Northeast Illinois Regional Commuter Railroad Corp. d/b/a METRA v. International Association of Sheet Metal, Air, Rail and Transportation Workers - Transportation Division et al
Plaintiff: Northeast Illinois Regional Commuter Railroad Corp. d/b/a METRA
Defendant: International Association of Sheet Metal, Air, Rail and Transportation Workers - Transportation Division, Brotherhood of Locomotive Engineers and Trainmen and Brotherhood of Maintenance of Way Employes Division of the International Brotherhood of Teamsters
Case Number: 1:2021cv05988
Filed: November 8, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Matthew F Kennelly
Nature of Suit: Labor: Railway Labor Act
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 6, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 43 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER signed by the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly on 1/6/2022: For the reasons stated in the accompanying Memorandum Opinion and Order, the Court denies the unions' motions for preliminary injunctions [dkt. nos. 22, 24 & 25]. The case is set for a telephonic status hearing on February 8, 2022 at 9:10 a.m., using call-in number 888-684-8852, access code 746-1053. Counsel should wait for the case to be called before announcing themselves. A joint status report is to be filed on February 1, 2022. (mk)
January 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 42 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: Video motion hearing held on 1/3/2022. Oral argument heard on the motion for preliminary injunction #24 . Matter is taken under advisement. Mailed notice. (mma, )
December 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 41 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: At the Court's instance, the video motion hearing set for 1:00 p.m. on 1/3/2022 is pushed back to 1:15 p.m. on that date. This is a time change only. The Court will send out an updated video conference invitation. Mailed notice. (mma, )
December 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 40 REPLY by Brotherhood of Locomotive Engineers and Trainmen to MOTION by Plaintiff Northeast Illinois Regional Commuter Rail Corporation for leave to file excess pages (Unopposed) #32 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit)(Hagerty, Ryan)
December 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 39 REPLY by Metropolitan Alliance of Police, Chapter 267 to MOTION by Defendant International Association of Sheet Metal, Air, Rail and Transportation Workers - Transportation Division, Counter Claimant International Association of Sheet Metal, Air, Rail and Transportation Workers - Transportation Division for #25 , MOTION by Defendant International Association of Sheet Metal, Air, Rail and Transportation Workers - Transportation Division, Counter Claimant International Association of Sheet Metal, Air, Rail and Transportation Workers - Transportation Division for #24 , memorandum in support of motion #23 , reply, #38 , MOTION by Defendant Brotherhood of Locomotive Engineers and Trainmen #22 , response in opposition to motion,,, #36 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Notice of Filing)(Calcaterra, Tony)
December 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 38 REPLY by Defendant International Association of Sheet Metal, Air, Rail and Transportation Workers - Transportation Division, Counter Claimant International Association of Sheet Metal, Air, Rail and Transportation Workers - Transportation Division to response in opposition to motion,,, #36 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Declaration Second Declaration of Edward Waugh)(Mckinley, Shawn)
December 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 37 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: Telephonic status hearing held on 12/22/2021. Motion for preliminary injunction is set for oral argument on 1/3/2022 at 1:00 pm by video. The Court will send out the video conference invitation in advance of the hearing date. Each side will have 20 minutes to present their argument. The defendants are to try consolidating their argument as discussed in the hearing today. Mailed notice. (mma, )
December 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 36 RESPONSE by Northeast Illinois Regional Commuter Rail Corporationin Opposition to MOTION by Defendant International Association of Sheet Metal, Air, Rail and Transportation Workers - Transportation Division, Counter Claimant International Association of Sheet Metal, Air, Rail and Transportation Workers - Transportation Division for #25 , MOTION by Defendant International Association of Sheet Metal, Air, Rail and Transportation Workers - Transportation Division, Counter Claimant International Association of Sheet Metal, Air, Rail and Transportation Workers - Transportation Division for #24 , MOTION by Defendant Brotherhood of Locomotive Engineers and Trainmen #22 (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Thomas Stuebner)(Munro, Donald)
December 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ANSWER to counterclaim by Northeast Illinois Regional Commuter Rail Corporation(Woo, Samantha)
December 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ANSWER to counterclaim by Northeast Illinois Regional Commuter Rail Corporation(Woo, Samantha)
December 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 33 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: Plaintiff's unopposed motion for leave to file a 20-page response brief #32 is granted. (mk)
December 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 32 MOTION by Plaintiff Northeast Illinois Regional Commuter Rail Corporation for leave to file excess pages (Unopposed) (Woo, Samantha)
December 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 31 TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS held on December 7, 2021 before the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly. Order Number: 42184. Court Reporter Contact Information: Carolyn_Cox@ilnd.uscourts.gov.
