Garner v. Kidd et al
Plaintiff: James Garner
Defendant: Thomas Costello, City Of Chicago, Hashtag Vision, LLC, Integrity Investments Fund, LLC's, Rosetone Investments, LLC, Philip Cocomise, Allan Kirchner, Ira Nevel, Marty Salzman, Lynda Segneri, George Scully, Rodney Slutzky, Tiffany Webb, Cop Chavez, Cop Fabian, Cop Detective Redd, Sheriff Badge #11080, Sheriff Badge #50104824, Rose Bishop, Mr. Brown, Sam Dickerson, Jay Embrey, Timothy C. Evans, Kim Foxx, DeJuan Gardner, Laura A. Henry Kelly, Steven Kidd, Iris Y. Martinez, Pinal Patel, Tamara, George J. Vournazos, Sandra Hernandez and Kelly Wright
Case Number: 1:2022cv06270
Filed: November 8, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Sharon Johnson Coleman
Referring Judge: Franklin U Valderrama
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331 Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 4, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 4, 2023 Filing 60 CIRCUIT Rule 3(b) Fee Notice. (aee, )
January 4, 2023 Filing 59 ACKNOWLEDGMENT of receipt of short record on appeal regarding notice of appeal #55 ; USCA Case No. 23-1006. (aee, )
January 3, 2023 Filing 58 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman: Presentment of Defendant Steven Kidd's motion for an extension of time to answer or otherwise plead #52 set for 1/11/2023 at 8:45 AM is reset to 9:15 AM (NOTE TIME CHANGE ONLY) as an in-person hearing in courtroom 1241. Mailed notice. (ym, )
January 3, 2023 Filing 57 TRANSMITTED to the 7th Circuit the short record on notice of appeal #55 . Notified counsel. (aee, )
January 3, 2023 Filing 56 NOTICE of Appeal Due letter sent to counsel of record regarding notice of appeal #55 . (aee, )
December 29, 2022 Filing 55 NOTICE of appeal by James Garner regarding orders #51 . (aee, )
December 29, 2022 Filing 54 ANNUAL REMINDER: Pursuant to #Local Rule 3.2 (Notification of Affiliates)#, any nongovernmental party, other than an individual or sole proprietorship, must file a statement identifying all its affiliates known to the party after diligent review or, if the party has identified no affiliates, then a statement reflecting that fact must be filed. An affiliate is defined as follows: any entity or individual owning, directly or indirectly (through ownership of one or more other entities), 5% or more of a party. The statement is to be electronically filed as a PDF in conjunction with entering the affiliates in CM/ECF as prompted. As a reminder to counsel, parties must supplement their statements of affiliates within thirty (30) days of any change in the information previously reported. This minute order is being issued to all counsel of record to remind counsel of their obligation to provide updated information as to additional affiliates if such updating is necessary. If counsel has any questions regarding this process, this #LINK# will provide additional information. Signed by the Executive Committee on 12/29/2022: Mailed notice. (tg, )
December 29, 2022 Filing 53 NOTICE of Motion by Molly Boekeloo for presentment of extension of time #52 before Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman on 1/11/2023 at 08:45 AM. (Boekeloo, Molly)
December 29, 2022 Filing 52 MOTION by Defendant Steven Kidd for extension of time to answer or otherwise plead (Boekeloo, Molly)
December 29, 2022 Filing 51 EXECUTIVE COMMITTEE ORDER: Case reassigned to the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman for all further proceedings. Honorable Franklin U. Valderrama no longer assigned to the case pursuant to IOP 13(f). Signed by Executive Committee on 12/29/2022. (daj, )
December 29, 2022 Filing 49 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Steven Kidd by Molly Boekeloo (Boekeloo, Molly)
December 28, 2022 Filing 50 MOTION for default judgment by the Court with regard to Defendants Dejuan Gardner, Jay Embrey, Mr. Brown, and Cop Chavez-Badge-#221 for failure to answer or otherwise plead by Plaintiff James Garner. (Exhibits) (daj, )
December 27, 2022 Filing 48 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Franklin U. Valderrama: Over Plaintiff's objection and for the reasons stated in the motions, Defendants' motions for extension of time #29 #31 #34 #36 are granted. Accordingly, Plaintiff's motions for default judgment #39 #40 are denied. Defendants shall answer or otherwise plead on or before 2/17/2023. Plaintiff shall respond to the pending motions to dismiss, R. 42, 43, 45, on or before 1/20/2023. Defendants Iris Martinez, Pinal Patel, Rose Bishop and Tamara shall respond to Plaintiff's motion for default judgment on or before 1/18/2023. Emailed notice (axc).
