Richardson et al v. Idaho Department of Health and Welfare et al
Plaintiff: Samantha Richardson, A.M., S.M., Karin Rogers and K.M.
Defendant: Idaho Department of Health and Welfare, Stacey White, Jennifer Duncan, Jeremy M Clark, Amber M Clark and John Does 1-2
Case Number: 2:2010cv00648
Filed: December 30, 2010
Court: US District Court for the District of Idaho
Office: CDA - Northern Office
County: Kootenai - Northern
Presiding Judge: B. Lynn Winmill
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1981
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 18, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 120 MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part 96 Defendants Stacy White and Jennifer Duncans Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge B. Lynn Winmill. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (cjs)
March 31, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 91 MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part 88 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge B. Lynn Winmill. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (st)
February 10, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 64 SECOND AMENDED MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER re: 63 Amended Memorandum Decision and Order re: 62 Memorandum Decision and Order granting 56 MOTION to Dismiss. Signed by Judge B. Lynn Winmill. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by cjm) Modified on 2/10/2012 to edit text from deny to grant (cjm).
February 3, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 62 MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER granting 56 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction. The Court will dismiss the claims against the Department. However, Plaintiffs claims against the Departments individual employees remain. Signed by Judge B. Lynn Winmill. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by cjm)
November 8, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER granting 48 MOTION to Reopen Case. The automatic stay this Court entered shall be lifted, and the Clerk of the Court shall withdraw thereference to the bankruptcy case for Bankruptcy Case No. 10-20466-TLM. Upon lifting the stay in this case, the Court will first consider the question of whether Plaintiffs claims are dischargeable. To that end, the Court will set a telephonic scheduling conference to set a hearing and discovery deadlines on this issue. Plaintiffs shall file an Amended Com plaint by 11/23/2011 omitting any negligence claims against the Clark. Signed by Judge B. Lynn Winmill. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by cjm)(Emailed to TLM, sh, and aw in the Bankruptcy Court by cjm).
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Idaho District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Richardson et al v. Idaho Department of Health and Welfare et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Samantha Richardson
Represented By: Roland D Watson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: A.M.
Represented By: Roland D Watson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: S.M.
Represented By: Roland D Watson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Karin Rogers
Represented By: Roland D Watson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: K.M.
Represented By: Roland D Watson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Idaho Department of Health and Welfare
Represented By: Theodore O Creason
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stacey White
Represented By: Theodore O Creason
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jennifer Duncan
Represented By: Theodore O Creason
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeremy M Clark
Represented By: Mark A Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amber M Clark
Represented By: Mark A Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does 1-2
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?