Volkswagen Group of America, Inc. v. The Partnerships and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule "A"
Plaintiff: Volkswagen Group of America, Inc. and ABC Corporation
Defendant: The Partnerships and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule "A", Litie, das-mart, lacey066, MODIPIM, qiqi11365, MODA1, ranyue1885, JiangJing, RISHENG KEJI, XY Electronics Store, zhanghaiqin8625, sholer, fashionhappystore, ldfgihj, REALLYSHOP, vaoo5731, Numero, Aukur-US, lihua6418, zhuyeye, Xihuanlike, yuting12959, cx_fowzcf, wangdongxu, Klinee-Auto, Chop the hand, wallyshop, CARPAPA, Shenzhen Mercury E-Commerce Co., Ltd, vipzone2013, maisizhineng01, Nick-lin store, ExcellentGoods, jiuqiong-1991, mishiyingbindengshangxing, jian-6865, FLYEEGO, jytp, pinzhishangchang, Chasedreamtradeltd, CAOXINGQIAN43, LT co., LTD., carfriends-911, Linda L Shop, engraver-cutter-solution, Auto world, aisling327, log2trade, cpautoparts2, SYXL888, niuniu, hopebean2007, qingyud-23, GoodFound, AgileDragon, chenting550661, zhizhi beauty, Y&W Happy Store, Sawlong, Lucky year, aaaaabeauty, xingjing51413, jump-starter-factory, Dajili, Fationshop, xiangyiqiu, dorashow, ZOORG, rain1903, aAlaska, Meet_666, FEISIQI-BEST DEAL, Feng Ma Trade Co. LTD, jewelsclub, lidewang, JSAMZ, dreamhigh2018, wozhanghui, carptahauto, Foresee Network, colorfulworldprinting, Yun Science, Kinghall Technoligy, effortagain, shen qin, xie4929, zyl5211314, LUGKY, RAINCITY, lihuaau_22, cold_white, AnAnhoneystore, guangzhouajun, eb2999, dreamhouseye91, ebuying005, llhmykj, 15oceaneshop, equinox, pirol zheng, chenshuyun1965, xinyubaozhuangzhipin, zhanglanfang, OhSRCool, OutletCountry, ebuying066, J&M House, Cool Science, Auto Parts, yasudy and BearFire Outdoor
Case Number: 1:2020cv03128
Filed: May 27, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: John F Kness
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1125
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 26, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 26, 2020 Filing 75 REPLY by Beijing Chinasigns Information Co., Ltd. to response in opposition to motion, #73 , MOTION by Intervenor Beijing Chinasigns Information Co., Ltd. to intervene #70 (Attachments: #1 Declaration Supplemental Declaration of Liu Yanhang)(Saper, Daliah)
October 8, 2020 Filing 74 NOTICE by Volkswagen Group of America, Inc. re response in opposition to motion, #73 (Gaudio, Justin)
October 8, 2020 Filing 73 RESPONSE by Volkswagen Group of America, Inc.in Opposition to MOTION by Intervenor Beijing Chinasigns Information Co., Ltd. to intervene #70 (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Justin R. Gaudio, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3)(Gaudio, Justin)
September 23, 2020 Filing 72 ATTORNEY Appearance for Intervenor Beijing Chinasigns Information Co., Ltd. by Brandon Matthew Beymer (Beymer, Brandon)
September 23, 2020 Filing 71 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John F. Kness: Motion by intervenor Beijing Chinasigns Information Co. to intervene #70 is briefed as follows: plaintiff's response due by 10/8/20; intervenor's reply due by 10/26/20.Mailed notice (mjc, )
September 18, 2020 Filing 70 MOTION by Intervenor Beijing Chinasigns Information Co., Ltd. to intervene (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Declaration Liu Yanhang)(Saper, Daliah)
September 18, 2020 Filing 69 ATTORNEY Appearance for Intervenor Beijing Chinasigns Information Co., Ltd. by Daliah Saper (Saper, Daliah)
September 2, 2020 Filing 68 MAILED trademark report with certified copy of minute order dated 9/1/2020 to Patent Trademark Office, Alexandria, VA. (Attachments: #1 certified order, #2 certified judgment order) (bg, )
September 1, 2020 Filing 67 ENTERED JUDGMENT signed by the Honorable John F. Kness on 9/1/2020. Mailed notice (ags)
September 1, 2020 Filing 66 DEFAULT JUDGMENT ORDER signed by the Honorable John F. Kness on 9/1/2020. Mailed notice (ags)
September 1, 2020 Filing 65 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John F. Kness: Plaintiff's motions for entry of default and default judgment #54 #62 are granted. The Court enters default judgment against all Defendants identified in Schedule A. Enter separate default judgment order. Civil case terminated. Mailed notice (ags)
August 31, 2020 Filing 64 NOTICE by Volkswagen Group of America, Inc. re MOTION by Plaintiff Volkswagen Group of America, Inc. for entry of default as to Defendants colorfulworldprinting and engraver-cutter-solutionMOTION by Plaintiff Volkswagen Group of America, Inc. for default judgment as to Defendants colorfulworldprinting and engraver-cutter-solution #62 (Gaudio, Justin)
