public-Safety Threats." The September 15, 2017 Report is due no later than 6:00 AM H.S.T. on October 14, 2017. IT IS SO ORDERED. (JUDGE DERRICK K. WATSON)(tyk)CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications were served by first class mail on the date of this docket entry
October 10, 2017 370 Declaration re 369 MOTION for Leave to Proceed Under Psyeudonyms and for In Camera Review , 368 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order of Deirdre Marie-Iha. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, Decl. of John Doe 1, # 2 Exhibit B, Decl. of John Doe 2, # 3 Exhibit C, Decl. of Jane Doe 3, # 4 Exhibit D, Decl. of John Doe 4, # 5 Exhibit E, Decl. of John Doe 5, # 6 Exhibit F, Decl. of Straney, # 7 Exhibit G, Decl. of Chan, # 8 Exhibit H, Decl. of Sharma, # 9 Exhibit I, Decl. of Elshikh, # 10 Exhibit J, Decl. of Szigeti, # 11 Exhibit K, Decl. of Salaveria, # 12 Exhibit L, Decl. of Ouansafi, # 13 Certificate of Service)(Marie-Iha, Deirdre)
October 10, 2017 369 MOTION for Leave to Proceed Under Psyeudonyms and for In Camera Review Neal Katyal appearing for Plaintiff State of Hawaii (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Proposed Order, # 2 Certificate of Service)(Katyal, Neal)
October 10, 2017 368 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order Neal Katyal appearing for Plaintiff State of Hawaii (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Temporary Restraining Order, # 2 Exhibit Proposed Order, # 3 Certificate of Service)(Katyal, Neal)
October 10, 2017 367 MOTION for Leave to File Third Amended Complaint Neal Katyal appearing for Plaintiff State of Hawaii (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit [Proposed] Third Amended Complaint, # 2 Exhibit [Proposed] Ex. 1 to Third Amended Complaint, # 3 Exhibit [Proposed] Ex. 2 to Third Amended Complaint., # 4 Exhibit [Proposed] Ex. 3 to Third Amended Complaint, # 5 Exhibit [Proposed] Ex. 4 to Third Amended Complaint, # 6 Exhibit [Proposed] Ex. 5 to Third Amended Complaint, # 7 Exhibit [Proposed] Ex. 6 to Third Amended Complaint, # 8 Exhibit [Proposed] Ex. 7 to Third Amended Complaint, # 9 Exhibit [Proposed] Ex. 8 to Third Amended Complaint, # 10 Exhibit [Proposed] Ex. 9 to Third Amended Complaint, # 11 Exhibit Proposed Order, # 12 Certificate of Service)(Katyal, Neal)
October 6, 2017 366 EO: Upon consideration of Plaintiffs' Motion to Lift the Stay, and to Increase the Word Limit and Set a Schedule for Briefing on Plaintiffs' Forthcoming Motion for a Temporary Restraining Order ("Motion") (Dkt. No. 363), and good cause appearing therefor, the Court's April 3, 2017 stay of the proceedings in this case is hereby lifted (Dkt. No. 279). Plaintiffs shall file their Motion for Leave to File a Third Amended Complaint and Motion for a Temporary Restraining Order by 6:00 AM Hawaii Standard Time ("H.S.T.") on October 10, 2017. The Government shall file its response to both Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to File a Third Amended Complaint and Plaintiffs' Motion for a Temporary Restraining Order by 6:00 AM H.S.T. on October 14, 2017. Plaintiffs shall file their reply briefs by 12:00 Noon H.S.T. on October 15, 2017. The Court intends to rule on Plaintiffs' Motions without a hearing. The request to increase the word limit associated with the Motion for a Temporary Restraining Order is denied. IT IS SO ORDERED. (tyk)CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications were served by first class mail on the date of this docket entry
October 6, 2017 365 NOTICE of Appearance by Kevin M. Richardson on behalf of State of Hawaii on behalf of State of Hawaii. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Richardson, Kevin)
October 6, 2017 364 NOTICE of Appearance by Kaliko'onalani D. Fernandes on behalf of State of Hawaii on behalf of State of Hawaii. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Fernandes, Kaliko'onalani)
October 6, 2017 363 MOTION to Lift Stay, Increase Word Limit, and Set Briefing Schedule Neal Katyal appearing for Plaintiff State of Hawaii (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Proposed Order, # 2 Certificate of Service)(Katyal, Neal)
September 14, 2017 362 Featured Case ORDER of USCA as to 346 Notice of Appeal, filed by U.S. Department of State, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, Rex Tillerson, John F. Kelly, United States of America, Donald J. Trump, 9CCA NO. 17-16426: "In light of the Supreme Court's September 12, 2017 order, the mandate in this case is stayed with regards to the portions of opinion that address refugees covered by formal assurances pending further action of the Court. The modified injunction requiring the Government to allow grandparents, grandchildren, brothers-in-law, sisters-in-law, aunts, uncles, nieces, nephews, and cousins of persons in the United States, however, remains in effect as it has never been stayed and is not stayed by the Supreme Court's September 12, 2017 order." (emt, )CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParties served by the Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals.
September 7, 2017 361 Featured Case OPINION of USCA as to 346 Notice of Appeal, filed by U.S. Department of State, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, Rex Tillerson, John F. Kelly, United States of America, Donald J. Trump, 9CCA NO. 17-16426: The district court's order modifying the preliminary injunction is AFFIRMED. "The mandate shall issue five days after the filing of this opinion." (Attachments: # 1 Webcite ) (emt, )CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParties served by the Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals. Modified on 9/14/2017 (emt, ).
September 7, 2017 360 Featured Case OPINION of USCA as to 346 Notice of Appeal, filed by U.S. Department of State, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, Rex Tillerson, John F. Kelly, United States of America, Donald J. Trump, 9CCA NO. 17-16426: The district court's order modifying the preliminary injunction is AFFIRMED. "The mandate shall issue five days after the filing of this opinion." (emt, )CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications were served by first class mail on the date of this docket entry
August 29, 2017 359 MANDATE of USCA as to 324 Notice of Appeal, filed by State of Hawaii, 9CCA NO. 17-16366: "The judgment of this Court, entered July 07, 2017, takes effect this date. This constitutes the formal mandate of this Court issued pursuant to Rule 4l(a) of the Federal Rules of Appellate Procedure." (emt, )CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications were served by first class mail on the date of this docket entry
August 9, 2017 358 Featured Case ORDER of USCA as to 346 Notice of Appeal, filed by U.S. Department of State, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, Rex Tillerson, John F. Kelly, United States of America, Donald J. Trump, 9CCA NO. 17-16426: "This case shall be set for oral argument on Monday, August 28, 2017, at 2:00 pm in Seattle, Washington." (emt, )CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParties served by the Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals.
August 7, 2017 357 Featured Case ORDER of USCA as to 346 Notice of Appeal, filed by U.S. Department of State, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, Rex Tillerson, John F. Kelly, United States of America, Donald J. Trump, 9CCA 17-16426: "Human Rights First's motion for leave to file a brief as amicus curiae, Dkt. No. 23, is granted." (emt, )CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParties served by the Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals.
August 4, 2017 356 NOTICE of Change of Address by Justin B. Cox on behalf of HIAS, International Refugee Assistance Project. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Cox, Justin)
August 3, 2017 355 Featured Case ORDER of USCA as to 346 Notice of Appeal, filed by U.S. Department of State, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, Rex Tillerson, John F. Kelly, United States of America, Donald J. Trump, 9CCA NO. 17-16426: "The Emergency Motion to Intervene (Dkt. #10) is DENIED." "The United States Committee for Refugees and Immigrants may file a brief as amicus curiae no later than Wednesday, August 9, 2017. If Appellants wish to respond to any argument raised in that brief, they may do so no later than 12:00 p.m. PST on Friday, August 11, 2017." (emt, )CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParties served by the Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals.
July 28, 2017 354 Featured Case ORDER of USCA CA No. 17-16426 as to 346 Notice of Appeal, filed by U.S. Department of State, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, Rex Tillerson, John F. Kelly, United States of America, Donald J. Trump The Court has received an Emergency Motion to Intervene (Dkt. #10). Any response shall be filed on or before 12:00 p.m. PST, Wednesday, August 2, 2017. Proposed-Intervenor may file a reply on or before 12:00 p.m. PST, Thursday, August 3, 2017. (eps, )CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants served by 9CCA
July 28, 2017 353 NOTICE by HIAS, International Refugee Assistance Project re 351 Order on Motion to Seal Document, Link,,,,,, 341 Link,,, of Filing of Redacted Exhibits HIAS, International Refugee Assistance Project. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit E, # 2 Exhibit F, # 3 Certificate of Service)(Espiritu, Nicholas)
July 24, 2017 352 Featured Case ORDER of USCA as to 346 Notice of Appeal, filed by U.S. Department of State, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, Rex Tillerson, John F. Kelly, United States of America, Donald J. Trump, 9CCA NO. 17-16426: "The Government's motion to stay pending appeal, Dkt. No. 3, is denied as moot. The briefing schedule entered at Dkt. No. 2 is vacated. The parties' joint motion to expedite the briefing and consideration of the merits of this appeal, Dkt. No. 6, is granted." (emt, )CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParties served by the Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals.
July 20, 2017 351 EO: After review and consideration of the International Refugee Assistance Project and HIAS' Ex Parte Motion to Seal Document Nos. 336-6 and 336-7 ("Motion") and good cause appearing, the Court hereby finds that compelling reasons exist to file the designated exhibits under seal and GRANTS the Motion. Dkt. No. 340. Amici shall file redacted versions of the sealed exhibits as required by Local Rule 83.12(c). IT IS SO ORDERED. (JUDGE DERRICK K. WATSON)(tyk)CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications were served by first class mail on the date of this docket entry
July 19, 2017 350 Appeal Remark re 346 Notice of Appeal, re 9CCA NO. 17-16426 : ORDER issued by the U.S. Supreme Court (16-1540) ~ "The Government 's motion seeking clarification of our order of June 26, 2017, is denied. The District Court order modifying the preliminary injunction with respect to refugees covered by a formal assurance is stayed pending resolution of the Government's appeal to the Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit." (emt, )CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications were served by first class mail on the date of this docket entry
July 19, 2017 349 Appeal Remark re 271 Notice of Appeal, re 9CCA NO. 17-15589 : ORDER issued by the U.S. Supreme Court (16-1540) ~ "The Government's motion seeking clarification of our order of June 26, 2017, is denied. The District Court order modifying the preliminary injunction with respect to refugees covered by a formal assurance is stayed pending resolution of the Government's appeal to the Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit." (emt, )CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications were served by first class mail on the date of this docket entry
July 14, 2017 348 Attorney Appeal Packet re 346 Notice of Appeal filed by Defendants, 9CCA NO. 17-16426. (Attachments: # 1 Notice of Appeal, # 2 Instructions for Civil Appeals, # 3 Additional Instructions for Transcript Designation and Ordering Form, # 4 Letter Re: Court Reporters, # 5 Transcript Designation and Ordering Form, # 6 Docket Sheet) (emt, )CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications were served by first class mail on the date of this docket entry
July 14, 2017 347 USCA Case Number 17-16426 for 346 Notice of Appeal filed by U.S. Department of State, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, Rex Tillerson, John F. Kelly, United States of America, Donald J. Trump. (emt, )CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParties served by the Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals.
July 14, 2017 346 NOTICE OF APPEAL as to 345 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief,, by John F. Kelly, Rex Tillerson, Donald J. Trump, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, U.S. Department of State, United States of America. 9CCA NO. 17-16426 (Bennett, Michelle) Modified on 7/14/2017 (emt, ).
July 13, 2017 345 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO ENFORCE, OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, TO MODIFY PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION re 328 - Signed by JUDGE DERRICK K. WATSON on 7/13/2017. (emt, )CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications were served by first class mail on the date of this docket entry
July 13, 2017 344 Declaration re 342 Reply Third Declaration of Neal K. Katyal. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit J, # 2 Exhibit K, # 3 Exhibit L, # 4 Certificate of Service)(Katyal, Neal)
July 12, 2017 343 Declaration re 342 Reply Supplemental Declaration of Neal K. Katyal. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit G, # 2 Exhibit H, # 3 Exhibit I, # 4 Certificate of Service)(Katyal, Neal)
July 12, 2017 342 REPLY re 328 MOTION to Enforce or, In the Alternative, to Modify Preliminary Injunction re 291 Preliminary Injunction, filed by State of Hawaii. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Katyal, Neal)
July 12, 2017 341 EO: On July 11, 2017, the International Refugee Assistance Project and HIAS filed an Ex Parte Motion to Seal Document Nos. 336-6 and 336-7 ("Motion"). Dkt. No. 340. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.12(b), any party who contends that any information related to the Motion is not entitled to confidential treatment may challenge the designation by no later than seven (7) days after the filing of the Motion. If no objection is received, the Court intends to grant the Motion. IT IS SO ORDERED. (JUDGE DERRICK K. WATSON)(tyk)CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications were served by first class mail on the date of this docket entry
July 11, 2017 340 MOTION to Seal Document Nos. 336-6 and 336-7 Nicholas Espiritu appearing for Amicus Parties HIAS, International Refugee Assistance Project (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Nicholas Espiritu, # 2 Proposed Order, # 3 Certificate of Service)(Espiritu, Nicholas)
July 11, 2017 339 NOTICE of Errata to Brief of International Refugee Assistance Project and HIAS as Amici Curiae in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion to Enforce or, in the Alternative, to Modify Preliminary Injunction re 336 , 337 by HIAS, International Refugee Assistance Project. (Attachments: # 1 BRIEF OF INTERNATIONAL REFUGEE ASSISTANCE PROJECT AND HIAS AS AMICI CURIAE IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO ENFORCE OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, TO MODIFY PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION, # 2 Certificate of Service)(Espiritu, Nicholas) Modified on 7/12/2017 (emt, ).
July 11, 2017 338 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re 328 MOTION to Enforce or, In the Alternative, to Modify Preliminary Injunction re 291 Preliminary Injunction, filed by John F. Kelly, Rex Tillerson, Donald J. Trump, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, U.S. Department of State, United States of America. (Rosenberg, Brad)
July 10, 2017 337 EO: The Court GRANTS the Motion for Leave to File Brief of International Refugee Assistance Project and HIAS as Amici Curiae in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion to Enforce or, In the Alternative, to Modify Preliminary Injunction. Dkt. No. 336. (JUDGE DERRICK K. WATSON)(watson1)CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications were served by first class mail on the date of this docket entry
July 10, 2017 336 MOTION for Leave to File Amici Curiae Brief Justin B. Cox appearing for Amicus Parties HIAS, International Refugee Assistance Project (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Proposed Brief, # 2 Exhibit Declaration of Mark Hetfield, President and CEO of HIAS, Inc, # 3 Exhibit Supplemental Declaration of Mark Hetfield, President and CEO of HIAS, Inc, # 4 Exhibit Declaration of Rebecca Heller, Director of the International Refugee Assistance Project, # 5 Exhibit Declaration of General John R. Allen, # 6 Exhibit Declaration of "Sam" , # 7 Exhibit Declaration of Allen R. Vaught, # 8 Proposed Order, # 9 Certificate of Service)(Cox, Justin) Modified by (afc) on 7/11/2017: Per direction of the Chambers of Judge Derrick K. Watson: - VIEWING RESTRICTED - Modified on 7/13/2017 Exhibit A and the Declarations of "Sam" and Allen R. Vaught are temporarily sealed pending disposition of ECF No. 340 MOTION to Seal Document Nos. 336-6 and 336-7 (emt, ). Modified on 7/13/2017 (emt, ).
July 10, 2017 335 EO: The Court partially lifts the April 3, 2017 stay in this matter for the limited purpose of considering Plaintiffs' Motion to Enforce or, In the Alternative, to Modify Preliminary Injunction. Dkt. No. 328. IT IS SO ORDERED. (JUDGE DERRICK K. WATSON)(tyk)CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications were served by first class mail on the date of this docket entry
July 10, 2017 334 Errata re 328 MOTION to Enforce or, In the Alternative, to Modify Preliminary Injunction re 291 Preliminary Injunction, . (Attachments: # 1 Table of Contents and Table of Authorities, # 2 Certificate of Service)(Marie-Iha, Deirdre)
July 10, 2017 333 MEMORANDUM in Support re 328 MOTION to Enforce or, In the Alternative, to Modify Preliminary Injunction re 291 Preliminary Injunction, filed by State of New York. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Underwood, Barbara)
July 10, 2017 332 EO: The Court GRANTS the Motion of the State of New York For Leave To File Amicus Brief. Dkt. No. 331. (JUDGE DERRICK K. WATSON)(tyk)CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications were served by first class mail on the date of this docket entry
July 10, 2017 331 MOTION for Leave to File Motion of the State of New York for Leave to File Amicus Brief Barbara D. Underwood appearing for Amicus State of New York (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support of Motion, # 2 Declaration of Barbara D. Underwood, # 3 Exhibit Brief Amicus Curiae of New York and Other States, # 4 Certificate of Service)(Underwood, Barbara)
July 8, 2017 330 EO: The Court is in receipt of Plaintiffs' Motion to Enforce or, In the Alternative, to Modify Preliminary Injunction. Dkt. No. 328. Defendants shall file their opposition by Tuesday, July 11, 2017. Plaintiffs shall file any reply by Wednesday, July 12, 2017. The parties' opposition and reply briefs are limited to no more than 15 pages each. IT IS SO ORDERED.(JUDGE DERRICK K. WATSON)(watson1)CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications were served by first class mail on the date of this docket entry
July 7, 2017 329 Declaration re 328 MOTION to Enforce or, In the Alternative, to Modify Preliminary Injunction re 291 Preliminary Injunction, of Neal K. Katyal. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Certificate of Service)(Katyal, Neal)
July 7, 2017 328 MOTION to Enforce or, In the Alternative, to Modify Preliminary Injunction re 291 Preliminary Injunction, Neal Katyal appearing for Plaintiff State of Hawaii (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum, # 2 Exhibit Proposed Order on Motion to Enforce Preliminary Injunction, # 3 Exhibit Proposed Order Modifying Preliminary Injunction, # 4 Certificate of Service)(Katyal, Neal)
July 7, 2017 327 Featured Case ORDER of USCA as to 324 Notice of Appeal, filed by State of Hawaii, 9CCA NO. 17-16366: This appeal is DISMISSED for lack of jurisdiction. Plaintiffs' "Emergency Motion under FRAP 8 and Circuit Rule 27-3 for Injunction Pending Appeal" is DENIED as moot. (emt, )CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParties served by the Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals.
