Mendez v. Ada County, et al
Plaintiff: Raul Mendez
Defendant: Ada County, Republic Services, Ada County Billing Services, Ada County Commissioners, Ammon Taylor and Ada County Treasurer
Case Number: 1:2019cv00301
Filed: August 2, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Idaho
Presiding Judge: B Lynn Winmill
Nature of Suit: Constitutional - State Statute
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 30, 2019 Filing 9 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Ada County, Ada County Billing Services, Ada County Commissioners.(Rutherford, Richard)
September 30, 2019 Filing 8 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Republic Services. (Risch, Jason)
September 30, 2019 Filing 7 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Republic Services.(Risch, Jason)
September 12, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Raul Mendez. Republic Services served on 9/9/2019, answer due 9/30/2019. (ckh)
September 12, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Raul Mendez. Ada County Commissioners served on 9/10/2019, answer due 10/1/2019. (ckh)
August 20, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Republic Services. (Print attached Summons for service.) (ckh)
August 20, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Ada County. (Print attached Summons for service.) (ckh)
August 2, 2019 RECEIPT: Cash Fee Received $ 400, receipt # 24691 (ckh)
August 2, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction (Responses due by 8/23/2019) by Plaintiff Raul Mendez. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Pay Stub) (ckh)
August 2, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Raul Mendez. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet) (ckh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Idaho District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mendez v. Ada County, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ada County
Represented By: Richard S Rutherford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Republic Services
Represented By: Jason S Risch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ada County Billing Services
Represented By: Richard S Rutherford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ada County Commissioners
Represented By: Richard S Rutherford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ammon Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ada County Treasurer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Raul Mendez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?