December 23, 2022 Filing 46 MEMORANDUM by Timothy C. Evans, George Scully in support of Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim #45 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-F)(Bouley, Tanya)
December 23, 2022 Filing 45 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Defendants Timothy C. Evans, George Scully (Bouley, Tanya)
December 23, 2022 Filing 44 MEMORANDUM by Kim Foxx in support of Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim #43 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-C)(Bouley, Tanya)
December 23, 2022 Filing 43 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Defendant Kim Foxx (Bouley, Tanya)
December 22, 2022 Filing 47 MOTION for default judgment by Plaintiff James Garner with regard to Defendants Iris Y. Martinez, Pinal Patel, Rose Bishop, and Tamara for failure to answer or otherwise plead. (Exhibits) (daj, )
December 22, 2022 Filing 42 MOTION by Defendant Rodney Slutzky to dismiss (Attachments: #1 Notice of Filing)(Anderson, Amy)
December 22, 2022 Filing 41 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Rodney Slutzky by Amy Lynn Anderson (Attachments: #1 Notice of Filing)(Anderson, Amy)
December 22, 2022 Filing 37 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Sheriff Badge #11080, George J. Vournazos by Jessica Wasserman (Wasserman, Jessica)
December 22, 2022 Filing 36 MOTION by Defendants Sheriff Badge #11080, George J. Vournazos for extension of time to file answer (Laue, Rebecca)
December 22, 2022 Filing 35 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Sheriff Badge #11080, George J. Vournazos by Rebecca J Laue (Laue, Rebecca)
December 21, 2022 Filing 40 MOTION by Plaintiff James Garner for default judgment by the court with regard to Defendants Sheriff Badge #11080, Sheriff Badge #50104824, and George J. Vournazos for failure to answer or otherwise plead. (Exhibits). (jn, )
December 21, 2022 Filing 34 MOTION by Defendant Lynda Segneri for extension of time to file answer or otherwise plead (Marsh, Michael)
December 21, 2022 Filing 33 NOTICE of Correction regarding #30 (exr, )
December 21, 2022 Filing 32 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant City Of Chicago by Michele Marie McGee (McGee, Michele)
December 21, 2022 Filing 31 MOTION by Defendant Integrity Investments Fund, LLC's for extension of time to file answer or otherwise plead (Marsh, Michael)
December 21, 2022 Filing 30 ENTERED IN ERROR Modified on 12/21/2022 (exr, ).
December 21, 2022 Filing 29 MOTION by Defendant Thomas Costello for extension of time to file answer or otherwise plead (Marsh, Michael)
December 21, 2022 Filing 28 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Lynda Segneri by Michael Vincent Marsh (Marsh, Michael)
December 21, 2022 Filing 27 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Integrity Investments Fund, LLC's by Michael Vincent Marsh (Marsh, Michael)
December 21, 2022 Filing 26 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Thomas Costello by Michael Vincent Marsh (Marsh, Michael)
December 20, 2022 Filing 39 MOTION by Plaintiff James Garner for default judgment by the court with regard to Defendants Lynda Segneri (AKA "Lynda Marie Costello"), Thomas Costello, and Integrity Investment Fund, LLC (IIF) for failure to answer or otherwise plead. (Exhibits). (jn, )
December 20, 2022 Filing 38 NOTICE of Plaintiff's motion for default judgment by the court with regard to Defendants Lynda Segneri (aka Lynda Marie Costello), Thomas Costello, and Integirity Investment Fund, LLC (IIF) for failure to answer or otherwise plead by James Garner. (jn, )
December 20, 2022 Filing 25 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Franklin U. Valderrama: Defendants Kelly Wright and Laura Kelly's motion for extension of time to answer or otherwise plead #24 is granted. Defendants shall answer or otherwise plead on or before 2/17/2023. Emailed notice (axc).