August 31, 2020 Filing 63 MEMORANDUM by Volkswagen Group of America, Inc. in support of motion for entry of default, motion for default judgment #54 , motion for entry of default,, motion for default judgment, #62 (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Justin R. Gaudio, #2 Exhibit 1)(Gaudio, Justin)
August 31, 2020 Filing 62 MOTION by Plaintiff Volkswagen Group of America, Inc. for entry of default as to Defendants colorfulworldprinting and engraver-cutter-solution, MOTION by Plaintiff Volkswagen Group of America, Inc. for default judgment as to Defendants colorfulworldprinting and engraver-cutter-solution (Gaudio, Justin)
August 28, 2020 Filing 61 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Volkswagen Group of America, Inc. as to certain defendant (Martin, Allyson)
August 21, 2020 Filing 60 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Volkswagen Group of America, Inc. as to certain defendant (Martin, Allyson)
August 20, 2020 Filing 59 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John F. Kness: Telephonic motion hearing held on 8/20/2020. For the reasons stated on the record, Plaintiff's motion for entry of default and default judgment #54 is entered and continued to 9/22/2020 at 9:45 AM as a telephonic motion hearing. Counsel are to use the following call-in number: 888-684-8852, conference code 3796759. The public and media representatives may have access to the hearing via the same number. Audio recording of the hearing is not permitted; violations of this prohibition may result in sanctions. Participants are directed to keep their device muted when they are not speaking. Mailed notice. (ym, )
August 19, 2020 Filing 58 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John F. Kness: A motion hearing on the motion for default judgment is set for 8/20/2020 at 10:10 a.m. and will be heard via telephone conference. Counsel are to use the following call-in number: 888-684-8852, conference code 3796759. The public and media representatives may have access to the hearing via the same number. Audio recording of the hearing is not permitted; violations of this prohibition may result in sanctions. Participants are directed to keep their device muted when they are not speaking Mailed notice (ags)
August 14, 2020 Filing 57 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Volkswagen Group of America, Inc. as to certain defendant (Martin, Allyson)
August 10, 2020 Filing 56 NOTICE by Volkswagen Group of America, Inc. re MOTION by Plaintiff Volkswagen Group of America, Inc. for entry of default as to Certain DefendantsMOTION by Plaintiff Volkswagen Group of America, Inc. for default judgment as to Certain Defendants #54 (Gaudio, Justin)
August 10, 2020 Filing 55 MEMORANDUM by Volkswagen Group of America, Inc. in support of motion for entry of default, motion for default judgment #54 (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Justin R. Gaudio, #2 Exhibit 1)(Gaudio, Justin)
August 10, 2020 Filing 54 MOTION by Plaintiff Volkswagen Group of America, Inc. for entry of default as to Certain Defendants, MOTION by Plaintiff Volkswagen Group of America, Inc. for default judgment as to Certain Defendants (Gaudio, Justin)
August 10, 2020 Filing 53 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Volkswagen Group of America, Inc. as to certain defendants (Martin, Allyson)
August 10, 2020 Filing 52 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Volkswagen Group of America, Inc. as to certain defendants (Martin, Allyson)
August 7, 2020 Filing 51 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Volkswagen Group of America, Inc. as to certain defendant (Martin, Allyson)
July 31, 2020 Filing 50 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Volkswagen Group of America, Inc. as to certain defendants (Martin, Allyson)
July 24, 2020 Filing 49 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Volkswagen Group of America, Inc. as to certain defendants (Martin, Allyson)
July 17, 2020 Filing 48 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Volkswagen Group of America, Inc. as to certain defendants (Martin, Allyson)
July 10, 2020 Filing 47 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Volkswagen Group of America, Inc. as to certain defendant (Martin, Allyson)
July 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER Fifth Amended General Order 20-0012 IN RE: CORONAVIRUS COVID-19 PUBLIC EMERGENCY Signed by the Chief Judge Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on July 10, 2020. This Order does not extend or modify any deadlines set in civil cases. No motions may be noticed for in-person presentment; the presiding judge will notify parties of the need, if any, for a hearing by electronic means or in-court proceeding. See attached Order. Signed by the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 7/10/2020: Mailed notice. (Clerk9, Docket)
