Maddox et al v. City of Sandpoint et al
Plaintiff: Dana Maddox, D. M., Raymond Foster and H. F.
Defendant: City of Sandpoint, City of Sandpoint Police Department, Skylar Carl Ziegler, Michael Henry Valenzuela, Corey Coon, John or Jane Doe #1-10 and Shane Riley
Case Number: 2:2016cv00162
Filed: April 15, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of Idaho
Office: CDA - Northern Office
County: Bonner - Northern
Presiding Judge: B. Lynn Winmill
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 148 MEMORANDUM DECISION & ORDER re 120 Motion in Limine, 123 Motion in Limine and 124 Motion in Limine. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendants' Motions in Limine (Dkts. 120 , 124 ) are GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART. Plaintiff's Motion in Limine (Dkt. 123 ) is GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART. Signed by Judge B. Lynn Winmill. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (ckh)
September 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 100 AMENDED CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER re 39 Case Management Order - Dispositive Motions due by 1/25/2019. Dispositive Motion Hearing set for 3/7/2019 02:30 PM (PST) in Coeur d Alene - District Courtroom before Judge B. Lynn Winmill (Decision to be issued b y 4/8/2019). Non-Expert Discovery due by 3/1/2019. Jury Trial set for 8/5/2019 01:30 PM (PST) in Coeur d Alene - District Courtroom before Judge B. Lynn Winmill. Telephonic Pretrial Conference set for 7/18/2019 11:00 AM (MST) in Boise Chambers before Judge B. Lynn Winmill. Signed by Judge B. Lynn Winmill. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (cjs) (Main Document 100 replaced on 9/24/2018 to include Judge's signature on Order. NEF regenerated.) (cjs).
September 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 73 MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER - IT IS ORDERED: 1. Defendants Motion for Summary Judgment on the issue of qualified immunity for Officers Ziegler and Valenzuela (Dkt. 55 ) is DENIED. 2. Within 10 days after entry of this order, the parties are ordere d to submit a stipulation as to new expert disclosure deadlines. 3. Per the Stipulation Re: Summary Judgment (Dkt. 56 ), Defendants may contact the Court to schedule deadlines for hearing on the remaining portions of their motion for summary judgment. Signed by Judge B. Lynn Winmill. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (cjs)
September 27, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER REGARDING PHASED DISCOVERY re 44 Stipulation. Defendants to file their motions related to the qualified immunity issue by 12/16/2016. Plaintiffs to respond by 1/13/2017 (Case Management deadline set for 12/16/2016). Signed by Judge B. Lynn Winmill. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (cjs)
September 13, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 39 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER (Standard Track) - Proposed Agreement on phased discovery timeline due by 9/27/2016. ADR Plan to be filed by 12/7/2016. Amended Pleadings and Joinder of Partiesdue by 11/7/2016. Discovery due by 4/28/2017. Dispositive Motions d ue by 5/29/2017. The parties have filed a stipulated Discovery Plan (Dkt. 36 ) that the Court incorporates by reference herein and APPROVES as an Order of the Court. Signed by Judge B. Lynn Winmill. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (cjs)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Idaho District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Maddox et al v. City of Sandpoint et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dana Maddox
Represented By: April M Linscott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: D. M.
Represented By: April M Linscott
Represented By: April M Linscott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Raymond Foster
Represented By: April M Linscott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: H. F.
Represented By: April M Linscott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Sandpoint
Represented By: Peter C Erbland
Represented By: Jennifer Fegert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Sandpoint Police Department
Represented By: Peter C Erbland
Represented By: Jennifer Fegert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Skylar Carl Ziegler
Represented By: Peter C Erbland
Represented By: Jennifer Fegert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Henry Valenzuela
Represented By: Peter C Erbland
Represented By: Jennifer Fegert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Corey Coon
Represented By: Peter C Erbland
Represented By: Jennifer Fegert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John or Jane Doe #1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shane Riley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?