July 7, 2017 326 Attorney Appeal Packet re 324 Notice of Appeal filed by State of Hawaii, Ismail Elshikh, 9CCA NO. 17-16366. (Attachments: # 1 Notice of Appeal, # 2 Instructions for Civil Appeals, # 3 Additional Instructions for Transcript Designation and Ordering Form, # 4 Letter Re: Court Reporters, # 5 Transcript Designation and Ordering Form, # 6 Docket Sheet) (emt, )CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications were served by first class mail on the date of this docket entry
July 6, 2017 325 USCA Case Number 17-16366 for 324 Notice of Appeal filed by State of Hawaii. (emt, )CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParties served by the Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals.
July 6, 2017 324 NOTICE OF APPEAL as to 322 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief,, by State of Hawaii. Filing fee $ 505, receipt number 0975-1895381. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Representation Statement, # 2 Certificate of Service)(Katyal, Neal) Modified on 7/7/2017 9CCA NO. 17-16366 (emt, ).
July 6, 2017 323 EO: On 7/5/17, Justin B. Cox filed a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Doc. No. 313. On 7/6/17, Mr. Cox filed a Supplemental Declaration, per the Court's request. The Court finds that the Motion, coupled with the Supplemental Declaration, satisfies the requirements set forth in Rule 83.1(e) of the Local Rules of Practice for the U.S. District Court for the District of Hawaii. Accordingly, the Court GRANTS the Motion 313 and hereby permits Mr. Cox to appear before this Court in this action. (MAGISTRATE JUDGE KEVIN S.C. CHANG)(chang1)CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications were served by first class mail on the date of this docket entry
July 6, 2017 322 Featured Case ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFFS' EMERGENCY MOTION TO CLARIFY SCOPE OF PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION re 293 - Signed by JUDGE DERRICK K. WATSON on 7/6/2017. (emt, )CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications were served by first class mail on the date of this docket entry
July 6, 2017 321 MEMORANDUM in Support re 293 Emergency MOTION to Clarify Scope of Preliminary Injunction re 291 Preliminary Injunction, filed by State of New York. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Underwood, Barbara)
July 6, 2017 320 EO: The Court GRANTS the Motion of the State of New York For Leave To File Amicus Brief. Dkt. No. 319. (JUDGE DERRICK K. WATSON)(tyk)CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications were served by first class mail on the date of this docket entry
July 6, 2017 319 MOTION for Leave to File [Motion of the State of New York for Leave to File Amicus Brief] Barbara D. Underwood appearing for Amicus State of New York (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support of Motion, # 2 Declaration of Barbara D. Underwood, # 3 Exhibit 1-Brief Amicus Curiae of New York and Other States, # 4 Certificate of Service)(Underwood, Barbara)
July 6, 2017 318 SUPPLEMENT re 313 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice for Justin Cox Filing fee $ 300, receipt number 0975-1894601. filed by International Refugee Assistance Project, HIAS by HIAS, International Refugee Assistance Project . (Caballero, Mateo)
July 5, 2017 317 EO: On 7/5/17, Justin B. Cox filed a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Doc. No. 313. Attached to the Motion is a table setting forth the courts to which he has been admitted to practice, along with the relevant admission dates. However, there is no admission date provided for the U.S. District Court for the Northern District of Georgia. Mr. Cox is directed to file a supplemental declaration providing the missing information. (MAGISTRATE JUDGE KEVIN S.C. CHANG)(chang1)CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications were served by first class mail on the date of this docket entry
July 5, 2017 316 EO: On 7/5/17, Omar Jadwat, Nicholas Espiritu, Melissa S. Keaney, Karen C. Tumlin, and Esther Sung filed Motions to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Doc. Nos. 308, 310-12, 314. The Court finds that the Motions satisfy the requirements set forth in Rule 83.1(e) of the Local Rules of Practice for the U.S. District Court for the District of Hawaii. Accordingly, the Court GRANTS the Motions 308 310 311 312 314 and hereby permits Messrs. Jadwat and Espiritu, and Mses. Keaney, Tumlin, and Sung, to appear before this Court in this action. (MAGISTRATE JUDGE KEVIN S.C. CHANG)(chang1)CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications were served by first class mail on the date of this docket entry
July 5, 2017 315 Errata re 303 Reply, Proposed Order. (Attachments: # 1 Errata Proposed Order, # 2 Certificate of Service)(Katyal, Neal)
July 5, 2017 314 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice for Esther Sung Filing fee $ 300, receipt number 0975-1894606.Mateo Caballero appearing for Amicus Parties HIAS, International Refugee Assistance Project (Attachments: # 1 Declaration, # 2 Order Granting Motion)(Caballero, Mateo)
July 5, 2017 313 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice for Justin Cox Filing fee $ 300, receipt number 0975-1894601.Mateo Caballero appearing for Amicus Parties HIAS, International Refugee Assistance Project (Attachments: # 1 Declaration, # 2 Order Granting Motion)(Caballero, Mateo)
July 5, 2017 312 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice for Karen Tumlin Filing fee $ 300, receipt number 0975-1894595.Mateo Caballero appearing for Amicus Parties HIAS, International Refugee Assistance Project (Attachments: # 1 Declaration, # 2 Order Granting Motion)(Caballero, Mateo)
July 5, 2017 311 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice for Melissa Keaney Filing fee $ 300, receipt number 0975-1894580.Mateo Caballero appearing for Amicus Parties HIAS, International Refugee Assistance Project (Attachments: # 1 Declaration, # 2 Order Granting Motion)(Caballero, Mateo)
July 5, 2017 310 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice for Nicholas Espiritu Filing fee $ 300, receipt number 0975-1894575.Mateo Caballero appearing for Amicus Parties HIAS, International Refugee Assistance Project (Attachments: # 1 Declaration, # 2 Order Granting Motion)(Caballero, Mateo)
July 5, 2017 309 EO: On 7/5/17, Cody H. Wofsy, Barbara D. Underwood, Lee Gelernt, and Spencer E. Amdur filed Motions to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Doc. Nos. 302, 305, 306, 307. The Court finds that the Motions satisfy the requirements set forth in Rule 83.1(e) of the Local Rules of Practice for the U.S. District Court for the District of Hawaii. Accordingly, the Court GRANTS the Motions 302 305 306 307 and hereby permits Messrs. Wofsy, Gelernt, and Amdur, and Ms. Underwood, to appear before this Court in this action. (MAGISTRATE JUDGE KEVIN S.C. CHANG)(chang1)CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications were served by first class mail on the date of this docket entry
July 5, 2017 308 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice for Omar Jadwat Filing fee $ 300, receipt number 0975-1894568.Mateo Caballero appearing for Amicus Parties HIAS, International Refugee Assistance Project (Attachments: # 1 Declaration, # 2 Order Granting Motion)(Caballero, Mateo)
July 5, 2017 307 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice for Spencer Amdur Filing fee $ 300, receipt number 0975-1894537.Mateo Caballero appearing for Amicus Parties HIAS, International Refugee Assistance Project (Attachments: # 1 Declaration, # 2 Order Granting Motion)(Caballero, Mateo)
July 5, 2017 306 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice for Lee Gelernt Filing fee $ 300, receipt number 0975-1894513.Mateo Caballero appearing for Amicus Parties HIAS, International Refugee Assistance Project (Attachments: # 1 Declaration, # 2 Order Granting Motion)(Caballero, Mateo)
July 5, 2017 305 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice for Barbara D. Underwood Filing fee $ 300, receipt number 0975-1894456.Duane R. Miyashiro appearing for Amicus State of New York (Attachments: # 1 Declaration, # 2 Proposed Order)(Miyashiro, Duane)
July 5, 2017 304 Declaration re 303 Reply, Supplemental Declaration of Neal K. Katyal. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit F, # 2 Exhibit G, # 3 Exhibit H, # 4 Exhibit I, # 5 Certificate of Service)(Katyal, Neal)
July 5, 2017 303 REPLY re 293 Emergency MOTION to Clarify Scope of Preliminary Injunction re 291 Preliminary Injunction, filed by State of Hawaii. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Proposed Order, # 2 Certificate of Service)(Katyal, Neal)
July 5, 2017 302 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice for Cody H. Wofsy Filing fee $ 300, receipt number 0975-1894367.Mateo Caballero appearing for Amicus Parties HIAS, International Refugee Assistance Project (Attachments: # 1 Declaration, # 2 Proposed Order)(Caballero, Mateo)
July 3, 2017 301 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re 293 Emergency MOTION to Clarify Scope of Preliminary Injunction re 291 Preliminary Injunction, filed by John F. Kelly, Rex Tillerson, Donald J. Trump, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, U.S. Department of State, United States of America. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Lawrence E. Bartlett & Att. 1-3, # 2 Exhibit A: Department of State FAQs, # 3 Exhibit B: Emails from Rosenberg to Katyal, # 4 Exhibit C: Department of State Fact Sheet re Refugee Program, # 5 Exhibit D: Department of Homeland Security FAQs, # 6 Certificate of Service)(Rosenberg, Brad)
July 3, 2017 300 Featured Case ORDER re 299 - Signed by JUDGE DERRICK K. WATSON on 7/3/2017. "Upon consideration of Defendants' Consent Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages, and finding good cause, the Court ORDERS that Defendants' memorandum in response to Plaintiffs' Emergency Motion to Clarify Scope of Preliminary Injunction, ECF No. 293, may be up to twenty-five pages." (emt, )CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications were served by first class mail on the date of this docket entry
July 3, 2017 299 Consent MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages Brad P. Rosenberg appearing for Defendants John F. Kelly, Rex Tillerson, Donald J. Trump, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, U.S. Department of State, United States of America (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order, # 2 Certificate of Service)(Rosenberg, Brad)
July 1, 2017 298 EO: The Court GRANTS the Motion for Leave to File Brief of International Refugee Assistance Project and HIAS as Amici Curiae in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Clarification of Scope of Preliminary Injunction. Dkt. No. 297. (JUDGE DERRICK K. WATSON)(watson1)CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications were served by first class mail on the date of this docket entry
June 30, 2017 297 MOTION for Leave to File Amici Curiae Brief Mateo Caballero appearing for Amicus Parties HIAS, International Refugee Assistance Project (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit (Brief in Support) , # 2 Exhibit (Declaration of Rebecca Heller, Director of the International Refugee Assistance Project) , # 3 Exhibit (Declaration of Mark Hetfield, President and CEO of HIAS, Inc) , # 4 Certificate of Service)(Caballero, Mateo) Modified on 7/3/2017 (emt, ).
June 30, 2017 296 NOTICE of Appearance by Mateo Caballero on behalf of International Refugee Assistance Project, HIAS on behalf of International Refugee Assistance Project, HIAS. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Caballero, Mateo)
June 29, 2017 295 EO: The Court partially lifts the April 3, 2017 stay in this matter for the limited purpose of considering Plaintiffs' Emergency Motion to Clarify Scope of Preliminary Injunction. Dkt. No. 293 . Defendants shall file their opposition, limited to 20 pages, by Monday, July 3, 2017. Plaintiffs shall file any reply, limited to 15 pages, by Thursday, July 6, 2017. IT IS SO ORDERED. (JUDGE DERRICK K. WATSON)(watson1)CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications were served by first class mail on the date of this docket entry
June 29, 2017 294 Declaration of Neal K. Katyal in Support of 293 Plaintiff's Emergency MOTION to Clarify Scope of Preliminary Injunction re 291 Preliminary Injunction, . (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Ex. A, # 2 Exhibit Ex. B, # 3 Exhibit Ex. C, # 4 Exhibit Ex. D, # 5 Exhibit Ex. E, # 6 Certificate of Service)(Katyal, Neal) Modified on 6/30/2017 (emt, ).
June 29, 2017 293 Emergency MOTION to Clarify Scope of Preliminary Injunction re 291 Preliminary Injunction, Neal Katyal appearing for Plaintiff State of Hawaii (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum Memorandum of Law in Support of Emergency Motion to Clarify, # 2 Exhibit Proposed Order, # 3 Certificate of Service)(Katyal, Neal)
June 27, 2017 292 Appeal Remark re 271 Notice of Appeal, 9CCA NO. 17-15589 : Letter addressed to the Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals from the Supreme Court of the United States, dated June 26, 2017 Re: "The petition for a writ of certiorari in the above entitled case was filed on June 26, 2017 and placed on the docket June 26, 2017 as No. 16-1540." (emt, )No COS issued for this docket entry
June 19, 2017 291 AMENDED PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION. Signed by JUDGE DERRICK K. WATSON on 06/19/2017. (eps, )CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications were served by first class mail on the date of this docket entry
June 19, 2017 290 MANDATE of USCA as to 271 Notice of Appeal, filed by U.S. Department of State, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, Rex Tillerson, John F. Kelly, United States of America, Donald J. Trump, 9CCA NO. 17-15589: "The judgment of this Court, entered June 12, 201 7, takes effect this date. This constitutes the formal mandate of this Court issued pursuant to Rule 4l(a) of the Federal Rules of Appellate Procedure." (emt, )CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications were served by first class mail on the date of this docket entry
June 19, 2017 289 Featured Case ORDER of USCA as to 271 Notice of Appeal, filed by U.S. Department of State, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, Rex Tillerson, John F. Kelly, United States of America, Donald J. Trump, 9CCA NO. 17-15589: "The Government's consent motion to issue the mandate, Dkt. No. 316, is GRANTED. The mandate shall issue immediately." (emt, )CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications were served by first class mail on the date of this docket entry
June 12, 2017 288 Featured Case OPINION of USCA as to 271 Notice of Appeal, filed by U.S. Department of State, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, Rex Tillerson, John F. Kelly, United States of America, Donald J. Trump, 9CCA NO. 17-15589: "We affirm in part and vacate in part the district court's preliminary injunction order. As to the remaining Defendants, we affirm the injunction as to Section 2(c), suspending entry of nationals from the six designated countries for 90 days; Section 6(a), suspending USRAP for 120 days; and Section 6(b ), capping the entry of refugees to 50,000 in the fiscal year 2017. We vacate the portions of the injunction that prevent the Government from conducting internal reviews, as otherwise directed in Sections 2 and 6, and the injunction to the extent that it runs against the President. We remand the case to the district court with instructions to re-issue a preliminary injunction consistent with this opinion. AFFIRMED in part; VACATED in part; and REMANDED with Instructions. Each party shall bear its own costs on appeal." (emt, )CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParties served by the Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals.
June 9, 2017 287 Featured Case ORDER of USCA as to 271 Notice of Appeal, filed by U.S. Department of State, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, Rex Tillerson, John F. Kelly, United States of America, Donald J. Trump, 9CCA NO. 17-15589: "The Law Professors' motion for leave to file a brief as amici curiae, see Dkt.208, is granted." (emt, )CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParties served by the Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals.
May 24, 2017 286 Featured Case ORDER of USCA as to 271 Notice of Appeal, filed by U.S. Department of State, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, Rex Tillerson, John F. Kelly, United States of America, Donald J. Trump, 9CCA NO. 17-15589: "Plaintiffs-Appellees' motion for leave to supplement the record is GRANTED." (emt, )CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParties served by Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals.
April 21, 2017 285 Featured Case ORDER of USCA as to 271 Notice of Appeal, filed by U.S. Department of State, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, Rex Tillerson, John F. Kelly, United States of America, Donald J. Trump, 9CCA NO. 17-15589: "... initial en banc proceedings are concluded, and all remaining issues will be decided by the three-judge panel." "This case is scheduled for oral argument before the three-judge panel at 9:30 a.m. on Monday, May 15, 2017, in Seattle Washington." (emt, )CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParties served by the Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals.
April 10, 2017 282 TRANSCRIPT Designation and Ordering Form by State of Hawaii for proceedings held on 3/15/17; 3/29/17 before Judge Derrick K. Watson, (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Hagerty, Elizabeth)
April 3, 2017 280 EO: Rule 16 Scheduling Conference set for 4/18/2017 before Magistrate Judge Kevin Chang is hereby vacated. Refer to [ECF No. 279] Order issued by Judge Derrick K. Watson. (MAGISTRATE JUDGE KEVIN S.C. CHANG)(lls, )CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications were served by first class mail on the date of this docket entry
April 3, 2017 279 Featured Case ORDER re 277 - Signed by JUDGE DERRICK K. WATSON on 4/3/2017. "All deadlines in this case, including the Defendants' deadline to file a response to the Second Amended Complaint, the parties' deadline to file a Scheduling Conference Statement pursuant to Rule 16.2(b), and the deadline to hold a conference pursuant to Rule 26.1(a), are hereby STAYED. The Court also hereby CONTINUES the Rule 16 Scheduling Conference that had been set for April 18, 2017. It is further ORDERED that the parties shall submit, within fourteen days of the final disposition of appellate proceedings, a joint status report proposing the schedule for any further proceedings in this matter." Motion terminated: 277 Joint MOTION to Stay District Court Proceedings Pending Resolution of Defendants' Appeal filed by U.S. Department of State, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, Rex Tillerson, John F. Kelly, United States of America, Donald J. Trump. (emt, )CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications were served by first class mail on the date of this docket entry
April 3, 2017 278 Featured Case ORDER of USCA as to 271 Notice of Appeal, filed by U.S. Department of State, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, Rex Tillerson, John F. Kelly, United States of America, Donald J. Trump, 9CCA NO. 17-15589: "Appellants' unopposed motion to expedite the briefing and consideration of a motion to stay and to expedite the briefing and consideration of the merits of this preliminary injunction appeal (Docket Entry No. 12) is granted. The briefing schedule shall proceed as follows: the opening brief and the motion for a stay pending appeal are due April 7, 2017; the answering brief and the response to the motion for a stay pending appeal are due April 21, 2017; and the optional reply brief and the reply in support of the motion for a stay pending appeal are due April 28, 2017. Any amicus briefs are due April 21, 2017. The parties' request for expedited argument is granted. This case shall be heard on the calendar for May 2017, taking into account the limited dates the parties have advised they are available for argument." (emt, )CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParties served by the Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals.
