P&S Enterprises, LLC v. Rodriguez et al

Plaintiff: P&S Enterprises, LLC dba Coyote Transport and P&S Enterprises, LLC
Defendant: Swift Transportation Company, Quemetco West, LLC, Interstate Equipment Leasing, LLC, Quemetco, Inc., Israel Rodriguez and Swift Transportation Co., LLC
Case Number: 3:2018cv00514
Filed: November 20, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Idaho
Presiding Judge: David C Nye
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 14, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 14, 2019 Filing 8 WAIVER by Plaintiff P&S Enterprises, LLC. (Ericson, Maren)
January 4, 2019 Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement by P&S Enterprises, LLC. (Ericson, Maren)
December 26, 2018 Filing 6 Docket entry only - CONSENT to Magistrate Judge filed. (alw)
December 21, 2018 Filing 5 MOTION to Consolidate Cases 1:18-cv-416-DCN Mark J. Orler appearing for Defendant Swift Transportation Co., LLC. Responses due by 1/11/2019 (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support of Motion to Consolidate, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B)(Orler, Mark)
December 4, 2018 NOTICE: Pursuant to FRCP 7.1 you are required to file a Corporate Disclosure Statement with the Clerk's Office. You can do this by choosing the category Other Documents, then select Corporate Disclosure Statement. (alw)
December 4, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE of Availability of Magistrate Judge and Requirement for Consent sent to counsel for Interstate Equipment Leasing, LLC, P&S Enterprises, LLC, Israel Rodriguez, Swift Transportation Co., LLC, Swift Transportation Company re #1 Notice of Removal, Consent/Objection to Magistrate due by 2/2/2019. (alw)
December 4, 2018 RETURN OF SERVICE/PROCESS ASSUMED EXECUTED - Interstate Equipment Leasing, LLC served on 11/20/2018; Quemetco West, LLC served on 11/20/2018; Quemetco, Inc. served on 11/20/2018; Israel Rodriguez served on 11/20/2018; Swift Transportation Co., LLC served on 11/20/2018; Swift Transportation Company served on 11/20/2018. (no service document on file, service assumed for internal reporting purpose only) (alw)
November 27, 2018 Filing 3 ANSWER to Complaint , CROSSCLAIM against Quemetco West, LLC, Quemetco, Inc. by Swift Transportation Co., LLC, Swift Transportation Company, Israel Rodriguez, Interstate Equipment Leasing, LLC.(Farley, Donald)
November 21, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Donald J Farley on behalf of Interstate Equipment Leasing, LLC, Israel Rodriguez, Swift Transportation Co., LLC, Swift Transportation Company (Farley, Donald)
November 20, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Swift Transportation Co., LLC, Swift Transportation Company, Israel Rodriguez, Interstate Equipment Leasing, LLC from Second Judicial District, Lewis County, case number CV31-18-0160.(Filing fee $400 receipt number0976-1813712.), filed by Swift Transportation Co., LLC, Swift Transportation Company, Israel Rodriguez, Interstate Equipment Leasing, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - Consent to Removal, #3 Exhibit C - Notice of Removal Filed in State Court, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Orler, Mark)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Idaho District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: P&S Enterprises, LLC v. Rodriguez et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Swift Transportation Company
Represented By: Mark J. Orler
Represented By: Donald J Farley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Quemetco West, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Interstate Equipment Leasing, LLC
Represented By: Mark J. Orler
Represented By: Donald J Farley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Quemetco, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Israel Rodriguez
Represented By: Mark J. Orler
Represented By: Donald J Farley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Swift Transportation Co., LLC
Represented By: Mark J. Orler
Represented By: Donald J Farley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: P&S Enterprises, LLC dba Coyote Transport
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: P&S Enterprises, LLC
Represented By: Maren C Ericson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?