Contreras v. Christianson

Petitioner: Jorge Contreras
Respondent: Jay Christianson
Case Number: 1:2019cv00098
Filed: March 25, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Idaho
Presiding Judge: Candy W Dale
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 JUDGMENT It is ORDERED, ADJUDGED, and DECREED that this entire case is DISMISSED with prejudice. This case is also ordered closed. Signed by Judge Candy W. Dale. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (jp)
June 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 INITIAL REVIEW ORDER Petitioner's Application to Proceed in Forma Pauperis (Dkt. #1 ) is GRANTED. The Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (Dkt. #3 ) is DENIED with prejudice. The Court does not find its resolution of this habeas matter to be reasonably debatable, and a certificate of appealability will not issue. Signed by Judge Candy W. Dale. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (jp)
April 22, 2019 Filing 6 ALL PARTIES HAVE CONSENTED TO PROCEED BEFORE A US MAGISTRATE JUDGE(jp)
March 26, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Assignment to Magistrate Judge and Requirement for Consent sent to Jorge Contreras re #3 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (jp) (cc: l.anderson)
March 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER of Conditional Filing - (jp)
March 25, 2019 Filing 3 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Jorge Contreras.(jp)
March 25, 2019 Filing 2 Statement of Prisoner Trust Fund Account, This is a sealed document. re #1 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Jorge Contreras. (jp)
March 25, 2019 Filing 1 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Petitioner Jorge Contreras. Responses due by 4/15/2019 (jp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Idaho District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Contreras v. Christianson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Jay Christianson
Represented By: L LaMont Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Jorge Contreras
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?