April 3, 2017 277 Joint MOTION to Stay District Court Proceedings Pending Resolution of Defendants' Appeal Brad P. Rosenberg appearing for Defendants John F. Kelly, Rex Tillerson, Donald J. Trump, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, U.S. Department of State, United States of America (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order, # 2 Certificate of Service)(Rosenberg, Brad)
March 31, 2017 276 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings Mt. to convert TRO to PI held on March 29, 2017, - before Judge Derrick K. Watson. Court Reporter/Transcriber Gloria T. Bediamol, Telephone number (808) 541-2060. 90-Day Transcript Restriction: PACER access to filed transcripts is restricted for 90 days from the file date to permit redaction of personal identifiers. Citations to restricted transcripts in filed documents must be limited to those portions of the proceedings that are relevant and in need of judicial review. Attaching restricted transcripts, in their entirety, to filed documents should be limited to situations with specific need. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or ordered through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript. Redaction Request due 4/18/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/28/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/26/2017. pp. 45. (gb@hid.uscourts.gov)
March 31, 2017 275 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings Pltf. Mt. for TRO held on March 15, 2017, - before Judge Derrick K. Watson. Court Reporter/Transcriber Gloria T. Bediamol, Telephone number (808) 541-2060. 90-Day Transcript Restriction: PACER access to filed transcripts is restricted for 90 days from the file date to permit redaction of personal identifiers. Citations to restricted transcripts in filed documents must be limited to those portions of the proceedings that are relevant and in need of judicial review. Attaching restricted transcripts, in their entirety, to filed documents should be limited to situations with specific need. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or ordered through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript. Redaction Request due 4/18/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/28/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/26/2017. pp. 55. (gb@hid.uscourts.gov)
March 31, 2017 274 TRANSCRIPT Designation and Ordering Form by John F. Kelly, Rex Tillerson, Donald J. Trump, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, U.S. Department of State, United States of America (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Rosenberg, Brad)
March 30, 2017 273 Attorney Appeal Packet re 271 Notice of Appeal filed by by John F. Kelly, Rex Tillerson, Donald J. Trump, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, U.S. Department of State, United States of America, 9CCA NO. 17-15589. (Attachments: # 1 Notice of Appeal, # 2 Instructions for Civil Appeals, # 3 Additional Instructions for Transcript Designation and Ordering Form, # 4 Letter Re: Court Reporters, # 5 Transcript Designation and Ordering Form, # 6 Docket Sheet) (emt, )CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications were served by first class mail on the date of this docket entry
March 30, 2017 272 USCA Case Number 17-15589 for 271 Notice of Appeal, filed by U.S. Department of State, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, Rex Tillerson, John F. Kelly, United States of America, Donald J. Trump. (emt, )CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParties served by Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals.
March 30, 2017 271 NOTICE OF APPEAL as to 219 Order on Motion for TRO,, 270 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief,,,,, by John F. Kelly, Rex Tillerson, Donald J. Trump, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, U.S. Department of State, United States of America. (Rosenberg, Brad) Modified on 3/30/2017 9CCA NO. 17-15589 (emt, ).
March 29, 2017 270 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO CONVERT TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER TO A PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION re 238 - Signed by JUDGE DERRICK K. WATSON on 3/29/2017. "It is hereby ADJUDGED, ORDERED, and DECREED that: Defendants and all their respective officers, agents, servants, employees, and attorneys, and persons in active concert or participation with them, are hereby enjoined from enforcing or implementing Sections 2 and 6 of the Executive Order across the Nation. Enforcement of these provisions in all places, including the United States, at all United States borders and ports of entry, and in the issuance of visas is prohibited, pending further orders from this Court. No security bond is required under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 65(c). The Court declines to stay this ruling or hold it in abeyance should an appeal of this order be filed." (emt, )CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications were served by first class mail on the date of this docket entry
March 29, 2017 COURT'S CERTIFICATE of Service - a copy of 269 Order on Motion For Leave To Appear Amicus Curiae and Motion For Leave To File Amicus Brief filed by Lamar C. Chapman III has been served by First Class Mail to Mr. Chapman at the address located on mailing documentation on 3/29/2017.Registered Participants of CM/ECF received the document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). (tyk)
March 29, 2017 269 EO: Court denies 266 Motion For Leave To Appear Amicus Curiae and Motion For Leave To File Amicus Brief filed by Lamar C. Chapman III. (JUDGE DERRICK K. WATSON)(tyk)CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications were served by first class mail on the date of this docket entry
March 29, 2017 268 EP: Hearing held on 238 Plaintiffs' Motion To Convert Temporary Restraining Order To A Preliminary Injunction.Oral arguments heard. Motion taken under Advisement. Court to issue a written order. (Court Reporter Gloria Bediamol) (JUDGE DERRICK K. WATSON)(tyk)CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications were served by first class mail on the date of this docket entry
March 29, 2017 267 MEMORANDUM re 238 MOTION to Convert Temporary Restraining Order to Preliminary Injunction [Brief of HIAS Amicus Curiae in Support of 238 filed by HIAS. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Munger, Lisa)
March 28, 2017 266 (Notice of Filing); MOTION for Leave to Appear Amicus Curiae - by Amicus Lamar Christopher Chapman, III. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Brief of Amicus, # 2 Mailing Documentation) (emt, )
March 28, 2017 265 EO: The Court grants 261 Motion For Leave To File Brief Of HIAS As Amicus Curiae In Support Of Plaintiffs' Motion To Convert Temporary Restraining Order To A Preliminary Injunction. (JUDGE DERRICK K. WATSON)(tyk)CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications were served by first class mail on the date of this docket entry
March 28, 2017 264 Featured Case ORDER Approving Blogging Request for 03/29/2017 as to Hawaii News Now Representatives Jim Mendoza and Ian Scheuring. Signed by JUDGE DERRICK K. WATSON on 03/28/2017. (apg, dist)CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications were served by first class mail on the date of this docket entry
March 28, 2017 263 Featured Case ORDER Approving request for Media Blogging on 03/29/2017 as to Reuters News representative Roy Hunter Haskings. Signed by JUDGE DERRICK K. WATSON on 03/28/2017. (apg, dist)CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications were served by first class mail on the date of this docket entry
March 28, 2017 262 EO: On 3/28/17, G. Eric Brunstad, Jr. filed a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Doc. No. 260. The Court finds that the Motion satisfies the requirements set forth in Rule 83.1(e) of the Local Rules of Practice for the U.S. District Court for the District of Hawaii. Accordingly, the Court GRANTS the Motion and will permit Mr. Brunstad to appear before this Court in this action. (MAGISTRATE JUDGE KEVIN S.C. CHANG)(chang1)CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications were served by first class mail on the date of this docket entry
March 28, 2017 261 MOTION for Leave to File Brief of HIAS as Amicus Curiae in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion to Convert Temporary Restraining Order to a Preliminary Injunction Lisa W. Munger appearing for Amicus HIAS (Attachments: # 1 Attachment [Brief of Amicus Curiae ISO Plaintiffs' Mtn to Convert TRO to a PI], # 2 Certificate of Service)(Munger, Lisa)
March 28, 2017 260 SUPPLEMENT by HIAS in Response to 259 EO Denying w/out Prejudice 255 Mtn to Appear PHV [G. Eric Brunstad, Jr.]. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Counsel [G. Eric Brunstad, Jr.], # 2 [Proposed] Order Granting Mtn for PHV [G. Eric Brunstad, Jr.], # 3 Certificate of Service)(Munger, Lisa)
March 28, 2017 259 EO: On 3/28/17, G. Eric Brunstad, Jr. filed a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice 255 . Although Mr. Brunstad satisfies the requirements set forth in Local Rule 83.1(e), he failed to provide a response to paragraph 7 of his declaration, which asks that counsel identify the courts in which he or she is a registered CM/ECF user. Accordingly, the Motion is deficient and it is DENIED without prejudice. (MAGISTRATE JUDGE KEVIN S.C. CHANG)(chang1)CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications were served by first class mail on the date of this docket entry
March 28, 2017 258 NOTICE of Filing of Declaration of Lawrence E. Bartlett by John F. Kelly, Rex Tillerson, Donald J. Trump, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, U.S. Department of State, United States of America re 238 MOTION to Convert Temporary Restraining Order to Preliminary Injunction , 251 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion . (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Lawrence E. Bartlett, # 2 Certificate of Service)(Rosenberg, Brad) Modified on 3/29/2017 (emt, ).
March 28, 2017 257 Featured Case ORDER Approving Blogging request on 03/29/2017 for Daily Kos representative Joyce M. Brown. Signed by JUDGE DERRICK K. WATSON on 3/28/2017. (apg, dist)CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications were served by first class mail on the date of this docket entry
March 28, 2017 256 Featured Case ORDER Approving Request for Media Blogging on 03/29/2017 as to CNN representative Traci Tamura. Signed by JUDGE DERRICK K. WATSON on 3/28/2017. (apg, dist)CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications were served by first class mail on the date of this docket entry
March 28, 2017 255 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice [G. Eric Brunstad, Jr.] Filing fee $ 300, receipt number 0975-1849280.Lisa W. Munger appearing for Amicus HIAS (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Counsel [G. Eric Brunstad, Jr.], # 2 [Proposed] Order Granting Mtn to Appear PHV [G. Eric Brunstad, Jr.], # 3 Certificate of Service)(Munger, Lisa)
March 27, 2017 254 NOTICE of Appearance by Chad A. Readler on behalf of John F. Kelly, Rex Tillerson, Donald J. Trump, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, U.S. Department of State, United States of America on behalf of John F. Kelly, Rex Tillerson, Donald J. Trump, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, U.S. Department of State, United States of America. (Readler, Chad)
March 25, 2017 253 Declaration re 252 Reply to Response to Motion, Supplemental Declaration of Neal K. Katyal. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit D (DHS Fact Sheet), # 2 Exhibit E (DHS Q&A), # 3 Exhibit F (N.Y. Times Article), # 4 Certificate of Service)(Katyal, Neal)
March 25, 2017 252 REPLY to Response to Motion re 238 MOTION to Convert Temporary Restraining Order to Preliminary Injunction filed by Ismail Elshikh, State of Hawaii. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Word Count, # 2 Certificate of Service)(Katyal, Neal)
March 24, 2017 251 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re 238 MOTION to Convert Temporary Restraining Order to Preliminary Injunction filed by John F. Kelly, Rex Tillerson, Donald J. Trump, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, U.S. Department of State, United States of America. (Attachments: # 1 Sarsour v. Trump Slip Opinion, # 2 Washington v. Trump Order Containing Dissents)(Rosenberg, Brad)
March 24, 2017 250 RAISING POLITICAL QUESTION NONJUSTICIABILITY, AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF from Professor Victor Williams, of the America First Lawyers Association, in Support of President Donald Trump re 238 - by Victor Williams, on behalf of America First Lawyers Association. Note: Permission to file the amicus curiae brief was granted pursuant to 248 Minute Order. (emt, )
March 24, 2017 249 EO: On 3/23/17, Benna Ruth Solomon filed a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Doc. No. 245. The Court finds that the Motion satisfies the requirements set forth in Rule 83.1(e) of the Local Rules of Practice for the U.S. District Court for the District of Hawaii. Accordingly, the Court GRANTS the Motion 245 and will permit Ms. Solomon to appear before this Court in this action. (MAGISTRATE JUDGE KEVIN S.C. CHANG)(chang1)CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications were served by first class mail on the date of this docket entry
March 23, 2017 248 EO: The Court hereby grants 233 the Motion For Leave to File a Brief Amicus Curiae, Raising Political Question of Nonjusticiability From Professor Victor Williams of the America First Lawyers Association, in Support of President Donald Trump and 246 the Motion For Leave To File Brief of Chicago, Los Angeles, New York, Philadelphia, and Other Major Cities and Counties As Amici Curiae in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion to Convert the Temporary Restraining Order to a Preliminary Injunction. IT IS SO ORDERED. (JUDGE DERRICK K. WATSON)(tl, )CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications were served by first class mail on the date of this docket entry
March 23, 2017 247 MOTION for Leave to File Brief of Chicago, Los Angeles, New York, Philadephia, and Other Major Cities and Counties as Amici Curiae in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion to Convert the Temporary Restraining Order to a Preliminary Injunction (Dkt 238) Robert M. Kohn appearing for Amicus City and County of Honolulu (Attachments: # 1 Supplement Proposed Amici Curiae Brief, # 2 Appendix, # 3 Certificate of Service)(Kohn, Robert)
March 23, 2017 246 (refer to docket entry 247 ): MOTION for Leave to File Brief of Chicago, Los Angeles, New York, Philadelphia, and Other Major Cities and Counties As Amici Curiae in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion to Convert the Temporary Restraining Order to a Preliminary Injunction (Dkt. 238) Robert M. Kohn appearing for Amicus City and County of Honolulu (Kohn, Robert) DOCKET TEXT ENTRY modified on 3/23/2017: Motion to be re-filed to include the signature of filing party Robert Kohn and to re-submit the document in separate pdf-attachments. (afc) Modified on 3/24/2017 (emt, ).
March 23, 2017 245 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice ;Declaration of Counsel; Proposed Order Granting Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Benna Ruth Solomon Filing fee $ 300, receipt number 0975-1848080.Robert M. Kohn appearing for Amicus City and County of Honolulu (Kohn, Robert)
March 23, 2017 244 NOTICE of Limited Appearance by Robert M. Kohn and Nicolette Winter on behalf of City and County of Honolulu on behalf of City and County of Honolulu. (Kohn, Robert) Modified on 3/24/2017 -- The Notice of Appearance is only signed by Robert M. Kohn but states that both Robert M. Kohn and Nicolette Winter are making an appearance on behalf of the City and County of Honolulu. (emt, ).
March 22, 2017 243 EO: The Court is in receipt of a Motion to Intervene filed by Mikki the Mime. Dkt. No 241. The Motion is DENIED. The Motion identifies no statutory right to intervene within the meaning of either Fed.R.Civ.P. 24(a) or 24(b). Moreover, the disposition of this action will not impair or impede Movant's ability to protect her rights or interests. Finally, Movant has no claim or defense that shares with the main action a common question of law or fact sufficient for the Court to exercise its discretion in favor of intervention. IT IS SO ORDERED. (JUDGE DERRICK K. WATSON)(tl, )CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications were served by first class mail on the date of this docket entry
March 22, 2017 242 EO: Rule 16 Scheduling Conference set for 4/3/2017 is hereby continued to 09:30AM on 4/18/2017 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE KEVIN S.C. CHANG. Judge Chang is on unavailable status on 4/3/2017. (MAGISTRATE JUDGE KEVIN S.C. CHANG)(lls, )CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications were served by first class mail on the date of this docket entry
March 21, 2017 241 Mikki the Mime's MOTION to Intervene Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 24(a) and (b) - by Intervenor Joseph Camp. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Transmittal Letter, # 5 Mailing Documentation) (emt, )
March 21, 2017 240 EO: The Court is in receipt of a Motion to Intervene entitled, ''Tertius Interveniens Notice of Lack of Standing of State of Hawaii to Challenge President's Executive Order (Travel Ban)'' filed by Eric Richard Eleson. Dkt. No 237. The Motion is DENIED. The Motion identifies no statutory right to intervene within the meaning of either Fed.R.Civ.P. 24(a) or 24(b). Moreover, the disposition of this action will not impair or impede Eleson's ability to protect his rights or interests. Eleson has no claim or defense that shares with the main action a common question of law or fact sufficient for the Court to exercise its discretion in favor of intervention. Finally, to the extent Eleson seeks permissive joinder pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 20(a)(2)(B), the Motion is likewise without merit. IT IS SO ORDERED. (JUDGE DERRICK K. WATSON)(tl, )CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications were served by first class mail on the date of this docket entry
March 21, 2017 239 Declaration re 238 MOTION to Convert Temporary Restraining Order to Preliminary Injunction of Neal K. Katyal. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Certificate of Service)(Katyal, Neal)
March 21, 2017 238 MOTION to Convert Temporary Restraining Order to Preliminary Injunction Neal Katyal appearing for Plaintiff State of Hawaii (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum, # 2 Exhibit Proposed Order, # 3 Certificate of Service)(Katyal, Neal)
March 20, 2017 237 MOTION to Intervene ("Tertius Interveniens Notice of Lack of Standing of State of Hawaii to Challenge President's Executive Order (Travel Ban)); (FRCVP Rule 20(a)(2)(B) & 28 USC 1397)" - by Intervenor Eric Richard Eleson. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Certificate of Service, # 8 Mailing Documentation) (emt, )
March 20, 2017 236 EO: The Court is in receipt of the parties' Joint Motion For Entry Of Proposed Briefing Schedule Order For Plaintiffs' Forthcoming Motion to Convert Temporary Restraining Order to a Preliminary Injunction. Dkt. No. 235. The Court enters the following briefing schedule: Plaintiffs shall file their Motion to Convert Temporary Restraining Order to a Preliminary Injunction ("Motion") by 9:30 A.M. H.S.T. on Tuesday, March 21, 2017. The Government shall file its Opposition by 9:30 A.M. H.S.T. on Friday, March 24, 2017. Plaintiffs shall file their Reply by 9:30 A.M. H.S.T. on Saturday, March 25, 2017. The Court will hold a hearing on Plaintiffs' forthcoming Motion at 9:30 A.M. H.S.T. on Wednesday, March 29, 2017. Counsel may participate by phone by notifying Judge Watson's Courtroom Manager by Tuesday, March 28, 2017 and providing the phone number where counsel may be reached at the time of the hearing. The Court will contact the parties via phone at the time of the hearing. The Court advises that the hearing date/time may be changed, or vacated, upon review of the briefs. Per the parties' stipulation, the Court's Temporary Restraining Order ("TRO") of March 15, 2017 (Dkt. No. 219) shall remain in place until such time as the Court rules on whether the TRO should be converted to a preliminary injunction or until otherwise ordered by the Court. IT IS SO ORDERED.(JUDGE DERRICK K. WATSON)(watson1)CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications were served by first class mail on the date of this docket entry
March 20, 2017 235 Joint MOTION for Briefing Schedule Neal Katyal appearing for Plaintiff State of Hawaii (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Proposed Order, # 2 Certificate of Service)(Katyal, Neal)
March 19, 2017 232 Corporate Disclosure Statement by New York University. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Black, Claire)
March 19, 2017 231 Errata re 228 Response to Mot. to Clarify. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service COS for Errata)(Marie-Iha, Deirdre)
March 19, 2017 230 EO: In light of the Court's TRO directing the parties to submit a certain "stipulated briefing and hearing schedule," the parties' briefs relating to the Federal Defendants' Motion for Clarification of TRO, and the Court's EO regarding the same (Dkt. No. 229), the parties are further directed to advise the Court whether a stipulated path has been reached regarding proceedings before this Court concerning a possible extension of the Court's TRO. If a status conference is necessary, the parties are requested to contact Tammy Kimura, Courtroom Manager, forthwith. IT IS SO ORDERED. (JUDGE DERRICK K. WATSON)(watson1)CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications were served by first class mail on the date of this docket entry
March 19, 2017 229 EO: The Court is in receipt of the Federal Defendants' Motion for Clarification of TRO. Dkt. No. 227. That Motion essentially asks whether the Court's March 15, 2017 Temporary Restraining Order was intended to apply to Sections 2 and 6 of the Executive Order. The Motion, in other words, asks the Court to make a distinction that the Federal Defendants' previous briefs and arguments never did. As important, there is nothing unclear about the scope of the Court's order. See Dkt. No. 219 (TRO) at 42 ("Defendants... are hereby enjoined from enforcing or implementing Sections 2 and 6 of the Executive Order across the Nation."). The Federal Defendants' Motion is DENIED. (JUDGE DERRICK K. WATSON)(watson1)CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications were served by first class mail on the date of this docket entry
March 18, 2017 228 OPPOSITION to 227 MOTION for Clarification of TRO re 219 Order on Motion for TRO, filed by State of Hawaii. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Katyal, Neal) Modified on 3/20/2017 (emt, ).
