Chandler v. Pioneer Credit Recovery, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Patricia Chandler
Defendant: Pioneer Credit Recovery, Inc. and Phoenix Financial Services, LLC
Case Number: 4:2018cv00385
Filed: August 30, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Idaho
Presiding Judge: Candy W Dale
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 23, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 23, 2018 Filing 12 DISCOVERY PLAN by Patricia Chandler re #11 Scheduling Conf Form/Litigation Plan . (Ballard, Ryan)
October 23, 2018 Filing 11 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE FORM - LITIGATION PLAN by Patricia Chandler. (Ballard, Ryan)
October 15, 2018 Filing 10 Docket entry only - CONSENT to Magistrate Judge filed. (cjs)
October 12, 2018 Filing 9 NOTICE of Assignment to Magistrate Judge and Requirement for Consent sent to counsel for Patricia Chandler, Pioneer Credit Recovery, Inc. re #6 Answer to Complaint, #1 Complaint. Consent/Objection to Magistrate due by 12/11/2018. (jp)
October 12, 2018 Filing 8 DOCKET ENTRY ORDER Approving #7 Application for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of attorney Bonnie L Martin for Pioneer Credit Recovery, Inc. Per General Order 206, out-of-state counsel shall immediately register for ECF. (Notice sent to CM/ECF Registration Clerk) (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (jp)
October 10, 2018 Filing 7 MOTION FOR PRO HAC VICE APPEARANCE by Bonnie L. Martin. ( Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0976-1796447.)Tamsen L Leachman appearing for Defendant Pioneer Credit Recovery, Inc.. Responses due by 10/31/2018 (Leachman, Tamsen)
October 10, 2018 Filing 6 Defendant's ANSWER to #1 Complaint and Defenses by Pioneer Credit Recovery, Inc..(Leachman, Tamsen)
September 26, 2018 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Patricia Chandler. Pioneer Credit Recovery, Inc. served on 9/5/2018, answer due 9/26/2018. (Ballard, Ryan)
September 25, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal as to Phoenix Financial Services by Patricia Chandler (Ballard, Ryan)
September 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 LITIGATION ORDER AND NOTICE OF TELEPHONIC SCHEDULING CONFERENCE Telephonic Scheduling Conference set for 10/30/2018 11:00 AM in Telephonic Hearing - Boise Courtroom 6 before Judge Candy W. Dale. On or before 10/23/18, the parties must file with the Court the joint Litigation Plan and Discovery Plan. Signed by Judge Candy W. Dale. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (jp)
September 4, 2018 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Phoenix Financial Services, LLC, Pioneer Credit Recovery, Inc.. (Print attached Summons for service.) (Attachments: #1 Summons)(jp)
August 30, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0976-1780096.), filed by Patricia Chandler. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Cover Sheet)(Ballard, Ryan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Idaho District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Chandler v. Pioneer Credit Recovery, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pioneer Credit Recovery, Inc.
Represented By: Tamsen L Leachman
Represented By: Bonnie L Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Phoenix Financial Services, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patricia Chandler
Represented By: Ryan Adam Ballard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?