WildEarth Guardians et al v. U.S. Forest Service et al
Plaintiff: WildEarth Guardians, Western Watersheds Project and Wilderness Watch
Defendant: U.S. Fish and Wildlife Service and U.S. Forest Service
Case Number: 1:2019cv00203
Filed: June 5, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Idaho
Presiding Judge: Candy W Dale
Nature of Suit: Environmental Matters
Cause of Action: 16:1538
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 26, 2019 Set Deadlines/Hearings: U.S. Fish and Wildlife Service answer due 9/9/2019; U.S. Forest Service answer due 9/9/2019. (jp)
July 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 DOCKET ENTRY ORDER - Upon review of the parties' stipulation #14 , and finding good cause therefore, Defendants have up to and including September 9, 2019, within which to respond to the Complaint. Signed by Judge Candy W. Dale. (klw)
July 25, 2019 Filing 14 STIPULATION re #12 Amended Complaint FOR EXTENSION OF TIME FOR RESPONSE TO COMPLAINT by U.S. Fish and Wildlife Service, U.S. Forest Service. (Williams, Robert)
July 23, 2019 Filing 13 ALL PARTIES HAVE CONSENTED TO PROCEED BEFORE A US MAGISTRATE JUDGE (ckh)
July 19, 2019 Filing 12 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by All Plaintiffs.(Frost, Peter)
July 16, 2019 Filing 11 Docket entry only - CONSENT to Magistrate Judge filed. (ckh)
July 15, 2019 Filing 10 Corporate Disclosure Statement by WildEarth Guardians. (Frost, Peter)
July 15, 2019 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by WildEarth Guardians (Frost, Peter)
July 5, 2019 NOTICE: Pursuant to FRCP 7.1 you are required to file a Corporate Disclosure Statement with the Clerk's Office. You can do this by choosing the category Other Documents, then select Corporate Disclosure Statement. (jd)
July 5, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Assignment to Magistrate Judge and Requirement for Consent sent to counsel for plaintiffs and defendants re #7 Notice of Appearance, #1 Complaint Consent/Objection to Magistrate due by 9/3/2019. (jd)
June 28, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert Pendleton Williams on behalf of U.S. Fish and Wildlife Service, U.S. Forest Service (Williams, Robert)
June 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 LITIGATION ORDER AND NOTICE OF TELEPHONIC SCHEDULING CONFERENCE Telephonic Scheduling Conference set for 9/9/2019 10:30 AM in Telephonic Hearing - Boise Courtroom 6 before Judge Candy W. Dale. On or before 9/3/19, the parties must file with the Court the joint Litigation Plan and Discovery Plan. Signed by Judge Candy W. Dale. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (jp)
June 10, 2019 Filing 5 DOCKET ENTRY ORDER Approving #3 & #4 Applications for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of attorneys Peter M.K. Frost & Matthew Kellogg Bishop for Western Watersheds Project, WildEarth Guardians, and Wilderness Watch. Per General Order 206, out-of-state counsel shall immediately register for ECF. (Notice sent to CM/ECF Registration Clerk) (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (jp)
June 7, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION FOR PRO HAC VICE APPEARANCE by Matthew K. Bishop. ( Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0976-1897604.)Dana M Johnson appearing for Plaintiffs Western Watersheds Project, WildEarth Guardians, Wilderness Watch. Responses due by 6/28/2019 (Johnson, Dana)
June 7, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION FOR PRO HAC VICE APPEARANCE by Peter M.K. Frost. ( Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0976-1897601.)Dana M Johnson appearing for Plaintiffs Western Watersheds Project, WildEarth Guardians, Wilderness Watch. Responses due by 6/28/2019 (Johnson, Dana)
June 6, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to all Defendants, U.S. Attorney (Print attached Summons for service.) (Attachments: #1 U.S. Forest Service summons)(jd)
June 5, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0976-1896582.), filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons)(Johnson, Dana)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Idaho District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: WildEarth Guardians et al v. U.S. Forest Service et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WildEarth Guardians
Represented By: Dana M Johnson
Represented By: Matthew Kellogg Bishop
Represented By: Peter M.K. Frost
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Western Watersheds Project
Represented By: Dana M Johnson
Represented By: Matthew Kellogg Bishop
Represented By: Peter M.K. Frost
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wilderness Watch
Represented By: Dana M Johnson
Represented By: Matthew Kellogg Bishop
Represented By: Peter M.K. Frost
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Fish and Wildlife Service
Represented By: Robert Pendleton Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Forest Service
Represented By: Robert Pendleton Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?