March 17, 2017 227 MOTION for Clarification re 219 Order on Motion for TRO, Brad P. Rosenberg appearing for Defendants John F. Kelly, Rex Tillerson, Donald J. Trump, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, U.S. Department of State, United States of America (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion for Clarification, # 2 Certificate of Service)(Rosenberg, Brad) Modified on 3/20/2017 (emt, ).
March 16, 2017 233 MOTION for Leave to File a Brief Amicus Curiae, Raising Political Question Nonjusticiability, from Professor Victor Williams of the America First Lawyers Association, in Support of President Donald J. Trump - by Amicus Victor Williams. (Attachments: # 1 Transmittal Letter dated March 13, 2017) (emt, )
March 16, 2017 225 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Technology Companies and Other Businesses identifying Other Affiliate Uber Technologies, Inc., Other Affiliate Affirm, Inc., Other Affiliate Ancestry.com, LLC, Other Affiliate AppDynamics, Inc., Other Affiliate Codecademy, Other Affiliate Knotel, Other Affiliate Squarespace, Inc., Other Affiliate Thumbtack, Inc., Other Affiliate Via for Technology Companies and Other Businesses.. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Bronster, Margery)
March 16, 2017 223 EO: The Court grants 222 Motion For Leave To Include Additional Amici To Amici Curiae Technology Companies and Other Businesses' Amicus Brief [Dkt No. 271]. (JUDGE DERRICK K. WATSON)(tyk)CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications were served by first class mail on the date of this docket entry
March 15, 2017 222 MOTION re 217 Memorandum, [Motion for Leave to Include Additional Amici to Amici Curiae Technology Companies and Other Businesses' Amicus Brief] Margery S. Bronster appearing for Amicus Technology Companies and Other Businesses (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Bronster, Margery)
March 15, 2017 221 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Technology Companies and Other Businesses identifying Other Affiliate Tripadvisor LLC, Other Affiliate Airbnb, Inc., Other Affiliate AltSchool, PBC, Other Affiliate Ampush LLC, Other Affiliate Appboy, Inc., Other Affiliate Appnexus, Inc., Other Affiliate Azavea, Other Affiliate CareZone, Inc., Other Affiliate Chegg, Inc., Other Affiliate Cloudera, Inc., Other Affiliate Color Genomics, Inc., Other Affiliate Copia Institute, Other Affiliate DoorDash, Other Affiliate Dropbox, Inc., Other Affiliate Electronic Arts Inc., Other Affiliate EquityZen Inc., Other Affiliate Evernote Corporation, Other Affiliate Flipboard, Other Affiliate General Assembly Space, Inc., Other Affiliate Glassdoor, Inc., Other Affiliate Greenhouse Software, Inc., Other Affiliate IDEO, Other Affiliate Imgur, Inc., Other Affiliate Indiegogo, Inc., Other Affiliate Kargo Global, Inc., Other Affiliate Kickstarter, PBC, Other Affiliate Light, Other Affiliate Linden Research, Inc. d/b/a Linden Lab, Other Affiliate Lithium Technologies, Inc., Other Affiliate Lyft, Inc., Other Affiliate Lytro, Inc., Other Affiliate Mapbox Inc., Other Affiliate Marin Software Incorporated, Other Affiliate Meetup, Inc., Other Affiliate Memebox Corporation, Other Affiliate MongoDB, Inc., Other Affiliate NetApp, Inc., Other Affiliate Patreon, Inc., Other Affiliate Pinterest, Inc., Other Affiliate Postmates Inc., Other Affiliate Quora, Inc., Other Affiliate RealNetworks, Inc., Other Affiliate RetailMeNot, Inc., Other Affiliate Rocket Lawyer Incorporated, Other Affiliate Shutterstock, Inc., Other Affiliate Square, Inc., Other Affiliate Strava, Inc., Other Affiliate SugarCRM, Other Affiliate Sunrun, Inc., Other Affiliate Turo, Inc., Other Affiliate Twilio Inc., Other Affiliate Udacity, Inc., Other Affiliate Upwork, Other Affiliate Warby Parker, Other Affiliate Wikimedia Foundation, Inc., Other Affiliate Work & Co, Other Affiliate Y Combinator Management, LLC, Other Affiliate Zendesk, Inc. for Technology Companies and Other Businesses.. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Bronster, Margery)
March 15, 2017 220 EP: Hearing held on 65 Plaintiffs' Motion For Temporary Restraining Order. Oral arguments heard. Motion taken under Advisement. Court to issue a written order. (Court Reporter Gloria Bediamol) (JUDGE DERRICK K. WATSON)(tyk)CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications were served by first class mail on the date of this docket entry
March 15, 2017 219 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER 65 . Signed by JUDGE DERRICK K. WATSON on 3/15/2017. (ecs, )CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications were served by first class mail on the date of this docket entry (Main Document 219 replaced on 3/22/2017) (mta, ).
March 15, 2017 218 MEMORANDUM in Support re 2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by State of Illinois. (Franklin, David)
March 15, 2017 217 MEMORANDUM re 215 Order on Motion for Leave to File, Link,,,, 65 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order [Amici Curiae Brief in Opposition Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Temporary Restraining Order] filed by Technology Companies and Other Businesses. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix A_(List of Technology Companies and Other Businesses), # 2 Certificate of Service)(Bronster, Margery) Modified on 3/15/2017 (emt, ).
March 15, 2017 216 Featured Case ORDER Approving Request for Media Blogging as to representative Barbara Tanabe of New Your Times on 3/15/2017.Signed by JUDGE DERRICK K. WATSON on 03/15/2017. (apg, dist)CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications were served by first class mail on the date of this docket entry
March 15, 2017 215 EO: The Court grants 65 Motion For Leave To File Brief Of Amici Curiae Technology Companies And Other Businesses In Support Of Plaintiffs' Motion For A Temporary Restraining Order. (JUDGE DERRICK K. WATSON)(tyk)CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications were served by first class mail on the date of this docket entry
March 14, 2017 214 EO: On 3/14/17, Robert A. Atkins [Doc. No. 207] and Andrew J. Ehrlich [Doc. No. 208] filed Motions to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court finds that the Motions satisfy the requirements set forth in Rule 83.1(e) of the Local Rules of Practice for the U.S. District Court for the District of Hawaii. Accordingly, the Court GRANTS the Motions and hereby permits Messrs. Atkins and Ehrlich to appear before this Court in this action.(MAGISTRATE JUDGE KEVIN S.C. CHANG)(chang1)CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications were served by first class mail on the date of this docket entry
March 14, 2017 213 EO: On 3/14/17, Pietro J. Signoracci filed a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. [Doc. No. 209]. The Court finds that the Motion satisfies the requirements set forth in Rule 83.1(e) of the Local Rules of Practice for the U.S. District Court for the District of Hawaii. Accordingly, the Court GRANTS the Motion and will permit Mr. Signoracci to appear before this Court in this action. (MAGISTRATE JUDGE KEVIN S.C. CHANG)(chang1)CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications were served by first class mail on the date of this docket entry
March 14, 2017 212 MEMORANDUM in Support of 65 Plaintiffs' Motion for Temporary Restraining Order filed by New York University. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Black, Claire)
March 14, 2017 211 MOTION for Leave to File Brief of Amici Curiae in Support of 65 Plaintiff's Motion for a Temporary Restraining Order] Margery S. Bronster appearing for Amicus Technology Companies and Other Businesses (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1_proposed Amici Curiae Brief, # 2 Certificate of Service)(Bronster, Margery)
March 14, 2017 210 EO: The Court grants 185 Motion For Leave To Add Additional Amici To Amici Curiae Interfaith Coalition's Amicus Brief and 203 Motion For Leave To File Brief On Behalf Of New York University As Amicus Curiae In Support of Plaintiffs' Motion For Temporary Restraining Order. (JUDGE DERRICK K. WATSON)(tyk)CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications were served by first class mail on the date of this docket entry
March 14, 2017 209 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice [Pietro J. Signoracci] Filing fee $ 300, receipt number 0975-1843894.Margery S. Bronster appearing for Amicus Technology Companies and Other Businesses (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Counsel, # 2 Certificate of Service)(Bronster, Margery)
March 14, 2017 208 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice [Andrew J. Ehrlich] Filing fee $ 300, receipt number 0975-1843891.Margery S. Bronster appearing for Amicus Technology Companies and Other Businesses (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Counsel, # 2 Certificate of Service)(Bronster, Margery)
March 14, 2017 207 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice [Robert A. Atkins] Filing fee $ 300, receipt number 0975-1843890.Margery S. Bronster appearing for Amicus Technology Companies and Other Businesses (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Counsel, # 2 Certificate of Service)(Bronster, Margery)
March 14, 2017 206 NOTICE of Appearance by Melinda M Weaver on behalf of Technology Companies and Other Businesses on behalf of Technology Companies and Other Businesses. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Weaver, Melinda)
March 14, 2017 205 NOTICE of Appearance by Margery S. Bronster on behalf of Technology Companies and Other Businesses on behalf of Technology Companies and Other Businesses. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Bronster, Margery)
March 14, 2017 204 MEMORANDUM re 65 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order Brief of Amicus Curiae of the Roderick and Solange MacArthur Justice Center in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for a Temporary Restraining Order; Certificate of Word Count; Certificate of Service filed by Roderick and Solange MacArthur Justice Center. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Word Count, # 2 Certificate of Service)(Minkin, David)
March 14, 2017 203 MOTION for Leave to File Motion for Leave To File Brief on Behalf of New York University as Amicus Curiae in Support of Plaintiffs Motion for Temporary Restraining Order; Exhibit A (Proposed Brief); Certificate of Service Claire Wong Black appearing for Amicus New York University (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Brief, # 2 Certificate of Service)(Black, Claire)
March 14, 2017 202 MEMORANDUM re 98 MOTION for Leave to File Amici Curiae Brief in Support of Plaintiffs Brief of the Fred T. Korematsu Center for Law and Equality, Jay Hirabayashi, Holly Yasui, Karen Korematsu, Civil Rights Organizations, and National Bar Associations of Color, as Amici Curiae in Support of Plaintiffs; Certificate of Service filed by Asian American Legal Defense And Education Fund (AALDEF), Asian Americans Advancing Justice (AAJC), Asian Americans Advancing Justice (Asian Law Caucus), Asian Americans Advancing Justice (Atlanta), Asian Americans Advancing Justice (Chicago), Asian Americans Advancing Justice (Los Angeles), Fred T. Korematsu Center for Law and Equality, Jay Hirabayashi, Hispanic National Bar Association (HNBA), Japanese American Citizens League, Honolulu Chapter (JACL Honolulu), Karen Korematsu, LatinoJustice PRLDEF, Inc., National Bar Association, South Asian Bar Association of North America (SABA North America), Holly Yasui. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Ing, Louise)
March 14, 2017 201 MEMORANDUM re 65 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by T.A.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Certificate of Service)(Iwao, Regan)
March 14, 2017 200 Featured Case ORDER Approving request for Media Blogging on 03/15/2017 as to representative Liz Barney of The Guardian.Signed by JUDGE DERRICK K. WATSON on 03/14/2017. (apg, dist)CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications were served by first class mail on the date of this docket entry
March 14, 2017 199 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING MOTIONS TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE KEVIN S.C. CHANG on 3/14/2017. Motions to Appear Pro Hac Vice Granted : 1) Seth D. Fiur [doc. no. 177 ]; 2) Steven E. Obus [doc. no. 178 ]; 3) Tiffany M. Woo[doc. no. 179 ]; and 4) Terrance J. Nolan [doc. no. 180 ] for party Amicus Curiae New York University. (ecs, )CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications were served by first class mail on the date of this docket entry
March 14, 2017 198 MEMORANDUM re 65 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order [MUSLIM ADVOCATES, AMERICAN MUSLIM HEALTH PROFESSIONALS, MUPPIES, INC., THE NATIONAL ARAB AMERICAN MEDICAL ASSOCIATION, AND NETWORK OF ARAB-AMERICAN PROFESSIONALS' BRIEF OF AMICI CURIAE IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR A TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER], filed by American Muslim Health Professionals, Muppies, Inc., Muslim Advocates, Network of Arab-American Professionals, The National Arab American Medical Association. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Anton A. Ware, # 2 Exhibit 1 - Shutdown Press Release, # 3 Exhibit 2 - Anderson Cooper Interview, # 4 Exhibit 3 - State Rudy Guiliani, # 5 Exhibit 4 - Miller on Fox News, # 6 Exhibit 5 - WaPo Kansas Suspect, # 7 Exhibit 6 - Seattle Kent, # 8 Exhibit 7 - Fire store owner, # 9 Exhibit 8 - WaPo pipe attack, # 10 Exhibit 9 - Spate of mosque fires stretches across the country, # 11 Exhibit 10 - Politico absolute no choice but to close down mosques, # 12 Exhibit 11 - Georgetown Bridge Initiative Trump Cites Flowed Poll, # 13 Exhibit 12 - Republican Candidates Debate in North Charleston, South Carolina, # 14 Exhibit 13 - Transcript Donald Trump's national security speech, # 15 Exhibit 14 - 60 Minutes Trranscript, # 16 Exhibit 15 - Meet the Press, # 17 Exhibit 16 - Presidential Candidates Debates, # 18 Exhibit 17 - Christian Broadcasting Network, # 19 Exhibit 18 - Donald Trump on Twitter defends Muslim ban, calls work a 'horrible mess', # 20 Exhibit 19 - Pew Reseach Center 2016 Refugees, # 21 Exhibit 20 - DJT Tweet, # 22 Exhibit 21 - So called judge tweet, # 23 Exhibit 22 - See you in court tweet, # 24 Exhibit 23 - Sean Spicer press conference, # 25 Exhibit 24 - Stephen Miller key engineer, # 26 Exhibit 25 - Stephen Miller Islamofascism, # 27 Exhibit 26 - Pew Forum, # 28 Exhibit 27 - State Dept Country Report, # 29 Exhibit 28 - DHS, # 30 Exhibit 29 - DOJ Iraqi Kentucky, # 31 Exhibit 30 - Cato, # 32 Exhibit 31 - Lawfare, # 33 Exhibit 32 - Brennan Center, # 34 Exhibit 33 - Letter Former Officials on March 6 EO, # 35 Exhibit 34 - Trump delays new travel ban after well-reviewed speech - CNN Politics, # 36 Exhibit 35 - Families hoping to make the U.S., # 37 Exhibit 36 - Trump Muslim ban is tearing apart families, # 38 Exhibit 37 - Children and Refugees Who Planned Medical Care in the US Stuck After Trump Executive Order - Health News - ABC News Radio, # 39 Exhibit 38 - Trump's Travel Ban, Aimed at Terrorists, Has Blocked Doctors - The New York Times, # 40 Certificate of Service)(Kacprowski, Nickolas) Modified on docket title text on 3/14/2017 (ecs, ).
March 14, 2017 197 MEMORANDUM re 65 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order Brief of Amici Curiae Interfaith Coalition in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for a Temporary Restraining Order [Doc. No. 65]; Certificate of Service filed by Congregation B'nai Jeshurun, Congregation Beit Simchat Torah, Reverend Curtis W. Hart, Hyde Park & Kenwood Interfaith Council, Rabbi Sharon Kleinbaum, Rabbi Noa Kushner, Rabbi Joy Levitt, Rabbi Joel Mosbacher, Imam Abdul Malik Mujahid, Rabbi James Ponet, Rabbi Frederick Reeves, Rabbi John Rosove, Rabbi Michael Strassfeld, The Muslim Public Affairs Council, The Right Reverend Allen K. Shin, Bishop Suffragan of the Episcopal, The Right Reverend Andrew Dietsche, Episcopal Bishop of New York, The Right Reverend Lawrence C. Provenzano, Episcopal Bishop of Long Island, The Right Reverend Marc Handley Andrus, Episcopal Bishop of California, The Right Reverend Mary D. Glasspool, Bishop Assistant of the Episcopal Diocese of New York, The Sikh Coalition, Reverend Timothy Tutt, Union Theological Seminary, United Methodist Women, Rabbi Peretz Wolf-Prusan. (Benedict, Thomas)
March 14, 2017 196 Featured Case ORDER Approving Request for Media Blogging a to Fumiko Chun of TBS, Tokyo Broadcasting Service on 03/15/2017.Signed by JUDGE DERRICK K. WATSON on 03/14/2017. (apg, dist)CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications were served by first class mail on the date of this docket entry
March 14, 2017 COURT'S CERTIFICATE of Service - a copy of 190 Order on Motion to Intervene has been served upon Vincent Lucas, Ph.D. electronically at the email address listed on the pleading on March 14, 2017. Registered Participants of CM/ECF received the document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). (tyk)
March 14, 2017 195 MEMORANDUM re 65 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order [Brief of Amici Curiae] filed by HIAS, Human Rights First, KIND (Kids in Need of Defense), Tahirih Justice Center. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Munger, Lisa)
March 14, 2017 194 RESPONSE in Support re 65 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Massachusetts Technology Leadership Council, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Tobin, Brett)
March 14, 2017 193 EO: On 3/13/17, proposed intervenor Vincent Lucas filed a Motion to Expedite His Motion to Intervene and to Permit Him to Use the Court's ECF System as a Filing User. Given that Judge Watson denied Mr. Lucas' Motion to Intervene, doc. no. 190 , the present Motion is DENIED as MOOT. (MAGISTRATE JUDGE KEVIN S.C. CHANG)(chang1)CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications were served by first class mail on the date of this docket entry
March 14, 2017 192 MEMORANDUM in Support re 65 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order (Brief of Amicus Curiae) filed by Anti-Defamation League. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix, # 2 Certificate of Service)(Altman, Nicole) Modified on 3/14/2017 (emt, ).