December 16, 2022 Filing 24 MOTION by Defendants Laura A. Henry Kelly, Kelly Wright for extension of time to Answer or Otherwise Plead (Kirk, Kevin)
December 16, 2022 Filing 23 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Laura A. Henry Kelly, Kelly Wright by Kevin Christopher Kirk (Kirk, Kevin)
December 16, 2022 Filing 22 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Laura A. Henry Kelly, Kelly Wright by William B. Oberts (Oberts, William)
December 15, 2022 Filing 21 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Franklin U. Valderrama: Over Plaintiff's objection, Defendant City of Chicago's motion for extension of time #20 is granted. All "City Defendants" shall answer or otherwise plead on or before 2/15/2023. R. 20 at 2. Emailed notice (cdh, )
December 13, 2022 Filing 20 MOTION by Defendant City Of Chicago for extension of time to file answer regarding complaint #9 or otherwise plead (Garant, Raymond)
December 13, 2022 Filing 19 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant City Of Chicago by Raymond Rolland Garant, II (Garant, Raymond)
December 9, 2022 Filing 18 ANSWER to the Complaint by Defendant Philip Cocomise. (cxr, )
December 9, 2022 Filing 17 PRO SE Appearance by Defendant Philip Cocomise. (cxr, )
December 9, 2022 Filing 16 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Franklin U. Valderrama: Over Plaintiff's objection, Defendants' motion for extension of time #15 is granted. Defendants shall answer or otherwise plead on or before 12/23/2022. Mailed notice. (kp, )
December 7, 2022 Filing 15 MOTION by Defendants Timothy C. Evans, Kim Foxx, George Scully for extension of time to file answer regarding complaint #9 opposed by Plaintiff (Bouley, Tanya)
December 7, 2022 Filing 14 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Timothy C. Evans, Kim Foxx, George Scully by Tanya Kristina Bouley (Bouley, Tanya)
November 23, 2022 Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to City Of Chicago on 11/22/2022, answer due 12/13/2022; Philip Cocomise on 11/22/2022, answer due 12/13/2022; Cop Chavez on 11/22/2022, answer due 12/13/2022; Cop Detective Redd on 11/22/2022, answer due 12/13/2022; Cop Fabian on 11/22/2022, answer due 12/13/2022; Thomas Costello on 11/22/2022, answer due 12/13/2022; Sam Dickerson on 11/21/2022, answer due 12/12/2022; Jay Embrey on 11/22/2022, answer due 12/13/2022; Kim Foxx on 11/21/2022, answer due 12/12/2022; DeJuan Gardner on 11/22/2022, answer due 12/13/2022; Sandra Hernandez on 11/22/2022, answer due 12/13/2022; Integrity Investments Fund, LLC's on 11/22/2022, answer due 12/13/2022; Allan Kirchner on 11/22/2022, answer due 12/13/2022; Mr. Brown on 11/22/2022, answer due 12/13/2022; Ira Nevel on 11/22/2022, answer due 12/13/2022; Rosetone Investments, LLC on 11/22/2022, answer due 12/13/2022; Marty Salzman on 11/21/2022, answer due 12/12/2022; Lynda Segneri on 11/22/2022, answer due 12/13/2022; Rodney Slutzky on 11/21/2022, answer due 12/12/2022. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(aee, )
November 22, 2022 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendants Rose Bishop, City Of Chicago, Philip Cocomise, Cop Chavez, Cop Detective Redd, Cop Fabian, Thomas Costello, Sam Dickerson, Jay Embrey, Timothy C. Evans, Kim Foxx, DeJuan Gardner, Hashtag Vision, LLC, Laura A. Henry Kelly, Sandra Hernandez, Integrity Investments Fund, LLC's, Steven Kidd, Allan Kirchner, Iris Y. Martinez, Mr. Brown, Ira Nevel, Pinal Patel, Rosetone Investments, LLC, Marty Salzman, George Scully, Lynda Segneri, Sheriff Badge #11080, Sheriff Badge #50104824, Rodney Slutzky, Tamara, George J. Vournazos, Tiffany Webb, Kelly Wright (khg, )
November 19, 2022 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by James Garner as to Rose Bishop on 11/16/2022, answer due 12/7/2022; Timothy C. Evans on 11/16/2022, answer due 12/7/2022; Laura A. Henry Kelly on 11/16/2022, answer due 12/7/2022; Steven Kidd on 11/16/2022, answer due 12/7/2022; Iris Y. Martinez on 11/16/2022, answer due 12/7/2022; Pinal Patel on 11/16/2022, answer due 12/7/2022; George Scully on 11/16/2022, answer due 12/7/2022; Tamara on 11/16/2022, answer due 12/7/2022; Kelly Wright on 11/16/2022, answer due 12/7/2022. (cxr, )
November 18, 2022 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendant George J. Vournazos (emc, )
November 17, 2022 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by James Garner as to Sheriff Badge #11080 on 11/16/2022, answer due 12/7/2022; Sheriff Badge #50104824 on 11/16/2022, answer due 12/7/2022; George J. Vournazos on 11/16/2022, answer due 12/7/2022. (aee, )
November 16, 2022 Filing 10 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Franklin U. Valderrama: Plaintiff's emergency motion for a temporary restraining order #4 is denied. "The court may issue a temporary restraining order without written or oral notice to the adverse party or its attorney only if: (A) specific facts in an affidavit or a verified complaint clearly show that immediate and irreparable injury, loss, or damage will result to the movant before the adverse party can be heard in opposition; and (B) the movant's attorney certifies in writing any efforts made to give notice and the reasons why it should not be required." Fed. R. Civ. P. 65(b). There is no indication that Defendants have been served in this case. While Plaintiff attaches a one-page "Affidavit" to his motion for preliminary injunction which attests to the truth of the motion's content, nowhere in the motion does Plaintiff explain (1) any efforts he has taken to give Defendants notice of this lawsuit or his motion, or (2) why notice should not be required. Accordingly, the motion is denied. Mailed notice (axc).
