In Re: "Ameriquest Mortgage Co., Mortgage Lending Practices Litigation"

Case Number: 1:2005cv07097
Filed: December 20, 2005
Court: Illinois Northern District Court
Office: Chicago Office
Presiding Judge: Marvin E. Aspen
Referring Judge: Morton Denlow
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 28, 2016 5648 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable Marvin E. Aspen on 1/28/2016: Plaintiff Cooley's motion for a suggestion of remand, or in the alternative, motion to amend the complaint is denied without prejudice (Dkt. No. 69 in Case No. 07 C 7182). Plaintiff Wilbert Cooley motion in opposition to defendant's motion for leave to file response to plaintiff's sur-reply 5617 is denied as moot.Mailed notice(mad, )
July 27, 2015 5585 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable Marvin E. Aspen on 7/27/2015: Judge Martin's recommendation for dismissal of Case No. 07 C 6810 is adopted. Case No. 07 C 6810 is terminated due to failure to prosecute, pursuant to Rule 41(b) and Local Rule 41.1. Mailed notice(mad, )
July 16, 2015 5584 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable Marvin E. Aspen on 7/16/2015: The Court adopts Judge Martin's recommendations for dismissal of the following inactive cases: (1) Arndt v. Ameriquest Mortgage Co., et al. (06 C 2479); (2) Myers v. Ameriquest Mortgage Co., et al. (07 C 3584); and (3) Solnin v. Ameriquest Mortgage Co., et al. (06 C 4866). These actions are hereby terminated due to failure to prosecute, pursuant to Rule 41(b) and Local Rule 41.1. Mailed notice(mad, )
January 2, 2014 5418 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order. Signed by the Honorable Marvin E. Aspen on 1/2/2014:Judicial staff mailed notice(gl, )
September 3, 2013 5346 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable Marvin E. Aspen on 9/3/2013:Judicial staff mailed notice(gl, )
July 22, 2011 4370 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order regarding 06cv4724 Signed by the Honorable Marvin E. Aspen on 7/22/2011.Mailed notice(ef, ) Modified on 7/22/2011 (ef, ).
April 6, 2010 3499 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable Marvin E. Aspen on 4/6/2010:Judicial staff mailed notice(gl, )
January 19, 2010 3311 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable Marvin E. Aspen on 1/19/2010:Judicial staff mailed notice(gl, )
December 10, 2008 2550 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable Marvin E. Aspen on 12/10/2008:Mailed notice(dl, )
December 2, 2008 2542 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable Marvin E. Aspen on 12/2/2008:Judicial staff mailed notice(gl, )
October 14, 2008 2455 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order regarding Doc. No. 2034. Signed by the Honorable Marvin E. Aspen on 10/14/2008:Judicial staff mailed notice(gl, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: In Re: "Ameriquest Mortgage Co., Mortgage Lending Practices Litigation"
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?