March 14, 2017 COURT'S CERTIFICATE of Service - a copy of 190 Order on Motions to Intervene has been served by First Class Mail upon Frederick Banks at the address of record on March 14, 2017. Registered Participants of CM/ECF received the document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). (tyk)
March 14, 2017 191 REPLY to Response to Motion re 65 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by State of Hawaii. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Word Count, # 2 Certificate of Service)(Katyal, Neal)
March 14, 2017 190 EO: The Court is in receipt of the Motions to Intervene filed by Frederick Banks and Vincent Lucas. Dkt. Nos. 183 and 189. The Motions are DENIED. Neither Motion identifies a statutory right to intervene within the meaning of either Fed.R.Civ.P. 24(a) or 24(b). Moreover, the disposition of this action will not impair or impede either Movant's ability to protect his rights or interests. Finally, neither Movant has a claim or defense that shares with the main action a common question of law or fact sufficient for the Court to exercise its discretion in favor of intervention. IT IS SO ORDERED. (JUDGE DERRICK K. WATSON)(tyk)CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications were served by first class mail on the date of this docket entry
March 14, 2017 188 EO: Judicial Conference of the United States policy allows a judge to authorize broadcasting of court proceedings to adjacent areas for the purpose of judicial administration. Consistent with that policy, the Court hereby authorizes the audio of the hearing on Plaintiffs' motion for temporary restraining order, set for March 15, 2017 at 9:30 a.m., to be broadcast in up to two adjacent courtrooms to the extent necessary to accommodate public interest. (JUDGE DERRICK K. WATSON)(tyk)CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications were served by first class mail on the date of this docket entry
March 14, 2017 187 NOTICE of Appearance by James B. Rogers on behalf of New York University on behalf of New York University. (Rogers, James)
March 14, 2017 186 MEMORANDUM re 140 MOTION for Leave to File Brief of the National Asian Pacific American Bar Association as Amicus Curiae in Support of Plaintiffs Brief of the National Asian Pacific American Bar Association filed by National Asian Pacific American Bar Association. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Bunn, Pamela), forwarded documents to JUDGE DERRICK K WATSON
March 14, 2017 185 MOTION To Add Additional Amici to Amici Curiae Interfaith Coalition's Amicus Brief; Certificate of Service Thomas Benedict appearing for Amicus Parties Rabbi Sharon Brous, Congregation B'nai Jeshurun, Congregation Beit Simchat Torah, Reverend Curtis W. Hart, Hyde Park & Kenwood Interfaith Council, IKAR, Rabbi Sharon Kleinbaum, Rabbi Noa Kushner, Rabbi Joy Levitt, Rabbi Joel Mosbacher, Imam Abdul Malik Mujahid, National Council of Churches of Christ in the USA, Rabbi James Ponet, Rabbi Frederick Reeves, Rabbi John Rosove, Rabbi Michael Strassfeld, The Muslim Public Affairs Council, The Right Reverend Andrew Dietsche, Episcopal Bishop of New York, The Right Reverend Lawrence C. Provenzano, Episcopal Bishop of Long Island, The Right Reverend Marc Handley Andrus, Episcopal Bishop of California, The Right Reverend Mary D. Glasspool, Bishop Assistant of the Episcopal Diocese of New York, The Sikh Coalition, Reverend Timothy Tutt, Union Theological Seminary, United Methodist Women, Rabbi Peretz Wolf-Prusan (Benedict, Thomas)
March 14, 2017 182 NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas Benedict on behalf of Congregation B'nai Jeshurun, Congregation Beit Simchat Torah, Reverend Curtis W. Hart, Hyde Park & Kenwood Interfaith Council, Rabbi Sharon Kleinbaum, Rabbi Noa Kushner, Rabbi Joy Levitt, Rabbi Joel Mosbacher, Imam Abdul Malik Mujahid, Rabbi James Ponet, Rabbi Frederick Reeves, Rabbi John Rosove, Rabbi Michael Strassfeld, The Muslim Public Affairs Council, The Right Reverend Allen K. Shin, Bishop Suffragan of the Episcopal, The Right Reverend Andrew Dietsche, Episcopal Bishop of New York, The Right Reverend Lawrence C. Provenzano, Episcopal Bishop of Long Island, The Right Reverend Marc Handley Andrus, Episcopal Bishop of California, The Right Reverend Mary D. Glasspool, Bishop Assistant of the Episcopal Diocese of New York, The Sikh Coalition, Reverend Timothy Tutt, Union Theological Seminary, United Methodist Women, Rabbi Peretz Wolf-Prusan, National Council of Churches of Christ in the USA, IKAR, Rabbi Sharon Brous on behalf of Congregation B'nai Jeshurun, Congregation Beit Simchat Torah, Reverend Curtis W. Hart, Hyde Park & Kenwood Interfaith Council, Rabbi Sharon Kleinbaum, Rabbi Noa Kushner, Rabbi Joy Levitt, Rabbi Joel Mosbacher, Imam Abdul Malik Mujahid, Rabbi James Ponet, Rabbi Frederick Reeves, Rabbi John Rosove, Rabbi Michael Strassfeld, The Muslim Public Affairs Council, The Right Reverend Allen K. Shin, Bishop Suffragan of the Episcopal, The Right Reverend Andrew Dietsche, Episcopal Bishop of New York, The Right Reverend Lawrence C. Provenzano, Episcopal Bishop of Long Island, The Right Reverend Marc Handley Andrus, Episcopal Bishop of California, The Right Reverend Mary D. Glasspool, Bishop Assistant of the Episcopal Diocese of New York, The Sikh Coalition, Reverend Timothy Tutt, Union Theological Seminary, United Methodist Women, Rabbi Peretz Wolf-Prusan, National Council of Churches of Christ in the USA, IKAR, Rabbi Sharon Brous. (Benedict, Thomas)
March 14, 2017 181 EO: The Court GRANTS the following Motions For Leave to File Amicus Curiae Brief Docket Nos.: 93 , 98 , 103 , 114 , 116 , 118 , 119 , 122 , 123 , 137 , 138 , 140 , 143 , 154 , 160 , 169 and 171 . (JUDGE DERRICK K. WATSON)(tyk)CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications were served by first class mail on the date of this docket entry
March 14, 2017 180 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice of Terrance J. Nolan Filing fee $ 300, receipt number 0975-1843220.Claire Wong Black appearing for Amicus New York University (Black, Claire)
March 14, 2017 179 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice of Tiffany M. Woo Filing fee $ 300, receipt number 0975-1843219.Claire Wong Black appearing for Amicus New York University (Black, Claire)
March 14, 2017 178 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice of Steven E. Obus Filing fee $ 300, receipt number 0975-1843216.Claire Wong Black appearing for Amicus New York University (Black, Claire)
March 14, 2017 177 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice of Seth D. Fiur Filing fee $ 300, receipt number 0975-1843212.Claire Wong Black appearing for Amicus New York University (Black, Claire)
March 14, 2017 176 Featured Case ORDER Approving Request for Media Blogging as to representative Joyce M. Brown of Daily Kos on 03/15/2017 at 9:30 am. Signed by JUDGE DERRICK K. WATSON on 03/14/2017. (apg, dist)CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications were served by first class mail on the date of this docket entry
March 14, 2017 174 NOTICE of Appearance by Claire Wong Black on behalf of New York University on behalf of New York University. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Black, Claire)
March 14, 2017 173 Featured Case ORDER Approving Request for Blogging as to representative Kalani Takase of The Washington Post on 03/15/17 at 9:30 am.Signed by JUDGE DERRICK K. WATSON on 03/14/2017. (apg, dist)CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications were served by first class mail on the date of this docket entry
March 14, 2017 172 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffrey B. Wall on behalf of John F. Kelly, Rex Tillerson, Donald J. Trump, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, U.S. Department of State, United States of America on behalf of John F. Kelly, Rex Tillerson, Donald J. Trump, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, U.S. Department of State, United States of America. (Wall, Jeffrey)
March 13, 2017 189 MOTION to Intervene and to Dismiss and Enjoin Defendants by Intervenor Frederick Banks (Attachments: # 1 Mailing Documentation, # 2 Cover letter) [Note: No CV case number referenced on the Motion, however information as to the case is mentioned in the cover letter] (ecs, )
March 13, 2017 184 MOTION to Expedite His Motion and to Intervene and to Permit Him to Use the Court's ECF System as a Filing User - by Intervenor Vincent Lucas (Attachments: # 1 Mailing Documentation)(ecs, ) [Note: Document submitted is not an Original signature and no copies submitted] Modified on 3/16/2017 (ecs, ).
March 13, 2017 183 MOTION to Intervene by Defendant Vincent Lucas (Attachments: # 1 [PROPOSED] Intervenor Vincent Lucas's Cross Complaint against the State of Hawaii and Ismail Elshikh, Exh A - B, # 2 Mailing Documentation)(ecs, ) [Note: Document received does not have an Original signature and no other copies provided to the court.] Modified on 3/16/2017 (ecs, ).
March 13, 2017 175 Featured Case ORDER Approving Request for Media Blogging as to representative Joe Satomi Lee of NHK Japan (LA Bureau) on 03/15/17 at 9:30 am. Signed by JUDGE DERRICK K. WATSON on 03/13/2017. (apg, dist)CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications were served by first class mail on the date of this docket entry
March 13, 2017 171 MOTION for Leave to File BRIEF OF AMICI CURIAE IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR A TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER, Nickolas A. Kacprowski appearing for Amicus Parties American Muslim Health Professionals, Muppies, Inc., Muslim Advocates, Network of Arab-American Professionals, The National Arab American Medical Association (Attachments: # 1 Corporate Disclosure Statement, # 2 Main Document, # 3 Exhibit A, # 4 Certificate of Service)(Kacprowski, Nickolas)
March 13, 2017 170 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING MOTIONS TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE KEVIN S.C. CHANG on 3/13/2017. (afc) RICHARD D. BERNSTEIN, ESQ. (Law firm of Willkie Farr & Gallagher LLP) added as attorney pro hac vice for amicus party T.A. [Motion 163 ] MICHAEL B. KEATING, ESQ. (Law firm Foley Hoag LLP) added as attorney pro hac vice for amicus party MASSACHUSETTS TECHNOLOGY LEADERSHIP COUNCIL, INC. [Motion 164 ] ANTON A. WARE, ESQ. (Law firm Arnold & Porter Kay Scholer LLP) added as attorney pro hac vice for amicus parties MUSLIM ADVOCATES; AMERICAN MUSLIM HEALTH PROFESSIONALS; MUPPIES; NATIONAL ARAB AMERICAN MEDICAL ASSOCIATION; NETWORK OF ARAB-AMERICAN PROFESSIONALS. [Motion 165 ]JOHNATHAN JAMES SMITH, ESQ. (Law firm Muslim Advocates) [Motion 166 ] and JUNAID SULAHRY, ESQ. (Law firm Muslim Advocates) [Motion 168 ] added as attorneys pro hac vice for amicus parties MUSLIM ADVOCATES; AMERICAN MUSLIM HEALTH PROFESSIONALS; MUPPIES; NATIONAL ARAB AMERICAN MEDICAL ASSOCATION; NETWORK OF ARAB-AMERICAN PROFESSIONALS CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF).
March 13, 2017 169 MOTION for Leave to File Brief of Amicus Curiae T.A. in Support of Motion for Temporary Restraining Order Regan M. Iwao appearing for Amicus T.A. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix A, # 2 Certificate of Service)(Iwao, Regan)
March 13, 2017 168 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice re JUNAID SULAHRY. Filing fee $ 300, receipt number 0975-1842752.Nickolas A. Kacprowski appearing for Amicus Parties American Muslim Health Professionals, Muppies, Inc., Muslim Advocates, Network of Arab-American Professionals, The National Arab American Medical Association (Kacprowski, Nickolas)
March 13, 2017 167 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING MOTIONS TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE 113 126 127 128 129 130 131 132 133 142 150 151 152 . Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE KEVIN S.C. CHANG on 3/13/2017. - Motions Granted as to the following Motions to Appear Pro Hac Vice: 1) Alison M.Hamer [doc. no. 113]; 2) Meredith S.H. Higashi [doc. no. 126];3) James W. Kim [doc. no. 127]; 4) Tina R. Matsuoka [doc. no.128]; 5) Navdeep Singh [doc. no. 129]; 6) Rachana A. Pathak[doc. no. 130]; 7) Michael Baker [doc. no. 131];8) Robert D. Fram [doc. no. 132]; 9) Karun Tilak [doc. no.133]; 10) David L. Franklin [doc. no. 142]; 11) KristynDeFilipp [doc. no. 150]; 12) Christopher E. Hart [doc. no.151]; and 13) Daniel L. McFadden [doc. no. 152]. (ecs, )CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications were served by first class mail on the date of this docket entry
March 13, 2017 166 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice re JOHNATHAN JAMES SMITH. Filing fee $ 300, receipt number 0975-1842742.Nickolas A. Kacprowski appearing for Amicus Parties American Muslim Health Professionals, Muppies, Inc., Muslim Advocates, Network of Arab-American Professionals, The National Arab American Medical Association (Kacprowski, Nickolas)
March 13, 2017 165 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice re ANTON A. WARE. Filing fee $ 300, receipt number 0975-1842721.Nickolas A. Kacprowski appearing for Amicus Parties American Muslim Health Professionals, Muslim Advocates, Network of Arab-American Professionals, The National Arab American Medical Association, Muppies, Inc. (Kacprowski, Nickolas)
March 13, 2017 164 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice of Michael B. Keating Filing fee $ 300, receipt number 0975-1842736.Brett R. Tobin appearing for Amicus Massachusetts Technology Leadership Council, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Tobin, Brett)
March 13, 2017 163 MOTION for Attorney Fees , MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Richard D. Bernstein Filing fee $ 300, receipt number 0975-1842730.Regan M. Iwao appearing for Amicus T.A. (Iwao, Regan) Modified on 3/13/2017 to add name of Pro Hac Vice (ecs, ). Modified on 3/13/2017 (ecs, ).
March 13, 2017 162 NOTICE of Appearance by Lynda L. Arakawa on behalf of T.A. on behalf of T.A.. (Arakawa, Lynda)
March 13, 2017 161 NOTICE of Appearance by Regan M. Iwao on behalf of T.A. on behalf of T.A.. (Iwao, Regan)
March 13, 2017 160 MOTION for Leave to File Brief of Massachusetts Technology Leadership Council, Inc. As Amicus Curiae in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Temporary Restraining Order Brett R. Tobin appearing for Amicus Massachusetts Technology Leadership Council, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A (Proposed Brief), # 2 Certificate of Service)(Tobin, Brett)
March 13, 2017 159 Featured Case ORDER Approving Request for Media Blogging as to representative Morad Abed of Al Jazeera Arabic. Signed by JUDGE DERRICK K. WATSON on 03/13/2017. (apg, dist)CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications were served by first class mail on the date of this docket entry
March 13, 2017 158 Featured Case ORDER Approving Request for Media Blogging as to representative Michelle Broder Van Dyke of Buzz Feed News. Signed by JUDGE DERRICK K. WATSON on 03/13/2017. (apg, dist)CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications were served by first class mail on the date of this docket entry
March 13, 2017 157 Featured Case ORDER DENYING WITHOUT PREJUDICE MICHAEL B. KEATING'S MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE 149 . Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE KEVIN S.C. CHANG on 3/13/2017. (ecs, )CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Michael Keating to be notified thru local counsel of record Brett Tobin
March 13, 2017 156 NOTICE of Appearance by Nickolas A. Kacprowski on behalf of Muslim Advocates, American Muslim Health Professionals, Muppies, The National Arab American Medical Association, Network of Arab-American Professionals on behalf of Muslim Advocates, American Muslim Health Professionals, Muppies, The National Arab American Medical Association, Network of Arab-American Professionals. (Kacprowski, Nickolas)
March 13, 2017 155 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Massachusetts Technology Leadership Council, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Tobin, Brett)
March 13, 2017 154 MOTION for Leave to File [Motion of the State of Illinois for Leave to File Amicus Brief] Duane R. Miyashiro appearing for Amicus Parties State of California, State of Connecticut, State of Delaware, State of Illinois, State of Iowa, State of Maryland, State of Massachusetts, State of New Mexico, State of New York, State of Oregon, State of Rhode Island, State of Vermont, State of Virginia, The District of Columbia (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support of Motion, # 2 Declaration of David L. Franklin, # 3 Exhibit 1-Brief Amicus Curiae of Illinois and Other States, # 4 Certificate of Service)(Miyashiro, Duane)
March 13, 2017 153 AMENDED DOCUMENT by State of Illinois, State of California, State of Connecticut, State of Delaware, State of Iowa, State of Maryland, State of Massachusetts, State of New Mexico, State of New York, State of Oregon, State of Rhode Island, State of Vermont, State of Virginia, The District of Columbia. Amendment to 141 Notice of Appearance of Duane R. Miyashiro. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service Certificate of Service)(Miyashiro, Duane)
March 13, 2017 152 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice of Daniel L. McFadden Filing fee $ 300, receipt number 0975-1842299.Brett R. Tobin appearing for Amicus Massachusetts Technology Leadership Council, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Tobin, Brett)
March 13, 2017 151 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice of Christopher E. Hart Filing fee $ 300, receipt number 0975-1842292.Brett R. Tobin appearing for Amicus Massachusetts Technology Leadership Council, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Tobin, Brett)
March 13, 2017 150 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice of Kristyn DeFilipp Filing fee $ 300, receipt number 0975-1842285.Brett R. Tobin appearing for Amicus Massachusetts Technology Leadership Council, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Tobin, Brett)
March 13, 2017 149 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice of Michael B. Keating Filing fee $ 300, receipt number 0975-1842257.Brett R. Tobin appearing for Amicus Massachusetts Technology Leadership Council, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Tobin, Brett)
March 13, 2017 148 NOTICE of Appearance by Brett R. Tobin on behalf of Massachusetts Technology Leadership Council, Inc. on behalf of Massachusetts Technology Leadership Council, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Tobin, Brett)
March 13, 2017 147 Featured Case ORDER Approving Request for Media Blogging from 03/15/2017 onward, as to the following representatives of CNN: Stephanie Elam, Traci Tamura and Greg Cannes. Signed by JUDGE DERRICK K. WATSON on 03/13/2017. (apg, dist)CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications were served by first class mail on the date of this docket entry
March 13, 2017 145 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re 65 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by John F. Kelly, Rex Tillerson, Donald J. Trump, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, U.S. Department of State, United States of America. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A: March 6, 2017 Letter from DOJ and DHS to White House, # 2 Exhibit B: Department of State Q&As, # 3 Certificate of Service)(Rosenberg, Brad)
March 13, 2017 144 Corporate Disclosure Statement by American Center for Law and Justice. (Matsumoto, Robert)
March 13, 2017 143 MOTION for Leave to File Amicus Curiae brief of the American Center for Law and Justice Robert K. Matsumoto appearing for Amicus American Center for Law and Justice (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum of law supporting motion, # 2 Declaration of Attorney Robert K. Matsumoto, # 3 Proposed Amicus Curiae Brief of the ACLJ, # 4 Certificate of Service)(Matsumoto, Robert)
March 12, 2017 142 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice of David L. Franklin Filing fee $ 300, receipt number 0975-1842014.Duane R. Miyashiro appearing for Amicus State of Illinois (Miyashiro, Duane)
March 12, 2017 141 NOTICE of Appearance by Duane R. Miyashiro on behalf of State of Illinois on behalf of State of Illinois. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service Certificate of Service)(Miyashiro, Duane)
March 12, 2017 140 MOTION for Leave to File Brief of the National Asian Pacific American Bar Association as Amicus Curiae in Support of Plaintiffs Pamela W. Bunn appearing for Amicus National Asian Pacific American Bar Association (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit "A" - Brief, # 2 Certificate of Service)(Bunn, Pamela)
March 12, 2017 139 Corporate Disclosure Statement by National Asian Pacific American Bar Association. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Bunn, Pamela)
March 12, 2017 138 MOTION for Leave to File Brief of Amici Curiae Interfaith Coalition Thomas Benedict appearing for Amicus Parties Congregation B'nai Jeshurun, Congregation Beit Simchat Torah, Reverend Curtis W. Hart, Hyde Park & Kenwood Interfaith Council, Rabbi Sharon Kleinbaum, Rabbi Noa Kushner, Rabbi Joy Levitt, Rabbi Joel Mosbacher, Imam Abdul Malik Mujahid, Rabbi James Ponet, Rabbi Frederick Reeves, Rabbi John Rosove, Rabbi Michael Strassfeld, The Muslim Public Affairs Council, The Right Reverend Allen K. Shin, Bishop Suffragan of the Episcopal, The Right Reverend Andrew Dietsche, Episcopal Bishop of New York, The Right Reverend Lawrence C. Provenzano, Episcopal Bishop of Long Island, The Right Reverend Marc Handley Andrus, Episcopal Bishop of California, The Right Reverend Mary D. Glasspool, Bishop Assistant of the Episcopal Diocese of New York, The Sikh Coalition, Reverend Timothy Tutt, Union Theological Seminary, United Methodist Women, Rabbi Peretz Wolf-Prusan (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Certificate of Service)(Benedict, Thomas)
March 12, 2017 137 MOTION for Leave to File Amicus Curiae Brief of the Immigration Reform Law Institute in Support of Defendants Denise M. Hevicon appearing for Amicus Immigration Reform Law Institute (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Proposed Amicus Curiae Brief, # 2 Certificate of Service)(Hevicon, Denise)
March 12, 2017 136 NOTICE by Immigration Reform Law Institute re 80 Memorandum. Withdrawing Amicus Brief filed in Docket No. 80 Immigration Reform Law Institute. (Hevicon, Denise) Modified docket title text on 3/13/2017 (ecs, ).
