Passons v. Christensen
Petitioner: Russell Allen Passons
Respondent: Jay Christensen
Case Number: 1:2018cv00351
Filed: August 10, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Idaho
Presiding Judge: Ronald E Bush
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 27, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 27, 2018 Pursuant to the #8 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal, the Clerk closed this case. The Petitioner indicates that he is proceeding in 1:18-cv-00344-CWD and that this case was opened erroneously. The Motion to Take Judicial Notice is already on the docket as a pending motion in 1:18-cv-00344-CWD. (cjs)
August 27, 2018 Filing 8 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Russell Allen Passons (cjs)(Case Closed by Clerk.) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/27/2018: #1 Exhibit) (cjs).
August 16, 2018 Filing 7 Docket entry only - CONSENT to Magistrate Judge filed. (cjs)
August 16, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE of Assignment to Magistrate Judge and Requirement for Consent sent to counsel for Jay Christensen, Russell Allen Passons re #3 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus Consent/Objection to Magistrate due by 10/15/2018. (cjs)
August 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER of Conditional Filing - (cjs)
August 10, 2018 Filing 4 MOTION to Take Judicial Notice by Petitioner Russell Allen Passons. Responses due by 8/31/2018 (cjs)
August 10, 2018 Filing 3 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Russell Allen Passons. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter, #2 Envelope)(cjs)
August 10, 2018 Filing 2 Statement of Prisoner Trust Fund Account, This is a sealed document. re #1 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Russell Allen Passons. (cjs)
August 10, 2018 Filing 1 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Petitioner Russell Allen Passons. Responses due by 8/31/2018 (cjs)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Idaho District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Passons v. Christensen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Jay Christensen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Russell Allen Passons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?