July 2, 2020 Filing 45 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Volkswagen Group of America, Inc. as to certain defendant (Martin, Allyson)
June 29, 2020 NEW PARTIES: Aukur-US, BearFire Outdoor, CARPAPA, Dajili, FEISIQI-BEST DEAL, FLYEEGO, JiangJing, JSAMZ, Klinee-Auto, Linda L Shop, MODIPIM, pirol zheng, RISHENG KEJI, sholer, xinyubaozhuangzhipin, ZOORG, 15oceaneshop, aaaaabeauty, aisling327, carfriends-911, carptahauto, cold_white, colorfulworldprinting, cpautoparts2, cx_fowzcf, das-mart, dreamhigh2018, dreamhouseye91, eb2999, ebuying005, ebuying066, effortagain, engraver-cutter-solution, fashionhappystore, hopebean2007, jian-6865, jiuqiong-1991, jump-starter-factory, lacey066, lihua6418, lihuaau_22, log2trade, maisizhineng01, qingyud-23, rain1903, ranyue1885, vaoo5731, vipzone2013, xie4929, yasudy, yuting12959, aAlaska, AgileDragon, AnAnhoneystore, Auto Parts, Auto world, CAOXINGQIAN43, Chasedreamtradeltd, chenshuyun1965, chenting550661, Chop the hand, Cool Science, dorashow, equinox, ExcellentGoods, Fationshop, Feng Ma Trade Co. LTD, Foresee Network, GoodFound, guangzhouajun, J&M House, jewelsclub, jytp, Kinghall Technoligy, ldfgihj, lidewang, Litie, llhmykj, LT co., LTD., Lucky year, LUGKY, Meet_666, mishiyingbindengshangxing, MODA1, Nick-lin store, niuniu, Numero, OhSRCool, OutletCountry, pinzhishangchang, qiqi11365, RAINCITY, REALLYSHOP, Sawlong, shen qin, Shenzhen Mercury E-Commerce Co., Ltd, SYXL888, wallyshop, wangdongxu, wozhanghui, xiangyiqiu, Xihuanlike, xingjing51413, XY Electronics Store, Y&W Happy Store, Yun Science, zhanghaiqin8625, zhanglanfang, zhizhi beauty, zhuyeye and zyl5211314 added to case caption. (Ziegler, Amy)
June 25, 2020 Filing 44 PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION ORDER signed by the Honorable John F. Kness on 6/25/2020. Mailed notice(ef, )
June 25, 2020 Filing 43 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John F. Kness: Plaintiff's motion for a preliminary injunction #39 is granted. Plaintiff's filings establish that it has acted expeditiously to protect its interests and that there remains a significant risk Defendants will transfer relevant assets beyond the Court's reach. For these reasons, as well as the reasons provided in the whole of Plaintiff's filings and as stated by the Court in connection with entry of the TRO, the Court is persuaded that Plaintiff has satisfied the requirements for a preliminary injunction. In addition, the Court finds that the balance of harms favors Plaintiff and that a preliminary injunction serves the public interest by, among other things, protecting consumers from the marketing of counterfeit goods. Plaintiff has also certified and established #41 , #42 that it provided electronic notice to defendants of its motion for a preliminary injunction, but no appearance or objection has been filed on behalf of any defendant. Enter preliminary injunction order. The clerk shall unseal all sealed filings. Plaintiff's counsel is directed to ensure that all defendants listed on Schedule A are added to the court's docket within five business days. Mailed notice (ef, )
June 23, 2020 Filing 42 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Volkswagen Group of America, Inc. as to The Partnerships and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule "A" on 6/23/2020, answer due 7/14/2020. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Thomas J. Juettner)(Juettner, Thomas)
June 23, 2020 Filing 41 NOTICE by Volkswagen Group of America, Inc. re MOTION by Plaintiff Volkswagen Group of America, Inc. for preliminary injunction #39 (Gaudio, Justin)
June 23, 2020 Filing 40 MEMORANDUM by Volkswagen Group of America, Inc. in support of motion for preliminary injunction #39 (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Justin R. Gaudio, #2 Exhibit 1)(Gaudio, Justin)
June 23, 2020 Filing 39 MOTION by Plaintiff Volkswagen Group of America, Inc. for preliminary injunction (Gaudio, Justin)
June 23, 2020 Filing 38 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Volkswagen Group of America, Inc. as to a Certain Defendant (Gaudio, Justin)
June 12, 2020 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendant The Partnerships and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule "A". (ng, )
June 11, 2020 Filing 37 EXTENSION OF TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER signed by the Honorable John F. Kness on 6/11/2020. Mailed notice(ef, )
June 11, 2020 Filing 36 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John F. Kness: Plaintiff's Ex Parte Motion for Extension of Time of Temporary Restraining Order #33 is granted. Enter order. Mailed notice (ef, )
June 9, 2020 Filing 35 NOTICE by Volkswagen Group of America, Inc. re MOTION by Plaintiff Volkswagen Group of America, Inc. for extension of time of Temporary Restraining Order (Ex Parte) #33 (Gaudio, Justin)