March 12, 2017 135 NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas Benedict on behalf of Congregation B'nai Jeshurun, Reverend Curtis W. Hart, Rabbi Sharon Kleinbaum, Rabbi Joy Levitt, Rabbi Joel Mosbacher, The Sikh Coalition, Reverend Timothy Tutt, The Right Reverend Andrew Dietsche, Episcopal Bishop of New York, The Right Reverend Allen K. Shin, Bishop Suffragan of the Episcopal, The Right Reverend Mary D. Glasspool, Bishop Assistant of the Episcopal Diocese of New York, Imam Abdul Malik Mujahid, The Right Reverend Lawrence C. Provenzano, Episcopal Bishop of Long Island, The Muslim Public Affairs Council, The Right Reverend Marc Handley Andrus, Episcopal Bishop of California, Congregation Beit Simchat Torah, Rabbi Frederick Reeves, Rabbi Peretz Wolf-Prusan, Rabbi Noa Kushner, Union Theological Seminary, Rabbi John Rosove, United Methodist Women, Rabbi James Ponet, Hyde Park & Kenwood Interfaith Council, Rabbi Michael Strassfeld on behalf of Congregation B'nai Jeshurun, Reverend Curtis W. Hart, Rabbi Sharon Kleinbaum, Rabbi Joy Levitt, Rabbi Joel Mosbacher, The Sikh Coalition, Reverend Timothy Tutt, The Right Reverend Andrew Dietsche, Episcopal Bishop of New York, The Right Reverend Allen K. Shin, Bishop Suffragan of the Episcopal, The Right Reverend Mary D. Glasspool, Bishop Assistant of the Episcopal Diocese of New York, Imam Abdul Malik Mujahid, The Right Reverend Lawrence C. Provenzano, Episcopal Bishop of Long Island, The Muslim Public Affairs Council, The Right Reverend Marc Handley Andrus, Episcopal Bishop of California, Congregation Beit Simchat Torah, Rabbi Frederick Reeves, Rabbi Peretz Wolf-Prusan, Rabbi Noa Kushner, Union Theological Seminary, Rabbi John Rosove, United Methodist Women, Rabbi James Ponet, Hyde Park & Kenwood Interfaith Council, Rabbi Michael Strassfeld. (Benedict, Thomas)
March 12, 2017 134 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Congregation B'nai Jeshurun, Reverend Curtis W. Hart, Rabbi Sharon Kleinbaum, Rabbi Joy Levitt, Rabbi Joel Mosbacher, The Sikh Coalition, Reverend Timothy Tutt re 131 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice of Michael Baker Filing fee $ 300, receipt number 0975-1841996. (Benedict, Thomas)
March 12, 2017 133 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice of Karun Tilak Filing fee $ 300, receipt number 0975-1841998.Thomas Benedict appearing for Amicus Parties Congregation B'nai Jeshurun, Reverend Curtis W. Hart, Rabbi Sharon Kleinbaum, Rabbi Joy Levitt, Rabbi Joel Mosbacher, The Sikh Coalition, Reverend Timothy Tutt (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Benedict, Thomas)
March 12, 2017 132 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice of Robert D. Fram Filing fee $ 300, receipt number 0975-1841997.Thomas Benedict appearing for Amicus Parties Congregation B'nai Jeshurun, Reverend Curtis W. Hart, Rabbi Sharon Kleinbaum, Rabbi Joy Levitt, Rabbi Joel Mosbacher, The Sikh Coalition, Reverend Timothy Tutt (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Benedict, Thomas)
March 12, 2017 131 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice of Michael Baker Filing fee $ 300, receipt number 0975-1841996.Thomas Benedict appearing for Amicus Parties Congregation B'nai Jeshurun, Reverend Curtis W. Hart, Rabbi Sharon Kleinbaum, Rabbi Joy Levitt, Rabbi Joel Mosbacher, The Sikh Coalition, Reverend Timothy Tutt (Benedict, Thomas)
March 11, 2017 130 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice of Rachana A. Pathak Filing fee $ 300, receipt number 0975-1841987.Pamela W. Bunn appearing for Amicus National Asian Pacific American Bar Association (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Rachana A. Pathak, # 2 Certificate of Service)(Bunn, Pamela)
March 11, 2017 129 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice of Navdeep Singh Filing fee $ 300, receipt number 0975-1841986.Pamela W. Bunn appearing for Amicus National Asian Pacific American Bar Association (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Navdeep Singh, # 2 Certificate of Service)(Bunn, Pamela)
March 11, 2017 128 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice of Tina R. Matsuoka Filing fee $ 300, receipt number 0975-1841985.Pamela W. Bunn appearing for Amicus National Asian Pacific American Bar Association (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Tina R. Matsuoka, # 2 Certificate of Service)(Bunn, Pamela)
March 11, 2017 127 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice of James W. Kim Filing fee $ 300, receipt number 0975-1841984.Pamela W. Bunn appearing for Amicus National Asian Pacific American Bar Association (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of James W. Kim, # 2 Certificate of Service)(Bunn, Pamela)
March 11, 2017 126 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Meredith S. H. Higashi Filing fee $ 300, receipt number 0975-1841983.Pamela W. Bunn appearing for Amicus National Asian Pacific American Bar Association (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Meredith S. H. Higashi, # 2 Certificate of Service)(Bunn, Pamela)
March 11, 2017 125 NOTICE of Appearance by John S. Rhee on behalf of National Asian Pacific American Bar Association on behalf of National Asian Pacific American Bar Association. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Rhee, John)
March 11, 2017 124 NOTICE of Appearance by Pamela W. Bunn on behalf of National Asian Pacific American Bar Association on behalf of National Asian Pacific American Bar Association. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Bunn, Pamela)
March 11, 2017 123 MOTION for Leave to File First Amended Motion of Participating Law Firms of the Employment Law Alliance for Leave to File Brief as Amicus Curiae in Support of Plaintiffs Anna M. Elento-Sneed appearing for Amicus The Employment Law Alliance (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support of Motion, # 2 Declaration of Anna Elento-Sneed, # 3 Exhibit 1, # 4 Certificate of Service)(Elento-Sneed, Anna)
March 11, 2017 122 MOTION for Leave to File AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF OF THE LAW PROFESSORS Claire Loebs Davis appearing for Amicus Amicus Curiae Law Professors (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Certificate of Service)(Davis, Claire)
March 11, 2017 121 NOTICE of Appearance by Claire Loebs Davis on behalf of Amicus Curiae Law Professors on behalf of Amicus Curiae Law Professors. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Davis, Claire)
March 11, 2017 120 NOTICE of Appearance by Mark S. Davis on behalf of Amicus Curiae Law Professors on behalf of Amicus Curiae Law Professors. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Davis, Mark)
March 11, 2017 119 MOTION for Leave to File Brief for Amici Curiae Aaron Fellmeth appearing for Amicus Amici Curiae International Law Scholars and Nongovermental Organizations (Fellmeth, Aaron)
March 10, 2017 146 Featured Case ORDER APPROVING Request for Media Blogging as to representative Rui Kaneya of Honolulu Civil Beat. Signed by JUDGE DERRICK K. WATSON on 03/10/2017. (apg, dist)CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications were served by first class mail on the date of this docket entry
March 10, 2017 118 MOTION for Leave to File (MOTION OF PARTICIPATING LAW FIRMS OF THE EMPLOYMENT LAW ALLIANCE FOR LEAVE TO FILE BRIEF AS AMICUS CURIAE IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS) Anna M. Elento-Sneed appearing for Amicus The Employment Law Alliance (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support of Motion, # 2 Declaration of Anna Elento-Sneed, # 3 Exhibit 1, # 4 Certificate of Service)(Elento-Sneed, Anna)
March 10, 2017 117 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING MOTIONS TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE. 111 112 . Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE KEVIN S.C. CHANG on 3/10/2017. [Pro Hac Vice as to Mary Ellen Simonson and Natasha J. Baker ] (ecs, )CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications were served by first class mail on the date of this docket entry
March 10, 2017 116 MOTION for Leave to File Brief of Human Rights First, KIND (Kids in Need of Defense), Tahirih Justice Center, and HIAS as Amici Curiae in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Temporary Restraining Order Lisa W. Munger appearing for Amicus Parties HIAS, Human Rights First, KIND (Kids in Need of Defense), Tahirih Justice Center (Attachments: # 1 Brief of Amici Curiae, # 2 Certificate of Service)(Munger, Lisa)
March 10, 2017 115 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING MOTIONS TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE 69 72 74 83 84 87 88 89 90 106 107 108 109 . Signed by JUDGE KEVIN S.C. CHANG on 3/10/2017. On March 9 and 10, 2017, the following attorneys filed Motions to Appear Pro Hac Vice: 1) Claire Loebs Davis [doc. no. 69]; 2) Aaron Fellmeth [doc. no. 72]; 3) Christopher J. Hajec [doc. no. 74]; 4) Robert A. Johnson [doc. no. 83]; 5) Amir H. Ali [doc. no. 84]; 6) Pratik A. Shah [doc. no. 87]; 7) Alan Turner [doc. no. 88]; 8) Jessica M. Weisel [doc. no. 89]; 9) Harrison J. (Buzz) Frahn [doc. no. 90]; 10) Kelly M. Percival [doc. no. 106]; 11) Richard B. Katskee [doc. no. 107]; 12) Andrew Nellis [doc. no. 108]; and 13) P.K. Runkles- Pearson [doc. no. 109]. (ecs, )CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications were served by first class mail on the date of this docket entry (Attachment(s) replaced on 3/10/2017 and NEF regenerated : # 1 Main Document CORRECT) (ecs, ). Modified on 3/13/2017 to clarify that Judge Chang signed the Order. (apg, dist).
March 10, 2017 114 MOTION for Leave to File Amicus Brief; Memorandum in Support of Motion; Declaration of David J. Minkin; Exhibit "1"; Certificate of Service David J. Minkin appearing for Amicus Roderick and Solange MacArthur Justice Center (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support of Motion, # 2 Declaration of David J. Minkin, # 3 Exhibit "1", # 4 Certificate of Service)(Minkin, David)
March 10, 2017 113 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice (Alison M. Hamer) Filing fee $ 300, receipt number 0975-1841882.Kimberly Ann Greeley appearing for Amicus The Employment Law Alliance (Greeley, Kimberly)
March 10, 2017 112 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice (Natasha J. Baker) Filing fee $ 300, receipt number 0975-1841877.Kimberly Ann Greeley appearing for Amicus The Employment Law Alliance (Greeley, Kimberly)
March 10, 2017 111 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice (Mary Ellen Simonson) Filing fee $ 300, receipt number 0975-1841872.Anna M. Elento-Sneed appearing for Amicus The Employment Law Alliance (Elento-Sneed, Anna)
March 10, 2017 110 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Roderick and Solange MacArthur Justice Center. (Minkin, David)
March 10, 2017 109 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice (P.K. RUNKLES-PEARSON) Filing fee $ 300, receipt number 0975-1841851.Anna M. Elento-Sneed appearing for Amicus The Employment Law Alliance (Elento-Sneed, Anna)
March 10, 2017 108 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Andrew L. Nellis Filing fee $ 300, receipt number 0975-1841850.Steven D. Strauss appearing for Amicus American United for Separation of Church and State and Southern Poverty Law Center (Strauss, Steven)
March 10, 2017 107 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Richard B. Katskee Filing fee $ 300, receipt number 0975-1841845.Steven D. Strauss appearing for Amicus American United for Separation of Church and State and Southern Poverty Law Center (Strauss, Steven)
March 10, 2017 106 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Kelly M. PercivalRichard B. Katskee Filing fee $ 300, receipt number 0975-1841833.Steven D. Strauss appearing for Amicus American United for Separation of Church and State and Southern Poverty Law Center (Strauss, Steven) Modified on 3/10/2017 to correct name of Pro Hac Vice.
March 10, 2017 105 MEMORANDUM in Support re 65 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order Comprising Brief of Amici Curiae Americans United for Separation of Church and State and the Southern Poverty Law Center in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for a Temporary Restraining Order filed by American United for Separation of Church and State and Southern Poverty Law Center. (Strauss, Steven)
March 10, 2017 104 Amicus Curiae APPEARANCE entered by Steven D. Strauss on behalf of American United for Separation of Church and State and Southern Poverty Law Center. (Strauss, Steven)
March 10, 2017 103 MOTION for Leave to File Brief of Amici Curiae Americans United for Separation of Church and State and the Southern Poverty Law Center in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for a Temporary Restraining Order Steven D. Strauss appearing for Amicus American United for Separation of Church and State and Southern Poverty Law Center (Strauss, Steven)
March 10, 2017 102 NOTICE of Case Reassignment: Please reflect Civil case number CV 17-00050 DKW-KSC on all further filings. 94 Order of Recusal filed on March 10, 2017. (ecs, )CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications were served by first class mail on the date of this docket entry.
March 10, 2017 101 Amicus Curiae APPEARANCE entered by Anna M. Elento-Sneed on behalf of The Employment Law Alliance. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Elento-Sneed, Anna)
March 10, 2017 100 Amicus Curiae APPEARANCE entered by Kimberly Ann Greeley on behalf of The Employment Law Alliance. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Greeley, Kimberly)
March 10, 2017 99 NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas Benedict on behalf of Congregation B'nai Jeshurun, Reverend Curtis W. Hart, Rabbi Sharon Kleinbaum, Rabbi Joel Mosbacher, Reverend Timothy Tutt, Rabbi Joy Levitt, The Sikh Coalition on behalf of Congregation B'nai Jeshurun, Reverend Curtis W. Hart, Rabbi Sharon Kleinbaum, Rabbi Joel Mosbacher, Reverend Timothy Tutt, Rabbi Joy Levitt, The Sikh Coalition. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Benedict, Thomas)
March 10, 2017 98 MOTION for Leave to File Amici Curiae Brief in Support of Plaintiffs Louise K.Y. Ing appearing for Amicus Parties Asian American Legal Defense And Education Fund (AALDEF), Asian Americans Advancing Justice (AAJC), Asian Americans Advancing Justice (Asian Law Caucus), Asian Americans Advancing Justice (Atlanta), Asian Americans Advancing Justice (Chicago), Asian Americans Advancing Justice (Los Angeles), Fred T. Korematsu Center for Law and Equality, Jay Hirabayashi, Hispanic National Bar Association (HNBA), Japanese American Citizens League, Honolulu Chapter (JACL Honolulu), Karen Korematsu, LatinoJustice PRLDEF, Inc., National Bar Association, South Asian Bar Association of North America (SABA North America), Holly Yasui (Attachments: # 1 Amici Curiae Brief, # 2 Certificate of Service)(Ing, Louise)
March 10, 2017 97 Featured Case ORDER Approving Request for Media Blogging for representative Ian Lovett of Wall Street Journal.Signed by JUDGE DERRICK K. WATSON on 03/10/2017. (apg, dist)CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications were served by first class mail on the date of this docket entry (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/13/2017: # 1 Supplement Amended request for Media Blogging) (apg, dist). Modified on 3/13/2017 to attached the amended request with the correct hearing date of 3/15/2017 (apg, dist).
