Strojnik v. Block 22 LLC
Plaintiff: Peter Strojnik
Defendant: Block 22 LLC
Case Number: 1:2018cv00556
Filed: December 17, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Idaho
Presiding Judge: B Lynn Winmill
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 LITIGATION ORDER AND NOTICE OF TELEPHONIC SCHEDULING CONFERENCE - Case Management deadline set for 2/27/2019 for the joint Litigation Plan and Discovery Plan. Telephonic Scheduling Conference set for 3/6/2019 11:00 AM in Boise Chambers before Judge B. Lynn Winmill. Signed by Judge B. Lynn Winmill. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (cjs)
January 30, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Availability of Magistrate Judge and Requirement for Consent sent to counsel for Block 22 LLC, Peter Strojnik re #4 Answer to Complaint Consent/Objection to Magistrate due by 4/1/2019. (alw)
January 29, 2019 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Block 22 LLC. (Walters, Matthew)
January 29, 2019 Filing 4 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Block 22 LLC.(Walters, Matthew)
January 14, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Peter Strojnik. Block 22 LLC served on 1/8/2019, answer due 1/29/2019. (alw)
December 20, 2018 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Block 22 LLC. (Print attached Summons for service.) (cjs)
December 17, 2018 RECEIPT: Civil Filing Fee Fee Received $ 400.00, receipt # IDX100023453 PAID IN FULL (cjs)
December 17, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Block 22 LLC Summons Issued, filed by Peter Strojnik. (Attachments: #1 Addendum A, #2 Cover Sheet)(cjs)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Idaho District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Strojnik v. Block 22 LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Block 22 LLC
Represented By: Kyle D. Duren
Represented By: Matthew L Walters
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Peter Strojnik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?