June 9, 2020 Filing 34 MEMORANDUM by Volkswagen Group of America, Inc. in support of extension of time #33 (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Justin R. Gaudio)(Gaudio, Justin)
June 9, 2020 Filing 33 MOTION by Plaintiff Volkswagen Group of America, Inc. for extension of time of Temporary Restraining Order (Ex Parte) (Gaudio, Justin)
May 29, 2020 Filing 32 SEALED TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER Signed by the Honorable John F. Kness on 5/29/2020. (td, )
May 29, 2020 Filing 31 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John F. Kness: Plaintiff's ex parte motion for a temporary restraining order #17 and motion for electronic service of process #22 are granted. For the purpose of these motions, Plaintiff's filings support proceeding (for the time being) on an ex parte basis. Specifically, were defendants to be informed of this proceeding before a TRO could issue, it is likely assets and websites would be redirected, thus defeating Plaintiff's interests in identifying defendants, stopping Defendants' infringing conduct, and obtaining an accounting. In addition, the evidence submitted by Plaintiff shows a substantial likelihood of success on the merits (including evidence of active infringement and sales into Illinois), the harm to plaintiff is irreparable, and an injunction is in the public interest. An injunction serves the public interest because of the consumer confusion caused by counterfeit goods, and there is no countervailing harm to defendants from an order directing them to stop infringement. Electronic service of process does not violate any treaty and is consistent with due process because it effectively communicates the pendency of this action to defendants. As other judges in this District have noted, there may be reason to question both the propriety of the joinder of all Defendants in this one action and whether plaintiff genuinely intends to pursue an accounting (which Plaintiff asserts as justification for an asset freeze), but at this preliminary stage, the court is persuaded that Plaintiff has provided sufficient evidence of coordinated activity and the prospect of an accounting to justify the requested relief as to all Defendants. Expedited discovery is warranted to identify defendants and to implement the asset freeze. If any defendant appears and objects, the court will revisit the asset freeze and joinder. Enter Sealed Temporary Restraining Order. Mailed notice (ef, )
May 29, 2020 Filing 30 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John F. Kness: Plaintiff's motion for leave to file under seal #9 is granted in part and denied in part. Plaintiff's submissions establish that, were Defendants to learn of these proceedings before the execution of Plaintiff's requested preliminary injunctive relief, there is a significant risk that Defendants could destroy relevant documentary evidence and hide or transfer assets beyond the reach of the Court. Accordingly, subject to unsealing at an appropriate time, Plaintiff may for now file the following documents entirely under seal: Exhibit 1 to the Complaint #2 ; Schedule A attached to the Complaint and Amended Complaint #3 #16 ; Plaintiff's Motion for Entry of a Temporary Restraining Order and associated filings #17 #18 #19 #20 #21 ; and Plaintiff's Motion for Electronic Service of Process Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(f)(3), and associated filings #22 #23 #24 . Conversely, there are no exceptional circumstances that would justify allowing plaintiff to conceal its own identity; Plaintiff's ex parte motion for preliminary injunctive relief will be adjudicated promptly, and the identity of the defendant entities will be placed under seal during the pendency of the ex parte proceedings. Given this protection of Plaintiff's legitimate interests, the countervailing strong public interest in knowing who is seeking recourse in the federal courts compels the Court to deny Plaintiff's request to conceal its own identity and that of its asserted trademarks, even initially. As the Seventh Circuit has explained, "We have repeatedly voiced our disfavor of parties proceeding anonymously, as anonymous litigation runs contrary to the rights of the public to have open judicial proceedings and to know who is using court facilities and procedures funded by public taxes. To proceed anonymously, a party must demonstrate exceptional circumstances that outweigh both the public policy in favor of identified parties and the prejudice to the opposing party that would result from anonymity." Doe v. Village of Deerfield, 819 F.3d 372, 376-77 (7th Cir. 2016). Accordingly, Plaintiff may only file under seal a redacted version of the Amended Complaint that discloses its name and asserted trademarks. For the same reasons, that portion of the motion to file under seal relating to Plaintiff's Notification of Affiliates #26 and Plaintiff's Notice of Claims Involving Trademarks #27 is denied. Mailed notice (ef, )