March 10, 2017 96 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Asian American Legal Defense And Education Fund (AALDEF), Asian Americans Advancing Justice (AAJC), Asian Americans Advancing Justice (Asian Law Caucus), Asian Americans Advancing Justice (Atlanta), Asian Americans Advancing Justice (Chicago), Asian Americans Advancing Justice (Los Angeles), Fred T. Korematsu Center for Law and Equality, Jay Hirabayashi, Hispanic National Bar Association (HNBA), Japanese American Citizens League, Honolulu Chapter (JACL Honolulu), Karen Korematsu, LatinoJustice PRLDEF, Inc., National Bar Association, South Asian Bar Association of North America (SABA North America), Holly Yasui. (Ing, Louise)
March 10, 2017 95 Featured Case ORDER Approving Request for Media Blogging for representative Randy Brandt of ABC news. Signed by JUDGE DERRICK K. WATSON on 03/10/2017. (apg, dist)CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications were served by first class mail on the date of this docket entry
March 10, 2017 94 Featured Case ORDER OF RECUSAL. Magistrate Judge KENNETH J. MANSFIELD recused. Case reassigned to MAGISTRATE JUDGE KEVIN S.C. CHANG. Please reflect Civil Case No: CV 17-00050 DKW-KSC on all further filings. Signed by Magistrate Judge KENNETH J. MANSFIELD on 3/10/2017. (ecs, )CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications were served by first class mail on the date of this docket entry
March 10, 2017 93 MOTION for Leave to File Brief in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Temporary Restraining Order Nicole Y.C. L. Altman appearing for Amicus Anti-Defamation League (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Certificate of Service)(Altman, Nicole)
March 10, 2017 92 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Anti-Defamation League. (Altman, Nicole)
March 10, 2017 91 NOTICE of Appearance by Nicole Y.C. L. Altman on behalf of Anti-Defamation League on behalf of Anti-Defamation League. (Altman, Nicole)
March 10, 2017 90 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice of Harrison J. (Buzz) Frahn Filing fee $ 300, receipt number 0975-1841619.Lisa W. Munger appearing for Amicus Parties HIAS, Human Rights First, KIND (Kids in Need of Defense), Tahirih Justice Center (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Counsel [Harrison J. (Buzz) Frahn], # 2 [Proposed] Order Granting Mtn to Appear Pro Hac Vice [Harrison J. (Buzz) Frahn], # 3 Certificate of Service)(Munger, Lisa)
March 10, 2017 89 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Jessica M. Weisel Filing fee $ 300, receipt number 0975-1841615.Louise K.Y. Ing appearing for Amicus Parties Asian American Legal Defense And Education Fund (AALDEF), Asian Americans Advancing Justice (AAJC), Asian Americans Advancing Justice (Asian Law Caucus), Asian Americans Advancing Justice (Atlanta), Asian Americans Advancing Justice (Chicago), Asian Americans Advancing Justice (Los Angeles), Fred T. Korematsu Center for Law and Equality, Jay Hirabayashi, Hispanic National Bar Association (HNBA), Japanese American Citizens League, Honolulu Chapter (JACL Honolulu), Karen Korematsu, LatinoJustice PRLDEF, Inc., National Bar Association, South Asian Bar Association of North America (SABA North America), Holly Yasui (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Counsel)(Ing, Louise)
March 10, 2017 88 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice of Alan C. Turner Filing fee $ 300, receipt number 0975-1841611.Lisa W. Munger appearing for Amicus Parties HIAS, Human Rights First, KIND (Kids in Need of Defense), Tahirih Justice Center (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Counsel [Alan C. Turner], # 2 [Proposed] Order Granting Mtn to Appear Pro Hac Vice [Alan C. Turner], # 3 Certificate of Service)(Munger, Lisa)
March 10, 2017 87 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice as to Pratik A. Shah Filing fee $ 300, receipt number 0975-1841600.Louise K.Y. Ing appearing for Amicus Parties Asian American Legal Defense And Education Fund (AALDEF), Asian Americans Advancing Justice (AAJC), Asian Americans Advancing Justice (Asian Law Caucus), Asian Americans Advancing Justice (Atlanta), Asian Americans Advancing Justice (Chicago), Asian Americans Advancing Justice (Los Angeles), Fred T. Korematsu Center for Law and Equality, Jay Hirabayashi, Hispanic National Bar Association (HNBA), Japanese American Citizens League, Honolulu Chapter (JACL Honolulu), Karen Korematsu, LatinoJustice PRLDEF, Inc., National Bar Association, South Asian Bar Association of North America (SABA North America), Holly Yasui (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Counsel)(Ing, Louise)
March 10, 2017 86 Corporate Disclosure Statement by HIAS, Human Rights First, KIND (Kids in Need of Defense), Tahirih Justice Center. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Munger, Lisa)
March 10, 2017 85 Amicus Curiae APPEARANCE entered by Lisa W. Munger on behalf of Human Rights First, KIND (Kids in Need of Defense), Tahirih Justice Center, HIAS. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Munger, Lisa)
March 10, 2017 84 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice as to Amir H. Ali; Declaration of Counsel; Consent of Local Counsel; (Proposed) Order Granting Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Amir H. Ali Filing fee $ 300, receipt number 0975-1841589.David J. Minkin appearing for Amicus Roderick and Solange MacArthur Justice Center (Minkin, David)
March 10, 2017 83 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice as to Robert A. Johnson Filing fee $ 300, receipt number 0975-1841562.Louise K.Y. Ing appearing for Amicus Parties Asian American Legal Defense And Education Fund (AALDEF), Asian Americans Advancing Justice (AAJC), Asian Americans Advancing Justice (Asian Law Caucus), Asian Americans Advancing Justice (Atlanta), Asian Americans Advancing Justice (Chicago), Asian Americans Advancing Justice (Los Angeles), Fred T. Korematsu Center for Law and Equality, Jay Hirabayashi, Hispanic National Bar Association (HNBA), Japanese American Citizens League, Honolulu Chapter (JACL Honolulu), Karen Korematsu, LatinoJustice PRLDEF, Inc., National Bar Association, South Asian Bar Association of North America (SABA North America), Holly Yasui (Ing, Louise)
March 10, 2017 82 NOTICE of Appearance by Louise K.Y. Ing on behalf of Asian American Legal Defense And Education Fund (AALDEF), Asian Americans Advancing Justice (AAJC), Asian Americans Advancing Justice (Asian Law Caucus), Asian Americans Advancing Justice (Atlanta), Asian Americans Advancing Justice (Chicago), Asian Americans Advancing Justice (Los Angeles), Fred T. Korematsu Center for Law and Equality, Jay Hirabayashi, Hispanic National Bar Association (HNBA), Japanese American Citizens League, Honolulu Chapter (JACL Honolulu), Karen Korematsu, LatinoJustice PRLDEF, Inc., National Bar Association, South Asian Bar Association of North America (SABA North America), Holly Yasui on behalf of Asian American Legal Defense And Education Fund (AALDEF), Asian Americans Advancing Justice (AAJC), Asian Americans Advancing Justice (Asian Law Caucus), Asian Americans Advancing Justice (Atlanta), Asian Americans Advancing Justice (Chicago), Asian Americans Advancing Justice (Los Angeles), Fred T. Korematsu Center for Law and Equality, Jay Hirabayashi, Hispanic National Bar Association (HNBA), Japanese American Citizens League, Honolulu Chapter (JACL Honolulu), Karen Korematsu, LatinoJustice PRLDEF, Inc., National Bar Association, South Asian Bar Association of North America (SABA North America), Holly Yasui. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Ing, Louise)
March 10, 2017 81 Featured Case ORDER APPROVING REQUEST FOR MEDIA BLOGGING as to HONOLULU STAR ADVERTISER representatives Timothy Hurley, Nelson Daranciang.. Permission is approved for the following hearing: Motion for TRO, to be held on 03/15/2017 at 9:30 am. Signed by JUDGE DERRICK K. WATSON on 3/10/2017. [Note: No email address provided on form] (ecs, )CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing. Adhoc: Honolulu Star Advertiser. (NEF).
March 10, 2017 80 MEMORANDUM re 65 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order Amicus Curiae Brief of the Immigration Reform Law Institute in Support of Defendants filed by Immigration Reform Law Institute. (Hevicon, Denise) Modified docket title text on 3/13/2017. Note: Amicus Brief withdrawn per 136 Notice and 137 Motion to Leave to File Amicus filed. (ecs, ).
March 10, 2017 79 NOTICE of Appearance by Jessica M. Wan on behalf of Roderick and Solange MacArthur Justice Center on behalf of Roderick and Solange MacArthur Justice Center. (Wan, Jessica)
March 10, 2017 78 NOTICE of Appearance by Lisa W. Cataldo on behalf of Roderick and Solange MacArthur Justice Center on behalf of Roderick and Solange MacArthur Justice Center. (Cataldo, Lisa)
March 10, 2017 77 NOTICE of Appearance by Claire Wong Black on behalf of Jay Hirabayashi, Fred T. Korematsu Center for Law and Equality, Holly Yasui, Karen Korematsu, Asian Americans Advancing Justice (AAJC), Asian Americans Advancing Justice (Asian Law Caucus), Asian Americans Advancing Justice (Atlanta), Asian Americans Advancing Justice (Chicago), Asian Americans Advancing Justice (Los Angeles), Asian American Legal Defense And Education Fund (AALDEF), Hispanic National Bar Association (HNBA), Japanese American Citizens League, Honolulu Chapter (JACL Honolulu), LatinoJustice PRLDEF, Inc., National Bar Association, South Asian Bar Association of North America (SABA North America) on behalf of Jay Hirabayashi, Fred T. Korematsu Center for Law and Equality, Holly Yasui, Karen Korematsu, Asian Americans Advancing Justice (AAJC), Asian Americans Advancing Justice (Asian Law Caucus), Asian Americans Advancing Justice (Atlanta), Asian Americans Advancing Justice (Chicago), Asian Americans Advancing Justice (Los Angeles), Asian American Legal Defense And Education Fund (AALDEF), Hispanic National Bar Association (HNBA), Japanese American Citizens League, Honolulu Chapter (JACL Honolulu), LatinoJustice PRLDEF, Inc., National Bar Association, South Asian Bar Association of North America (SABA North America). (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Black, Claire)
March 10, 2017 76 NOTICE of Appearance by David J. Minkin on behalf of Roderick and Solange MacArthur Justice Center on behalf of Amicus Curiae Roderick and Solange MacArthur Justice Center. (Minkin, David) Modified docket text on 3/10/2017 (ecs, ).
March 10, 2017 75 Featured Case ORDER Granting 73 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. [John B. Harris] Signed by Magistrate Judge KENNETH J. MANSFIELD on 3/10/2017. (ecs, )CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications were served by first class mail on the date of this docket entry
March 10, 2017 74 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice of Christopher J. Hajec Filing fee $ 300, receipt number 0975-1841401.Denise M. Hevicon appearing for Amicus Immigration Reform Law Institute (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Counsel, # 2 Order Granting Motion)(Hevicon, Denise) Modified to add name of pro hac vice on 3/10/2017 (ecs, ).
March 10, 2017 73 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice As to John B. Harris Filing fee $ 300, receipt number 0975-1841243.Nicole Y.C. L. Altman appearing for Amicus Anti-Defamation League (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of John B. Harris, # 2 Order)(Altman, Nicole)
March 9, 2017 72 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice as to Aaron Fellmeth Filing fee $ 300, receipt number 0975-1841127.Clare M. Hanusz appearing for Amicus Amici Curiae International Law Scholars and Nongovermental Organizations (Hanusz, Clare) Modified on to add name of Pro Hac Vice attorney 3/10/2017 (ecs, ).
March 9, 2017 71 NOTICE of Appearance by Clare M. Hanusz on behalf of Amici Curiae International Law Scholars and Nongovermental Organizations on behalf of Amici Curiae International Law Scholars and Nongovermental Organizations. (Hanusz, Clare)
March 9, 2017 70 Featured Case ORDER APPROVING REQUEST FOR MEDIA BLOGGING as to representative Dan Levine of Reuters News.Signed by JUDGE DERRICK K. WATSON on 03/09/2017. (apg, dist)CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications were served by first class mail on the date of this docket entry
March 9, 2017 69 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Re Claire Loebs Davis Filing fee $ 300, receipt number 0975-1841084.Mark S. Davis appearing for Amicus AMICUS CURIAE LAW PROFESSORS (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Clare Loebs Davis, # 2 Order)(Davis, Mark)
March 9, 2017 68 Featured Case ORDER APPROVING REQUEST FOR MEDIA BLOGGING as to BLOOMBERG NEWS representative Kartikay Mehrotra. Permission is approved for the following hearing: Motion for TRO, to be held on 03/15/2017 at 9:30 am. Signed by JUDGE DERRICK K. WATSON on on 3/9/2017. [Note: Signature of Kartikay Mehrotra is Dated: 3/8/2018 ] (ecs, )CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications were served by first class mail on the date of this docket entry
March 9, 2017 67 Featured Case ORDER APPROVING REQUEST FOR MEDIA BLOGGING as to ASSOCIATED PRESS representatives Jennifer Kelleher, Audrey McAvoy, Caleb Jones, Cathy Bussewitz. Permission is approved for the following hearing: Motion for TRO, to be held on 03/15/2017 at 9:30 am. and various subsequent on-the-record proceedings in open court. Signed by JUDGE DERRICK K. WATSON on 3/9/2017. (ecs, )CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications were served by first class mail on the date of this docket entry
March 9, 2017 ADVISORY ENTRY to all Filing Parties re entry docket numbers 10 Declaration and 66 Declaration. As these filings were filed as a separate entry, the cover page of the Declaration should include counsel identification in the top left corner of the first page. FURTHER, although filing parties have correctly attached the Memorandum, Exhibits as a separate ECF attachment to the main document, the document title caption on the cover page SHOULD also include these documents (i.e. Declaration of Neal K. Katyal in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Temporary Restraining Order; Exh A; Exh B-1; Exh B-2; Exh C-1; Certificate of Service). A few examples of entries which did not include the attachments in the document title caption on the cover page: 65 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by State of Hawaii, Ismail Elshikh, 64 Amended Complaint filed by State of Hawaii, Ismail Elshikh was filed incorrectly in this case. No further action necessary as to the entries above unless further directed by the court. Filing parties are advised to refer to the court's website www.hid.uscourts.gov and refer to the CM/ECF User Guide located under CM/ECF Resources and/or Local Rules. (ecs, )
March 8, 2017 66 Declaration re 65 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order . (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Dec. of Ismail Elshikh, PhD, # 2 Exhibit B-1 - Supp. Dec. of George Szigeti, # 3 Exhibit B-2 - Orig. Dec. of George Szigeti, # 4 Exhibit C-1 - Supp. Dec. of Luis P. Salaveria, # 5 Exhibit C-2 - Orig. Dec. of Luis P. Salaveria, # 6 Exhibit D-1 - Supp. Dec. of Risa E. Dickson, # 7 Exhibit D-2 - Orig. Dec. of Risa E. Dickson, # 8 Exhibit E - Dec. of Hakim Ounsafi, # 9 Certificate of Service)(Katyal, Neal)
March 8, 2017 65 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order Neal Katyal appearing for Plaintiffs Ismail Elshikh, State of Hawaii (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Temporary Restraining Order, # 2 Certificate of Word Count, # 3 Proposed Temporary Restraining Order, # 4 Certificate of Service)(Katyal, Neal)
March 8, 2017 64 AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR DECLARATORY AND INJUNCTIVE RELIEF (SECOND) against John F. Kelly, Rex Tillerson, Donald J. Trump, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, U.S. Department of State, United States of America, filed by State of Hawaii, Ismail Elshikh. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - Copy of Executive Order dated 3/6/2017, # 2 Exhibit 2 - Copy of Executive Order dated 1/27/2017, # 3 Exhibit 3 - Collection of relevant Data for Hawaii, # 4 Exhibit 4 - Tables for fiscal years 2005-2015, # 5 Exhibit 5 - Copy of table of contents and executive summary, # 6 Exhibit 6 - Copy of press release, # 7 Exhibit 7 - Copy of transcript, # 8 Exhibit 8 - Copy of Washington Post Article, # 9 Exhibit 9 - Copy of this NBC News article, # 10 Exhibit 10 - Copy of the draft DHS report, # 11 Exhibit 11 - Final version of DHS report, # 12 Exhibit 12 - Copy of NBC News article, # 13 Exhibit 13 - Copy of Dissent Channel memorandum, # 14 Exhibit 14 - Copy of DHS Q&A, # 15 Certificate of Service)(Katyal, Neal) Docket title text added on 3/9/2017 (ecs, ).
March 8, 2017 63 Featured Case ORDER APPROVING REQUEST FOR MEDIA BLOGGING as to Fox News representative William LaJeunesse. Permission is approved for the following hearing: Motion for TRO, to be held on 03/15/2017 at 9:30 am.Signed by JUDGE DERRICK K. WATSON on 03/08/2017. (apg, dist)CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications were served by first class mail on the date of this docket entry
March 8, 2017 62 Featured Case ORDER APPROVING REQUEST FOR MEDIA BLOGGING as to Fox News representative Lee Ross. Permission approved for the following hearing: Motion for TRO to be held on 3/15/17 at 9:30 am. Signed by JUDGE DERRICK K. WATSON on 03/08/2017. (apg, dist)CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications were served by first class mail on the date of this docket entry
March 8, 2017 61 NOTICE of Hearing on 65 Plaintiff's Motion For Temporary Restraining Order set for 3/15/2017 @ 09:30 AM before JUDGE DERRICK K. WATSON. Counsel may participate by phone by notifying Judge Watson's Courtroom Manager (808-541-3073) by 3/14/2017 and providing the phone number where counsel may be reached at the time of the hearing. The Court will contact the parties via phone at the time of the hearing.(tyk)CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications were served by first class mail on the date of this docket entry. Modified on 3/9/2017 (tyk, ).
March 8, 2017 60 BRIEFING SCHEDULE ORDER. Signed by JUDGE DERRICK K. WATSON on 3/8/2017. Related doc: 57 (ecs, )CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications were served by first class mail on the date of this docket entry (Attachment replaced on 3/8/2017, NEF regenerated: # 1 Main Document - PDF flattened) (ecs, ).
March 8, 2017 59 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFFS' 58 MOTION TO LIFT STAY AND FOR LEAVE TO FILE A SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT. Signed by JUDGE DERRICK K. WATSON on 3/8/2017. - The Court lifts the litigation stay imposed by the Orders dated February 7, 2017 (Dkt. No. 27 ) and February 9, 2017 (Dkt. No. []32). Plaintiffs STATE OF HAWAI'I and ISMAIL ELSHIKH may file a Second Amended Complaint in the form submitted to the Court as an exhibit to the Motion (Dkt. No. 58-1). (ecs, )CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications were served by first class mail on the date of this docket entry (Attachment replaced on 3/8/2017, NEF regenerated: # 1 Main Document - PDF flattened) (ecs, ).
