Roland et al v. Alta Mesa Resources, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Daniel Roland, Randall Kauffman, Marcia Roland, Richard Peterson, Thana Kauffman, Brett Moore, Thomas G Roland, Semon Terri, Kathleen Moore, Gregory Semon, Terri Semon, Marcia R Roland, Kathleen A Moore, Thana M Kauffman, Randall C Kauffman and Brett L Moore
Defendant: High Mesa Services, LLC, Alta Mesa Resources, Inc., Alta Mesa Services, LP, AM Idaho, LLC, Alta Mesa Holdings, LP, High Mesa Holdings, LP and Northwest Gas Processing LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv00212
Filed: June 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Idaho
Presiding Judge: Ronald E Bush
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 7, 2019 Filing 8 Docket entry only - CONSENT to Magistrate Judge filed. (ckh)
June 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 DOCKET ENTRY ORDER approving #6 Motion for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of attorney Rex A. Sharp and Reagan E. Bradford #5 for Randall C Kauffman, Thana M Kauffman, Brett L Moore, Kathleen A Moore, Richard Peterson, Daniel Roland, Marcia R Roland, Thomas G Roland,Gregory Semon, Terri Semon Per General Order 206, out-of-state counsel shall immediately register for ECF. (Notice sent to CM/ECF Registration Clerk);(Notice sent to CM/ECF Registration Clerk) Signed by Judge Ronald E. Bush. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (jd) Modified on 6/21/2019 (jd).
June 20, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION FOR PRO HAC VICE APPEARANCE by Rex A. Sharp. ( Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0976-1902987.)Vaughn Fisher appearing for Plaintiffs Randall C Kauffman, Thana M Kauffman, Brett L Moore, Kathleen A Moore, Richard Peterson, Daniel Roland, Marcia R Roland, Thomas G Roland, Gregory Semon, Terri Semon. Responses due by 7/11/2019 (Fisher, Vaughn)
June 20, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION FOR PRO HAC VICE APPEARANCE by Reagan E. Bradford. ( Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0976-1902973.)Vaughn Fisher appearing for Plaintiffs Randall C Kauffman, Thana M Kauffman, Brett L Moore, Kathleen A Moore, Richard Peterson, Daniel Roland, Marcia R Roland, Thomas G Roland, Gregory Semon, Terri Semon. Responses due by 7/11/2019 (Fisher, Vaughn)
June 19, 2019 Filing 4 ANSWER to Complaint by AM Idaho, LLC, Alta Mesa Holdings, LP, Alta Mesa Resources, Inc., Alta Mesa Services, LP, High Mesa Holdings, LP, High Mesa Services, LLC.(Christian, Michael)
June 14, 2019 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by AM Idaho, LLC, Alta Mesa Holdings, LP, Alta Mesa Resources, Inc., Alta Mesa Services, LP, High Mesa Holdings, LP, High Mesa Services, LLC identifying Corporate Parent High Mesa Holdings, LP for AM Idaho, LLC, High Mesa Services, LLC; Corporate Parent Alta Mesa Holdings, LP for Alta Mesa Services, LP; Corporate Parent Alta Mesa Resources, Inc. for Alta Mesa Holdings, LP.. (Christian, Michael)
June 13, 2019 NOTICE: Pursuant to FRCP 7.1 you are required to file a Corporate Disclosure Statement with the Clerk's Office. You can do this by choosing the category Other Documents, then select Corporate Disclosure Statement. (jd)
June 13, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Assignment to Magistrate Judge and Requirement for Consent sent to counsel for AM Idaho, LLC, Alta Mesa Holdings, LP, Alta Mesa Resources, Inc., Alta Mesa Services, LP, High Mesa Holdings, LP, High Mesa Services, LLC, Randall C Kauffman, Thana M Kauffman, Brett L Moore, Kathleen A Moore, Northwest Gas Processing LLC, Richard Peterson, Daniel Roland, Marcia R Roland, Thomas G Roland, Gregory Semon, Terri Semon re #1 Notice of Removal, Consent/Objection to Magistrate due by 8/12/2019. (jd)
June 12, 2019 RETURN OF SERVICE/PROCESS ASSUMED EXECUTED - All Defendants. (service assumed for internal reporting purpose only) (jd)
June 12, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by All Defendants Alta Mesa Resources, Inc., Alta Mesa Services, LP, Alta Mesa Holdings, LP, AM Idaho LLC, High Mesa Holdings, LP, High Mesa Services, LLC, and Northwest Gas Processing LLC. (Filing fee $400 receipt number0976-1899579.), filed by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A- State Court Docket, #3 Exhibit B- Complaint, #4 Exhibit C- Acknowledgment of Service, #5 Exhibit D- Summons to Alta Mesa Resources, Inc., #6 Exhibit E- Summons to Alta Mesa Services, LP, #7 Exhibit F- Summons to Alta Mesa Holdings, LP, #8 Exhibit G-Summons to AM IDAHO LLC, #9 Exhibit H-Summons to High Mesa Holdings, LP, #10 Exhibit I- Summons to High Mesa Services, LLC, #11 Exhibit J- Summons to Northwest Gas Processing, LLC, #12 Exhibit K- Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal)(Christian, Michael) Modified on 6/13/2019 (jd).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Idaho District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Roland et al v. Alta Mesa Resources, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: High Mesa Services, LLC
Represented By: Michael Christian
Represented By: Hannah Andazola
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alta Mesa Resources, Inc.