May 28, 2020 Filing 29 MAILED Trademark report to Patent Trademark Office, Alexandria VA (Attachments: #1 (List of Trademarks)) (ph, )
May 28, 2020 Filing 28 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP). The key features and deadlines are set forth in this Notice which includes a link to the (MIDP) Standing Order and a Checklist for use by the parties. In cases subject to the pilot, all parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the Standing Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the Standing Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the following documents (Notice of Mandatory Initial Discovery and the Standing Order) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (ph, )
May 27, 2020 Filing 27 Notice of Claims Involving Trademarks by Volkswagen Group of America, Inc. (Gaudio, Justin)
May 27, 2020 Filing 26 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Volkswagen Group of America, Inc. (Gaudio, Justin)
May 27, 2020 Filing 25 NOTICE by Volkswagen Group of America, Inc. re MOTION by Plaintiff Volkswagen Group of America, Inc. for temporary restraining order Including a Temporary Injunction, a Temporary Asset Restraint, and Expedited Discovery #17 , MOTION by Plaintiff Volkswagen Group of America, Inc. for Electronic Service of Process Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(f)(3) #22 , MOTION by Plaintiff ABC Corporation for leave to file under seal #9 (Gaudio, Justin)
May 27, 2020 Filing 24 DECLARATION of Justin R. Gaudio regarding memorandum in support of motion #23 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Gaudio, Justin)
May 27, 2020 Filing 23 MEMORANDUM by Volkswagen Group of America, Inc. in support of motion for miscellaneous relief #22 (Gaudio, Justin)
May 27, 2020 Filing 22 MOTION by Plaintiff Volkswagen Group of America, Inc. for Electronic Service of Process Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(f)(3) (Gaudio, Justin)
May 27, 2020 Filing 21 SEALED EXHIBIT by Plaintiff Volkswagen Group of America, Inc. Exhibit 3 - Parts 1-7 regarding declaration #20 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 3-1, #2 Exhibit 3-2, #3 Exhibit 3-3, #4 Exhibit 3-4, #5 Exhibit 3-5, #6 Exhibit 3-6, #7 Exhibit 3-7)(Gaudio, Justin)
May 27, 2020 Filing 20 DECLARATION of Dana A. Cizmadia regarding memorandum in support of motion #18 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Gaudio, Justin)
May 27, 2020 Filing 19 DECLARATION of Justin R. Gaudio regarding memorandum in support of motion #18 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4)(Gaudio, Justin)
May 27, 2020 Filing 18 MEMORANDUM by Volkswagen Group of America, Inc. in support of motion for temporary restraining order #17 (Gaudio, Justin)
May 27, 2020 Filing 17 MOTION by Plaintiff Volkswagen Group of America, Inc. for temporary restraining order Including a Temporary Injunction, a Temporary Asset Restraint, and Expedited Discovery (Gaudio, Justin)
May 27, 2020 Filing 16 SEALED EXHIBIT by Plaintiff Volkswagen Group of America, Inc. Schedule A regarding amended complaint, #15 (Gaudio, Justin)
May 27, 2020 Filing 15 AMENDED complaint by Volkswagen Group of America, Inc. against The Partnerships and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule "A" (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4)(Gaudio, Justin)
May 27, 2020 Filing 14 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Volkswagen Group of America, Inc. by Thomas Joseph Juettner (Juettner, Thomas)
May 27, 2020 Filing 13 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Volkswagen Group of America, Inc. by Allyson M. Martin (Martin, Allyson)
May 27, 2020 Filing 12 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Volkswagen Group of America, Inc. by Amy Crout Ziegler (Ziegler, Amy)
May 27, 2020 Filing 11 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Volkswagen Group of America, Inc. by Justin R. Gaudio (Gaudio, Justin)
May 27, 2020 NEW PARTIES: Volkswagen Group of America, Inc. added to case caption. Terminating ABC Corporation (Gaudio, Justin)
May 27, 2020 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable John F. Kness. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Young B. Kim. Case assignment: Random assignment. (acm, )
May 27, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION by Plaintiff ABC Corporation for leave to file under seal (Gaudio, Justin)
May 27, 2020 Filing 8 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff ABC Corporation by Thomas Joseph Juettner (Juettner, Thomas)
