Moore et al v. Madigan et al
Plaintiff: |
Michael Moore, Charles Hooks, Second Amendment Foundation, Inc., Peggy Fechter, Jon Maier and Illinois Carry |
Defendant: |
Lisa Madigan and Hiram Grau |
Case Number: |
3:2011cv03134 |
Filed: |
May 12, 2011 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Central District of Illinois |
Office: |
Springfield Office |
County: |
Adams |
Presiding Judge: |
Sue E. Myerscough |
Presiding Judge: |
Charles H. Evans |
Nature of Suit: |
Constitutional - State Statute |
Cause of Action: |
42 U.S.C. § 1983 Civil Rights Act |
Jury Demanded By: |
None |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
November 24, 2014 |
Filing
96
OPINION (See Written Opinion): For the forgoing reasons, Plaintiffs' Motion for Attorney's Fees (d/e 58 ) is GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART. Plaintiffs' Attorneys are entitled to attorney's fees totaling $153,871.00. P laintiffs' Bill of Costs is allowed in the amount of $3,008.29. Plaintiffs' Motions for Sanctions (d/e 84 ; d/e 86 ) are DENIED. Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Renewed (d/e 72 ) is GRANTED. Under Federal Rule of Civil Procedu re 54(d)(2)(B), any supplemental fee petition in this case shall be filed no later than 14 days after the entry of judgment. The Court will treat liberally any joint motion for extension of time to file a supplemental fee petition so that the parties may resolve the issue amicably. This case is CLOSED.IT IS SO ORDERED. Entered by Judge Sue E. Myerscough on 11/24/2014. (VM, ilcd)
|
October 9, 2013 |
Filing
57
OPINION (See Written Opinion): Defendants' Motion to Dismiss as Moot (d/e 51 ) is DENIED. Plaintiffs shall file any request for attorney's fees pursuant to 42 U.S.C. § 1988 within 40 days after issuance of the mandate from the Sevent h Circuit in Shepard v. Madigan, 13-2661. Any brief filed on or before this deadline shall address any award of costs and fees in this case. This matter is set for status conference on October 21, 2013 at 1:30 p.m. Entered by Judge Sue E. Myerscough on 10/09/2013. (VM, ilcd)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Illinois Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?