Represented By: Michael Christian
Represented By: Hannah Andazola
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alta Mesa Services, LP
Represented By: Michael Christian
Represented By: Hannah Andazola
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AM Idaho, LLC
Represented By: Michael Christian
Represented By: Hannah Andazola
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alta Mesa Holdings, LP
Represented By: Michael Christian
Represented By: Hannah Andazola
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: High Mesa Holdings, LP
Represented By: Michael Christian
Represented By: Hannah Andazola
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Northwest Gas Processing LLC
Represented By: Michael Christian
Represented By: Hannah Andazola
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel Roland
Represented By: Vaughn Fisher
Represented By: Jeremiah Matthew Hudson
Represented By: Rex A. Sharp
Represented By: Reagan E. Bradford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Randall Kauffman
Represented By: Vaughn Fisher
Represented By: Jeremiah Matthew Hudson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marcia Roland
Represented By: Vaughn Fisher
Represented By: Jeremiah Matthew Hudson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Peterson
Represented By: Vaughn Fisher
Represented By: Jeremiah Matthew Hudson
Represented By: Rex A. Sharp
Represented By: Reagan E. Bradford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thana Kauffman
Represented By: Vaughn Fisher
Represented By: Jeremiah Matthew Hudson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brett Moore
Represented By: Vaughn Fisher
Represented By: Jeremiah Matthew Hudson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas G Roland
Represented By: Vaughn Fisher
Represented By: Jeremiah Matthew Hudson
Represented By: Rex A. Sharp
Represented By: Reagan E. Bradford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Semon Terri
Represented By: Vaughn Fisher
Represented By: Jeremiah Matthew Hudson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kathleen Moore
Represented By: Vaughn Fisher
Represented By: Jeremiah Matthew Hudson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gregory Semon
Represented By: Vaughn Fisher
Represented By: Jeremiah Matthew Hudson
Represented By: Rex A. Sharp
Represented By: Reagan E. Bradford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Terri Semon
Represented By: Vaughn Fisher
Represented By: Jeremiah Matthew Hudson
Represented By: Rex A. Sharp
Represented By: Reagan E. Bradford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marcia R Roland
Represented By: Vaughn Fisher
Represented By: Jeremiah Matthew Hudson
Represented By: Rex A. Sharp
Represented By: Reagan E. Bradford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kathleen A Moore
Represented By: Vaughn Fisher
Represented By: Jeremiah Matthew Hudson
Represented By: Rex A. Sharp
Represented By: Reagan E. Bradford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thana M Kauffman
Represented By: Vaughn Fisher
Represented By: Jeremiah Matthew Hudson
Represented By: Rex A. Sharp
Represented By: Reagan E. Bradford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Randall C Kauffman
Represented By: Vaughn Fisher
Represented By: Jeremiah Matthew Hudson
Represented By: Rex A. Sharp
Represented By: Reagan E. Bradford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brett L Moore
Represented By: Vaughn Fisher
Represented By: Jeremiah Matthew Hudson
Represented By: Rex A. Sharp
Represented By: Reagan E. Bradford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?