May 27, 2020 Filing 7 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff ABC Corporation by Allyson M. Martin (Martin, Allyson)
May 27, 2020 Filing 6 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff ABC Corporation by Amy Crout Ziegler (Ziegler, Amy)
May 27, 2020 Filing 5 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff ABC Corporation by Justin R. Gaudio (Gaudio, Justin)
May 27, 2020 Filing 4 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Gaudio, Justin)
May 27, 2020 Filing 3 SEALED EXHIBIT by Plaintiff ABC Corporation Schedule A regarding complaint #1 (Gaudio, Justin)
May 27, 2020 Filing 2 SEALED EXHIBIT by Plaintiff ABC Corporation Exhibit 1 regarding complaint #1 (Gaudio, Justin)
May 27, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by ABC Corporation; Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-17057495. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 2, #2 Exhibit 3, #3 Exhibit 4)(Gaudio, Justin)
May 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER Fourth Amended General Order 20-0012 IN RE: CORONAVIRUS COVID-19 PUBLIC EMERGENCY Signed by the Chief Judge Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on May 26, 2020. This Order does not extend or modify any deadlines set in civil cases. For non-emergency motions, no motion may be noticed for presentment on a date earlier than July 15, 2020. See attached Order. Signed by the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 5/26/2020: Mailed notice (ec, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Volkswagen Group of America, Inc. v. The Partnerships and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule "A"
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Partnerships and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule "A"
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Litie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: das-mart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: lacey066
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MODIPIM
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: qiqi11365
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MODA1
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ranyue1885
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JiangJing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RISHENG KEJI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: XY Electronics Store
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: zhanghaiqin8625
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: sholer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: fashionhappystore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ldfgihj
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: REALLYSHOP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: vaoo5731
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Numero
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aukur-US
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: lihua6418
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: zhuyeye
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Xihuanlike
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: yuting12959
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: cx_fowzcf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: wangdongxu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Klinee-Auto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chop the hand
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: wallyshop
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CARPAPA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shenzhen Mercury E-Commerce Co., Ltd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: vipzone2013
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: maisizhineng01
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nick-lin store
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ExcellentGoods
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: jiuqiong-1991
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: mishiyingbindengshangxing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: jian-6865
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FLYEEGO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: jytp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: pinzhishangchang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chasedreamtradeltd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CAOXINGQIAN43
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LT co., LTD.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: carfriends-911
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Linda L Shop
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: engraver-cutter-solution
