Stoddard v. Browning, et al.
Plaintiff: Daniel Paul Stoddard
Defendant: IDOC and David Michael Browning
Case Number: 1:2020cv00153
Filed: March 27, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Idaho
Presiding Judge: B Lynn Winmill
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 17, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 5, 2020 Filing 7 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Daniel Paul Stoddard.(jd)
April 23, 2020 DOCKET ENTRY CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re #6 Order Directing Prisoner Payment, was mailed to Josh Tewalt, Director, Idaho Department of CorrectionAttn: Inmate Accounts 1299 N Orchard, Suite 110, Boise, ID 83706. (jd)
April 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER Directing Monthly Payments be made from Prison Account of Daniel Paul Stoddard. Motions terminated: #4 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Daniel Paul Stoddard (Notice sent to Finance). Signed by Judge B. Lynn Winmill. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (jd)
April 16, 2020 Filing 5 Statement of Prisoner Trust Fund Account, This is a sealed document. re #4 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Daniel Paul Stoddard. (jd)
April 16, 2020 Filing 4 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Daniel Paul Stoddard. Responses due by 5/7/2020. (jd)
April 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 NOTICE OF INTENT TO DISMISS - Within 28 days after entry of this Order, Plaintiff must either pay the filing fee in full or apply for in forma pauperis status. If Plaintiff does neither, this case may be dismissed without further notice. Alternatively, if Plaintiff intended to file this case in Ada County Court, and if he no longer intends to pursue this case in this Court, Plaintiff may file a Notice of Voluntary Dismissal, in which case no filing fee will be due. Signed by Judge B. Lynn Winmill. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (jd)
March 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER of Conditional Filing - (kt)
March 27, 2020 Filing 1 PRISONER COMPLAINT (SFS Church Tort Claim) against All Defendants, filed by Daniel Paul Stoddard.(kt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Idaho District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stoddard v. Browning, et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: IDOC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Michael Browning
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel Paul Stoddard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?