November 15, 2022 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendants Rose Bishop, Iris Y. Martinez, Pinal Patel (smb, )
November 14, 2022 Filing 9 COMPLAINT filed by James Garner. (Attachments).(gcy, )
November 14, 2022 Filing 7 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Franklin U. Valderrama: On or before 01/24/2023 the parties shall file a joint initial status report. A template for the Joint Initial Status Report, setting forth the information required, may be found at http://www.ilnd.uscourts.gov/Judges.aspx by clicking on Judge Valderrama's name and then again on the link entitled 'Joint Initial Status Report. Plaintiff must serve this Minute Entry on all other parties. If the defendant(s) has not been served with process by that date, plaintiff's counsel is instructed to file an individual status report indicating the status of service of process by the same deadline. The parties are further ordered to review all of Judge Valderrama's standing orders and the information available on his webpage. Any nongovernmental corporate party that qualifies under the Rules is reminded of the requirement to file a disclosure statement under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 7.1/N.D. Ill. Local Rule 3.2. Mailed notice (axc).
November 14, 2022 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendants Thomas Costello, Integrity Investments Fund, LLC's, Lynda Segneri, Sheriff Badge #11080, Sheriff Badge #50104824 (kra, )
November 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: #Local Rule 3.3# requires that any document submitted for filing for which a filing fee is required must be accompanied either by the appropriate fee or an In Forma Pauperis Application and Financial Affidavit. No filing fee or IFP petition was submitted at the time of filing this matter. James Garner is directed to pay the required filing fee or submit a completed #In Forma Pauperis Application and Financial Affidavit# within 15 days of this notification. Pursuant to LR 3.3(f), failure to comply with this order may result in sanctions, including dismissal of the action by the assigned judge. Signed by the Executive Committee. (cxr, )
November 10, 2022 CLERK'S NOTICE: Pursuant to Local Rule 73.1(b), a United States Magistrate Judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action. If all parties consent to have the currently assigned United States Magistrate Judge conduct all proceedings in this case, including trial, the entry of final judgment, and all post-trial proceedings, all parties must sign their names on the attached #Consent To# form. This consent form is eligible for filing only if executed by all parties. The parties can also express their consent to jurisdiction by a magistrate judge in any joint filing, including the Joint Initial Status Report or proposed Case Management Order. (cxr, )
November 8, 2022 Filing 4 EMERGENCY MOTION by Plaintiff James Garner for temporary restraining order (TRO), and preliminary injunction and for Plaintiff to present evidence including testimony from Thomas Costello and Philip Cocomise at any TRO hearing. (cxr, )
November 8, 2022 Filing 3 PRO SE Appearance by Plaintiff James Garner. (cxr, )
November 8, 2022 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (cxr, )
November 8, 2022 Filing 1 RECEIVED Complaint and no copies by James Garner (Exhibits). (cxr, )
November 8, 2022 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Franklin U. Valderrama. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Susan E. Cox. FEE DUE, NO INFORMA PAUPERIS APPLICATION SUBMITTED. Case assignment: Random assignment. (cxr, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Garner v. Kidd et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Garner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas Costello
Represented By: Michael Vincent Marsh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City Of Chicago
Represented By: Raymond Rolland Garant, II
Represented By: Michele Marie McGee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hashtag Vision, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Integrity Investments Fund, LLC's
Represented By: Michael Vincent Marsh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rosetone Investments, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Philip Cocomise
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allan Kirchner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ira Nevel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marty Salzman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lynda Segneri
Represented By: Michael Vincent Marsh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: George Scully
Represented By: Tanya Kristina Bouley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rodney Slutzky
Represented By: Amy Lynn Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tiffany Webb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cop Chavez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cop Fabian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cop Detective Redd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sheriff Badge #11080
Represented By: Jessica Wasserman
Represented By: Rebecca J Laue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sheriff Badge #50104824
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rose Bishop
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mr. Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sam Dickerson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jay Embrey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Timothy C. Evans
Represented By: Tanya Kristina Bouley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kim Foxx
Represented By: Tanya Kristina Bouley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DeJuan Gardner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Laura A. Henry Kelly
Represented By: Kevin Christopher Kirk
Represented By: William B. Oberts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steven Kidd
Represented By: Molly Boekeloo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Iris Y. Martinez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pinal Patel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tamara
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: George J. Vournazos
Represented By: Jessica Wasserman
Represented By: Rebecca J Laue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sandra Hernandez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kelly Wright
Represented By: Kevin Christopher Kirk
Represented By: William B. Oberts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?