Norfolk Southern Railway Company v. International Association of Sheet Metal, Air, Rail and Transportation Workers-Transportation Division et al
Plaintiff: Norfolk Southern Railway Co. and Norfolk Southern Railway Company
Defendant: International Association of Sheet Metal, Air, Rail and Transportation Workers, Transportation Division, Brotherhood of Locomotive Engineers and Trainmen, Brotherhood of Maintenance of Way Employes Division of the International Brotherhood of Teamsters and International Association of Sheet Metal, Air, Rail, and Transporation Workers-Transportation Division
Case Number: 1:2021cv05622
Filed: October 21, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: John Z Lee
Nature of Suit: Labor: Railway Labor Act
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 7, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 7, 2021 Filing 29 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Brotherhood of Maintenance of Way Employes Division of the International Brotherhood of Teamsters by Richard S. Edelman (Edelman, Richard)
November 19, 2021 Filing 28 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Z. Lee: Plaintiff's motion for reassignment was granted in case no. 21-cv-5502; therefore, case nos. 21-cv-5508, 21-cv-5622, and 21-cv-5676 are reassigned to Judge Lee's docket. Once these cases are reassigned, the Court orders that they be consolidated with case no. 21-cv-5502 for all purposes. All future filings related to these matters should be filed in case no. 21-cv-5502, and those cases are hereby terminated. (ca, )
November 18, 2021 Filing 27 EXECUTIVE COMMITTEE ORDER: Case reassigned to the Honorable John Z. Lee for all further proceedings, pursuant to Local Rule 40.4. Honorable Manish S. Shah no longer assigned to the case. Signed by Executive Committee on 11/18/2021. (pj, )
November 15, 2021 Filing 26 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Norfolk Southern Railway Company by Donald J. Munro (Munro, Donald)
November 12, 2021 Filing 25 NOTICE by Norfolk Southern Railway Company (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Joint Motion for Reassignment)(Woo, Samantha)
November 12, 2021 Filing 24 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Norfolk Southern Railway Company. International Association of Sheet Metal, Air, Rail, and Transporation Workers-Transportation Division waiver sent on 10/26/2021, answer due 12/27/2021. (Woo, Samantha)
November 12, 2021 Filing 23 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Norfolk Southern Railway Company. Brotherhood of Maintenance of Way Employes Division of the International Brotherhood of Teamsters waiver sent on 10/26/2021, answer due 12/27/2021. (Woo, Samantha)
November 12, 2021 Filing 22 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Norfolk Southern Railway Company. Brotherhood of Locomotive Engineers and Trainmen waiver sent on 10/26/2021, answer due 12/27/2021. (Woo, Samantha)
November 8, 2021 Filing 21 STATUS Report (Joint) by Norfolk Southern Railway Company (Woo, Samantha)
November 6, 2021 Filing 20 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Brotherhood of Maintenance of Way Employes Division of the International Brotherhood of Teamsters by Wesley G. S. Kennedy (Kennedy, Wesley)
November 5, 2021 Filing 19 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Brotherhood of Maintenance of Way Employes Division of the International Brotherhood of Teamsters by Karen I. Engelhardt (Engelhardt, Karen)
November 5, 2021 Filing 18 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Brotherhood of Maintenance of Way Employes Division of the International Brotherhood of Teamsters by Richard S. Edelman (Edelman, Richard)
November 3, 2021 Filing 17 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Norfolk Southern Railway Company by Samantha Woo (Woo, Samantha)
November 2, 2021 Filing 16 ATTORNEY Appearance for Counter Defendants Norfolk Southern Railway Company, Norfolk Southern Railway Company, Plaintiff Norfolk Southern Railway Company by James M Burnham (Burnham, James)
November 1, 2021 Filing 15 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Brotherhood of Locomotive Engineers and Trainmen by Dimitre James Petroff (Petroff, Dimitre)
November 1, 2021 Filing 14 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Brotherhood of Locomotive Engineers and Trainmen, Counter Claimant Brotherhood of Locomotive Engineers and Trainmen by Matthew Pierce (Pierce, Matthew)
November 1, 2021 Filing 13 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Brotherhood of Locomotive Engineers and Trainmen by Ryan A Hagerty (Hagerty, Ryan)
November 1, 2021 Filing 12 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant International Association of Sheet Metal, Air, Rail, and Transporation Workers-Transportation Division by Shawn Mckinley (Mckinley, Shawn)
November 1, 2021 Filing 11 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant International Association of Sheet Metal, Air, Rail, and Transporation Workers-Transportation Division by Kevin C. Brodar (Brodar, Kevin)
November 1, 2021 Filing 10 ATTORNEY Appearance for Counter Claimant International Association of Sheet Metal, Air, Rail, and Transporation Workers-Transportation Division, Defendant International Association of Sheet Metal, Air, Rail, and Transporation Workers-Transportation Division by Erika A Diehl-Gibbons (Diehl-Gibbons, Erika)
November 1, 2021 Filing 9 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Manish S. Shah: By 11/8/21, the parties shall file a joint initial status report. A template for the Initial Status Report, setting forth the information required, may be found at http://www.ilnd.uscourts.gov/Judges.aspx by clicking on Judge Shah's name and then again on the link entitled 'Initial Status Conferences.' Notices mailed. (psm, )
October 29, 2021 Filing 8 ANSWER to Complaint , COUNTERCLAIM filed by Brotherhood of Locomotive Engineers and Trainmen against Norfolk Southern Railway Company . by Brotherhood of Locomotive Engineers and Trainmen (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(McInerney, Joshua)
October 29, 2021 Filing 7 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Brotherhood of Locomotive Engineers and Trainmen by Joshua D. McInerney, D (McInerney, Joshua)
October 29, 2021 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint , COUNTERCLAIM filed by International Association of Sheet Metal, Air, Rail, and Transporation Workers-Transportation Division against Norfolk Southern Railway Company . by International Association of Sheet Metal, Air, Rail, and Transporation Workers-Transportation Division(Mckinley, Shawn)
October 26, 2021 Filing 5 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Norfolk Southern Railway Company by Samantha Woo Amended (Woo, Samantha)
October 22, 2021 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Manish S. Shah. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Sheila M. Finnegan. Case assignment: Random assignment. (jj, )
October 21, 2021 Filing 4 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Norfolk Southern Railway Co. (Woo, Samantha)
October 21, 2021 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Norfolk Southern Railway Co. by Samantha Woo (Woo, Samantha)
October 21, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Woo, Samantha)
October 21, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Norfolk Southern Railway Co.; Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0752-18794613.(Woo, Samantha)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Norfolk Southern Railway Company v. International Association of Sheet Metal, Air, Rail and Transportation Workers-Transportation Division et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Norfolk Southern Railway Co.
Represented By: Samantha Woo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Norfolk Southern Railway Company
Represented By: Donald J. Munro
Represented By: James M Burnham
Represented By: Samantha Woo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: International Association of Sheet Metal, Air, Rail and Transportation Workers, Transportation Division
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brotherhood of Locomotive Engineers and Trainmen
Represented By: Joshua D. McInerney
Represented By: Dimitre James Petroff
Represented By: Matthew Pierce
Represented By: Ryan A Hagerty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brotherhood of Maintenance of Way Employes Division of the International Brotherhood of Teamsters
Represented By: Karen I. Engelhardt
Represented By: Richard S. Edelman
Represented By: Wesley G. S. Kennedy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: International Association of Sheet Metal, Air, Rail, and Transporation Workers-Transportation Division
Represented By: Erika A Diehl-Gibbons
Represented By: Kevin C. Brodar
Represented By: Shawn Mckinley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?