December 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Brotherhood of Maintenance of Way Employes Division of the International Brotherhood of Teamsters by Richard S. Edelman (Edelman, Richard)
December 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 29 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: Telephonic status hearing held on 12/7/2021. Metropolitan Alliance of Police's motion to intervene #28 is granted. Responses to the motions for preliminary injunction are due on 12/16/2021; reply is due on 12/23/2021. A telephonic status hearing is set for 12/22/2021 at 8:45 a.m. The following call-in number will be used for the hearing: 888-684-8852 conference code 746-1053. Metropolitan Alliance of Police joins in the motion for preliminary injunction. Mailed notice. (mma, )
December 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 28 MOTION by Intervenor Plaintiff Metropolitan Alliance of Police, Chapter 267 to join as CounterPlaintiff against Northeast Illinois Regional Commuter Railroad Corp (Attachments: #1 Notice of Filing)(Calcaterra, Tony)
December 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ATTORNEY Appearance for Intervenor Plaintiff Metropolitan Alliance of Police, Chapter 267 by Tony Steven Calcaterra (Calcaterra, Tony)
December 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 26 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: This case is set for a telephonic status hearing on 12/7/2021 at 10:00 AM, using call-in number 888-684-8852, access code 746-1053. Counsel should wait for the case to be called before announcing themselves. The parties should be prepared to discuss the setting of a schedule on the motions for preliminary injunction and any other appropriate proceedings. (mk)
December 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 25 MOTION by Defendant International Association of Sheet Metal, Air, Rail and Transportation Workers - Transportation Division, Counter Claimant International Association of Sheet Metal, Air, Rail and Transportation Workers - Transportation Division for preliminary injunction Memorandum in Support (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Waugh Declarations and Exhibits A-D)(Diehl-Gibbons, Erika)
December 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 24 MOTION by Defendant International Association of Sheet Metal, Air, Rail and Transportation Workers - Transportation Division, Counter Claimant International Association of Sheet Metal, Air, Rail and Transportation Workers - Transportation Division for preliminary injunction (Diehl-Gibbons, Erika)
December 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 23 MEMORANDUM by Brotherhood of Locomotive Engineers and Trainmen in support of motion for miscellaneous relief #22 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit)(Hagerty, Ryan)
December 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 22 MOTION by Defendant Brotherhood of Locomotive Engineers and Trainmen (Hagerty, Ryan)
November 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ANSWER to Complaint , Additional Defenses and COUNTERCLAIM filed by Brotherhood of Locomotive Engineers and Trainmen against Northeast Illinois Regional Commuter Rail Corporation . by Brotherhood of Locomotive Engineers and Trainmen (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-D)(Pierce, Matthew)
November 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ANSWER to Complaint , COUNTERCLAIM filed by International Association of Sheet Metal, Air, Rail and Transportation Workers - Transportation Division against Northeast Illinois Regional Commuter Rail Corporation . by International Association of Sheet Metal, Air, Rail and Transportation Workers - Transportation Division(Mckinley, Shawn)
November 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Northeast Illinois Regional Commuter Rail Corporation. Brotherhood of Maintenance of Way Employes Division of the International Brotherhood of Teamsters waiver sent on 11/11/2021, answer due 1/10/2022. (Munro, Donald)
November 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Northeast Illinois Regional Commuter Rail Corporation. International Association of Sheet Metal, Air, Rail and Transportation Workers - Transportation Division waiver sent on 11/11/2021, answer due 1/10/2022. (Woo, Samantha)
November 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 NOTICE by Northeast Illinois Regional Commuter Rail Corporation (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Joint Motion for Reassignment)(Woo, Samantha)
November 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Brotherhood of Locomotive Engineers and Trainmen by Ryan A Hagerty (Hagerty, Ryan)
November 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Brotherhood of Locomotive Engineers and Trainmen by Matthew Pierce (Pierce, Matthew)
November 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Northeast Illinois Regional Commuter Rail Corporation by Donald J. Munro (Munro, Donald)
November 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Brotherhood of Locomotive Engineers and Trainmen by Dimitre James Petroff (Petroff, Dimitre)
November 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Brotherhood of Locomotive Engineers and Trainmen by Joshua D. McInerney, D (McInerney, Joshua)
November 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Entered in Error. Modified by the Clerk's Office on 11/15/2021 (kl, ).
November 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Northeast Illinois Regional Commuter Rail Corporation. Brotherhood of Locomotive Engineers and Trainmen waiver sent on 11/11/2021, answer due 1/10/2022. (Woo, Samantha)
November 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Northeast Illinois Regional Commuter Rail Corporation by James M Burnham for Donald Munro (Burnham, James)
November 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Northeast Illinois Regional Commuter Rail Corporation by James M Burnham (Burnham, James)
November 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant International Association of Sheet Metal, Air, Rail and Transportation Workers - Transportation Division by Erika A Diehl-Gibbons (Diehl-Gibbons, Erika)
November 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant International Association of Sheet Metal, Air, Rail and Transportation Workers - Transportation Division by Shawn Mckinley (Mckinley, Shawn) Modified by Clerk's Office on 11/24/2021 (kl, ).
November 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant International Association of Sheet Metal, Air, Rail and Transportation Workers - Transportation Division by Kevin C. Brodar (Brodar, Kevin)
November 9, 2021 Opinion or Order CLERK'S NOTICE: Pursuant to Local Rule 73.1(b), a United States Magistrate Judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action. If all parties consent to have the currently assigned United States Magistrate Judge conduct all proceedings in this case, including trial, the entry of final judgment, and all post-trial proceedings, all parties must sign their names on the attached #Consent To# form. This consent form is eligible for filing only if executed by all parties. The parties can also express their consent to jurisdiction by a magistrate judge in any joint filing, including the Joint Initial Status Report or proposed Case Management Order. (kl, )
November 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Northeast Illinois Regional Commuter Railroad Corp. d/b/a METRA (Woo, Samantha)
November 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Northeast Illinois Regional Commuter Railroad Corp. d/b/a METRA by Samantha Woo (Woo, Samantha)
November 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Woo, Samantha)
November 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Northeast Illinois Regional Commuter Railroad Corp. d/b/a METRA; Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0752-18852562.(Woo, Samantha)
November 8, 2021 Opinion or Order CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Heather K. McShain. Case assignment: Random assignment. (dxb, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Northeast Illinois Regional Commuter Railroad Corp. d/b/a METRA v. International Association of Sheet Metal, Air, Rail and Transportation Workers - Transportation Division et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Northeast Illinois Regional Commuter Railroad Corp. d/b/a METRA
Represented By: Samantha Woo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: International Association of Sheet Metal, Air, Rail and Transportation Workers - Transportation Division
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brotherhood of Locomotive Engineers and Trainmen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brotherhood of Maintenance of Way Employes Division of the International Brotherhood of Teamsters
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?