March 7, 2017 58 MOTION to Lift Stay and for Leave to File a Second Amended Complaint Neal Katyal appearing for Plaintiffs Ismail Elshikh, State of Hawaii (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Proposed Second Amended Complaint, # 2 Exhibit Proposed Order, # 3 Certificate of Service)(Katyal, Neal)
March 7, 2017 57 Joint MOTION for Entry of Proposed Briefing Schedule Neal Katyal appearing for Plaintiffs Ismail Elshikh, State of Hawaii (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Katyal, Neal)
March 6, 2017 56 NOTICE by John F. Kelly, Rex Tillerson, Donald J. Trump, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, U.S. Department of State, United States of America of Filing of Executive Order John F. Kelly, Rex Tillerson, Donald J. Trump, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, U.S. Department of State, United States of America. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A: New Executive Order)(Rosenberg, Brad)
February 23, 2017 55 Featured Case ORDER Granting 45 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice [Thomas Schmidt]. Signed by Magistrate Judge KENNETH J. MANSFIELD on 2/23/2017. (ecs, )CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications were served by first class mail on the date of this docket entry
February 23, 2017 54 Featured Case ORDER Granting 44 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice [Sara Solow]. Signed by Magistrate Judge KENNETH J. MANSFIELD on 2/23/2017. (ecs, )CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications were served by first class mail on the date of this docket entry
February 23, 2017 53 Featured Case ORDER Granting 43 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice [Mitchell Reich]. Signed by Magistrate Judge KENNETH J. MANSFIELD on 2/23/2017. (ecs, )CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications were served by first class mail on the date of this docket entry
February 23, 2017 52 Featured Case ORDER Granting 42 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice [Colleen Roh Sinzdak]. Signed by Magistrate Judge KENNETH J. MANSFIELD on 2/23/2017. (ecs, )CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications were served by first class mail on the date of this docket entry
February 23, 2017 51 Featured Case ORDER granting 41 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice [Alexander Bowerman]. Signed by Magistrate Judge KENNETH J. MANSFIELD on 2/23/2017. (ecs, )CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications were served by first class mail on the date of this docket entry
February 17, 2017 50 SUPPLEMENT re 45 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice for T. Schmidt Filing fee $ 300, receipt number 0975-1831312. filed by State of Hawaii by State of Hawaii as requested by clerk. (Marie-Iha, Deirdre)
February 17, 2017 49 SUPPLEMENT re 44 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice for S. Solow Filing fee $ 300, receipt number 0975-1831306. filed by State of Hawaii by State of Hawaii as requested by clerk. (Marie-Iha, Deirdre)
February 17, 2017 48 SUPPLEMENT re 43 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice for M. Reich Filing fee $ 300, receipt number 0975-1831304. filed by State of Hawaii by State of Hawaii as requested by clerk. (Marie-Iha, Deirdre)
February 17, 2017 47 SUPPLEMENT re 42 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice for C. Roh Sinzdak Filing fee $ 300, receipt number 0975-1831299. filed by State of Hawaii by State of Hawaii as requested by clerk. (Marie-Iha, Deirdre)
February 17, 2017 46 SUPPLEMENT re 41 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice for A. Bowerman Filing fee $ 300, receipt number 0975-1831293. filed by State of Hawaii by State of Hawaii as requested by clerk. (Marie-Iha, Deirdre)
February 16, 2017 ADVISORY ENTRY re entry docket number 44 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice for S. Solow, 45 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice for T. Schmidt, 41 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice for A. Bowerman, 43 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice for M. Reich, 42 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice for C. Roh Sinzdak filed by State of Hawaii was filed incorrectly in this case with the /s/ of Pro Hac Vice applicants. Filing party has been contacted and will be filing a "Supplement" to the Motion for Pro Hac Vice in which the Declaration of Counsel and the CM/ECF Registration forms will include the wet signature of the Pro Hac Vice applicants.(ecs, )
February 15, 2017 45 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice for T. Schmidt Filing fee $ 300, receipt number 0975-1831312.Deirdre Marie-Iha appearing for Plaintiff State of Hawaii (Marie-Iha, Deirdre)
February 15, 2017 44 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice for S. Solow Filing fee $ 300, receipt number 0975-1831306.Deirdre Marie-Iha appearing for Plaintiff State of Hawaii (Marie-Iha, Deirdre)
February 15, 2017 43 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice for M. Reich Filing fee $ 300, receipt number 0975-1831304.Deirdre Marie-Iha appearing for Plaintiff State of Hawaii (Marie-Iha, Deirdre)
February 15, 2017 42 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice for C. Roh Sinzdak Filing fee $ 300, receipt number 0975-1831299.Deirdre Marie-Iha appearing for Plaintiff State of Hawaii (Marie-Iha, Deirdre)
February 15, 2017 41 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice for A. Bowerman Filing fee $ 300, receipt number 0975-1831293.Deirdre Marie-Iha appearing for Plaintiff State of Hawaii (Marie-Iha, Deirdre)
February 15, 2017 40 EO: The Court hereby lifts the stay in this matter for the limited purpose of allowing the parties to file Motions to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Notices of Appearance of Counsel, and/or Applications to Practice, consistent with Local Rules 83.1(d) and (e). The Court's February 9, 2017 stay order (Dkt. No. 32) otherwise remains in place. IT IS SO ORDERED. (JUDGE DERRICK K. WATSON)(tyk)CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications were served by first class mail on the date of this docket entry
February 15, 2017 39 Letter from Deidre Marie-Iha, Deputy Attorney to Hon. Derrick K. Watson, 2/15/2017. Re: Pending Pro Hac Vice Applications (ecs, )
February 14, 2017 38 Declaration of Clyde J. Wadsworth Regarding Exhibit C to Declaration of Douglas S. Chin in Support of Plaintiff's Motion for Temporary Restraining Order. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Wadsworth, Clyde)
February 13, 2017 37 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT for Declaratory and Injunctive Relief against All Defendants, filed by State of Hawaii. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Katyal, Neal) Modified docket text on 2/14/2017 (ecs, ).
February 13, 2017 36 EO: Upon consideration of the State of Hawaii's Motion to Partially Lift Stay ("Motion")(Dkt. No. 30), the Government's Statement of No Position (Dkt. No. 35), and good cause appearing therefor, the State's Motion is hereby GRANTED. The State may file (1) its Proposed First Amended Complaint, and (2) the Declaration of Clyde J. Wadsworth Regarding Exhibit C to Declaration of Douglas S. Chin in Support of Plaintiff's Motion for Temporary Restraining Order, both in the form previously submitted to the Court as exhibits to the Motion (see Dkt. Nos. 30-1 and 30-2). The State may do so no later than Wednesday, February 15, 2017. The Court's February 9, 2017 stay order (Dkt. No. 32) otherwise remains in place. IT IS SO ORDERED. (JUDGE DERRICK K. WATSON)(tyk)CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications were served by first class mail on the date of this docket entry
February 13, 2017 35 STATEMENT of No Position re 30 MOTION to Partially Lift Stay filed by John F. Kelly, Rex Tillerson, Donald J. Trump, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, U.S. Department of State, United States of America. (Rosenberg, Brad)
February 13, 2017 34 NOTICE of Appearance by Brad P. Rosenberg on behalf of John F. Kelly, Rex Tillerson, Donald J. Trump, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, U.S. Department of State, United States of America on behalf of John F. Kelly, Rex Tillerson, Donald J. Trump, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, U.S. Department of State, United States of America. (Rosenberg, Brad)
February 10, 2017 33 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel Schwei on behalf of John F. Kelly, Rex Tillerson, Donald J. Trump, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, U.S. Department of State, United States of America on behalf of John F. Kelly, Rex Tillerson, Donald J. Trump, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, U.S. Department of State, United States of America. (Schwei, Daniel)
February 9, 2017 32 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART DEFENDANTS' EMERGENCY MOTION TO STAY DEADLINES PENDING RESOLUTION OF APPELLATE PROCEEDINGS REGARDING NATIONWIDE INJUNCTION. Signed by JUDGE DERRICK K. WATSON on 2/9/2017. -- The Emergency Motion to Stay is GRANTED IN PART. This matter is stayed as long as the February 3, 2017 injunction entered in Washington v. Trump remains in full force and effect, or until further order of this Court. All further relief requested by the Emergency Motion to Stay is DENIED. Re: 23 Emergency MOTION to Stay Deadlines, 27 EO on Motion to Stay (ecs, )CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications were served by first class mail on the date of this docket entry
February 9, 2017 31 EO: The Court is in receipt of Plaintiff State of Hawaii's Motion to Partially Lift Stay. Dkt. No. 30. The Government may file a response to the State's motion by Monday, February 13, 2017. Thereafter, the Court intends to rule on the motion without a hearing pursuant to Local Rule 7.2(d). IT IS SO ORDERED. (JUDGE DERRICK K. WATSON)(tyk)CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications were served by first class mail on the date of this docket entry
February 8, 2017 30 MOTION to Partially Lift Stay Neal Katyal appearing for Plaintiff State of Hawaii (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Proposed First Am. Compl., # 2 Exhibit Decl. of Clyde J. Wadsworth, # 3 Exhibit Proposed Order, # 4 Certificate of Service)(Katyal, Neal)
February 8, 2017 29 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING 15 EX PARTE MOTION FOR IN CAMERA REVIEW OF EXHIBITS A, B, AND C TO DECLARATION OF DOUGLAS S. CHIN IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER. Signed by JUDGE DERRICK K. WATSON on 2/8/2017. (ecs, )CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications were served by first class mail on the date of this docket entry
February 7, 2017 28 NOTICE of Appearance by Edric Ming-Kai Ching on behalf of John F. Kelly, Rex Tillerson, Donald J. Trump, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, U.S. Department of State, United States of America on behalf of John F. Kelly, Rex Tillerson, Donald J. Trump, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, U.S. Department of State, United States of America. (Ching, Edric)
February 7, 2017 27 EO: Defendants' Emergency Motion to Stay All Deadlines Pending Resolution of Appellate Proceedings Regarding Nationwide Injunction is hereby GRANTED IN PART. Dkt. No. 23 . All pending deadlines and the hearing set for February 8, 2017 are VACATED. The matter is stayed as long as the February 3, 2017 injunction entered in Washington v. Trump, 2:17-cv-141 (W.D. Wash.), remains in place, or until further order of this Court. All further relief requested by the Emergency Motion is DENIED. A written order setting forth the Court's reasoning will follow. IT IS SO ORDERED. (JUDGE DERRICK K. WATSON)(watson1)CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications were served by first class mail on the date of this docket entry Modified to create link to motion on 2/7/2017 (ecs, ).
February 6, 2017 26 Errata re 25 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion for Emergency Stay. (Marie-Iha, Deirdre)
February 6, 2017 25 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re 23 Emergency MOTION to Stay re 18 Link,,, filed by State of Hawaii. (Chin, Douglas)
February 6, 2017 24 EO: The Court is in receipt of Defendants' Emergency Motion to Stay All Deadlines Pending Resolution of Appellate Proceedings Regarding Nationwide Injunction (''Motion to Stay''). Dkt. No. 23. Plaintiff State of Hawaii may file a response to the Motion to Stay by no later than Tuesday, February 7, 2017 at 9:00 a.m. (HST). (JUDGE DERRICK K. WATSON)(tl, )CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications were served by first class mail on the date of this docket entry
February 6, 2017 23 Emergency MOTION to Stay re 18 Link,,, Michelle R. Bennett appearing for Defendants John F. Kelly, Rex Tillerson, Donald J. Trump, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, U.S. Department of State, United States of America (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum, # 2 Proposed Order)(Bennett, Michelle)
February 6, 2017 22 NOTICE of Appearance by Michelle R. Bennett on behalf of John F. Kelly, Rex Tillerson, Donald J. Trump, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, U.S. Department of State, United States of America on behalf of John F. Kelly, Rex Tillerson, Donald J. Trump, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, U.S. Department of State, United States of America. (Bennett, Michelle)
February 6, 2017 21 Featured Case ORDER Granting 20 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. [Pro Hac Vice: Elizabeth Hagerty]. Signed by Magistrate Judge KENNETH J. MANSFIELD on 2/6/2017. (ecs, )CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications were served by first class mail on the date of this docket entry
February 5, 2017 20 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice for Elizabeth M. Hagerty Filing fee $ 300, receipt number 0975-1826107.Deirdre Marie-Iha appearing for Plaintiff State of Hawaii (Marie-Iha, Deirdre)
February 3, 2017 19 NOTICE of Hearing on Motion 2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order. Motion Hearing date has been set for 2/8/2017 at 9:30 AM in Aha Kupono before JUDGE DERRICK K. WATSON. (tl, )CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications were served by first class mail on the date of this docket entry.
February 3, 2017 18 EO: The Court is in receipt of Plaintiff State of Hawaii's Motion for Temporary Restraining Order (''TRO''). Dkt. No. 2. The Government shall file a response to the Motion for TRO by Tuesday, February 7, 2017 at 12:00 noon (HST). The Court will hold a hearing on the Motion for TRO on Wednesday, February 8, 2017 at 9:30 a.m. (HST). (JUDGE DERRICK K. WATSON)(tl, )CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications were served by first class mail on the date of this docket entry
February 3, 2017 17 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE AS TO NEAL KATYAL re: 16 . Signed by U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD on 2/3/2017.(afc) NEAL KATYAL, ESQ. (Law firm: Hogan Lovells US LLP) added as attorney pro hac vice for plaintiff STATE OF HAWAII.CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). All participants are registered to receive electronic notifications.
February 3, 2017 16 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Neal Katayal for Plaintiff State of Hawaii, Filing fee $ 300, receipt number 0975-1825774.Deirdre Marie-Iha appearing for Plaintiff State of Hawaii (Marie-Iha, Deirdre)
February 3, 2017 15 EX PARTE Motion for In Camera Review of Exhibits A, B, and C to Declaration of Douglas S. Chin in Support of Plaintiff's Motion for Temporary Restraining Order; Clyde J. Wadsworth appearing for Plaintiff State of Hawaii (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Clyde J. Wadsworth, # 2 Proposed Order)(Wadsworth, Clyde)
February 3, 2017 14 Summons Issued as to United States of America. (emt, )
February 3, 2017 13 Summons (Proposed) (Chin, Douglas)
February 3, 2017 12 Summons Issued as to Donald J. Trump, in his official capacity as President of the United States. (emt, )
February 3, 2017 11 Summons (Proposed) (Chin, Douglas)
February 3, 2017 10 Declaration re 2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order . (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Doe 1, # 2 Exhibit B - Doe 2, # 3 Exhibit C - Doe 3, # 4 Exhibit D - Dickson Declaration, # 5 Exhibit E - Slaveria Declaration, # 6 Exhibit F - Szigeti Declaration, # 7 Exhibit G - Higashi Declaration, # 8 Exhibit H - Elshikh Declaration)(Chin, Douglas)
February 3, 2017 9 CIVIL Waiver of Service Packet ~ Notice to Parties Regarding Service Pursuant to Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedures. (Attachments: # 1 AO 398 Notice of Lawsuit and Request to Waive Service of Summons, # 2 AO 399 Waiver of Service of Summons) (emt, )
February 3, 2017 8 Order Setting Rule 16 Scheduling Conference for 09:30AM on 4/3/2017 before Magistrate Judge KENNETH J. MANSFIELD - Signed by CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT on 2/3/2017. (Attachments: # 1 Memo from Clerk Re: Corporate Disclosure Statements) (emt, )CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications were served by first class mail on the date of this docket entry. ATTACH THE SCHEDULING ORDER TO THE INITIATING DOCUMENT (COMPLAINT/NOTICE OF REMOVAL). THE SCHEDULING ORDER AND MEMO RE: CORPORATE DISCLOSURES MUST BE SERVED WITH THE DOCUMENT.
February 3, 2017 7 Summons Issued as to John F. Kelly, in his capacity as Secretary of the U.S. Department of Homeland Security. (emt, )
February 3, 2017 6 Summons Issued as to U.S. Department of Homeland Security. (emt, )
February 3, 2017 5 Summons Issued as to U.S. Department of State. (emt, )
February 3, 2017 4 Summons Issued as to Rex Tillerson, in his capacity as Secretary of State. (emt, )
February 3, 2017 3 NOTICE of Case Assignment: Please reflect Civil case number CV 17-00050 DKW-KJM on all further pleadings. (emt, )CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications were served by first class mail on the date of this docket entry.
February 3, 2017 2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order Douglas S.G. Chin appearing for Plaintiff State of Hawaii (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support of TRO, # 2 Certificate with Word Count, # 3 Proposed TRO)(Chin, Douglas)
February 3, 2017 1 COMPLAINT for Declaratory and Injunctive Relief against Donald J. Trump ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0975-1825544.), filed by State of Hawaii. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit 10, # 11 Exhibit 11, # 12 JS 44 - Civil Cover Sheet, # 13 Tillerson Summons, # 14 State Department Summons, # 15 DHS Summons, # 16 Kelly Summons)(Chin, Douglas)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Hawaii District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: State of Hawaii v. Trump
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of Hawaii
Represented By: Alexander Bowerman
Represented By: Douglas S.G. Chin
Represented By: Kimberly T. Guidry
Represented By: Elizabeth Hagerty
Represented By: Donna H. Kalama
Represented By: Neal Katyal
Represented By: Deirdre Marie-Iha
Represented By: Robert T. Nakatsuji
Represented By: Mitchell Reich
Represented By: Thomas Schmidt
Represented By: Colleen Roh Sinzdak
Represented By: Sara Solow
Represented By: Clyde J. Wadsworth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ismail Elshikh
Represented By: Alexander Bowerman
Represented By: Elizabeth Hagerty
Represented By: Neal Katyal
Represented By: Mitchell Reich
Represented By: Thomas Schmidt
Represented By: Colleen Roh Sinzdak
Represented By: Sara Solow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donald J. Trump
Represented By: Michelle R. Bennett
Represented By: Edric Ming-Kai Ching
Represented By: Florence T. Nakakuni
Represented By: Brad P. Rosenberg
Represented By: Daniel Schwei
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Department of Homeland Security
Represented By: Michelle R. Bennett
Represented By: Edric Ming-Kai Ching
Represented By: Brad P. Rosenberg
Represented By: Daniel Schwei
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John F. Kelly
Represented By: Michelle R. Bennett
Represented By: Edric Ming-Kai Ching
Represented By: Brad P. Rosenberg
Represented By: Daniel Schwei
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Department of State
Represented By: Michelle R. Bennett
Represented By: Edric Ming-Kai Ching
Represented By: Brad P. Rosenberg
Represented By: Daniel Schwei
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rex Tillerson
Represented By: Michelle R. Bennett
Represented By: Edric Ming-Kai Ching
Represented By: Brad P. Rosenberg
Represented By: Daniel Schwei
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Represented By: Michelle R. Bennett
Represented By: Edric Ming-Kai Ching
Represented By: Brad P. Rosenberg
Represented By: Daniel Schwei
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?