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Auto world
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: aisling327
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: log2trade
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: cpautoparts2
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SYXL888
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: niuniu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: hopebean2007
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: qingyud-23
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GoodFound
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AgileDragon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: chenting550661
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: zhizhi beauty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Y&W Happy Store
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sawlong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lucky year
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: aaaaabeauty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: xingjing51413
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: jump-starter-factory
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dajili
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fationshop
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: xiangyiqiu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: dorashow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ZOORG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: rain1903
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: aAlaska
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Meet_666
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FEISIQI-BEST DEAL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Feng Ma Trade Co. LTD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: jewelsclub
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: lidewang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JSAMZ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: dreamhigh2018
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: wozhanghui
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: carptahauto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Foresee Network
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: colorfulworldprinting
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Yun Science
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kinghall Technoligy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: effortagain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: shen qin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: xie4929
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: zyl5211314
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LUGKY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RAINCITY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: lihuaau_22
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: cold_white
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AnAnhoneystore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: guangzhouajun
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: eb2999
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: dreamhouseye91
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ebuying005
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: llhmykj
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 15oceaneshop
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: equinox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: pirol zheng
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: chenshuyun1965
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: xinyubaozhuangzhipin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: zhanglanfang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OhSRCool
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OutletCountry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ebuying066
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J&M House
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cool Science
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Auto Parts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: yasudy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BearFire Outdoor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Volkswagen Group of America, Inc.
Represented By: Allyson M. Martin
Represented By: Justin R. Gaudio
Represented By: Amy Crout Ziegler
Represented By: Thomas Joseph Juettner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ABC Corporation
Represented By: Allyson M. Martin
Represented By: Amy Crout Ziegler
Represented By: Justin R. Gaudio
Represented By: Thomas Joseph Juettner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?