Watford v. Harner et al
Plaintiff: Marlon L. Watford
Defendant: Chaplain Harner, Winters, Kerns, Opoka, Van Deckerhoff, Holt, Warden Harrington, Butler, Lashbrook, Sgt. Rose, Officer Seals, Theo, Lloyd Hanna, John Doe and Jan Doe
Case Number: 3:2018cv01313
Filed: June 22, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Illinois
Office: East St. Louis Office
County: Randolph
Presiding Judge: Michael J. Reagan
Presiding Judge: Stephen C. Williams
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 192 ORDER: Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Appeal in Forma Pauperis (Doc. 184) is DENIED. Watford shall tender the appellate filing and docketing fee of $505.00 to the Clerk of Court in this District within 30 days of the date of entry of this order. Alternatively, he may reapply for leave to appeal IFP directly with United States Court of Appeals for the Seventh Circuit. (Action due by 6/9/2022.) Signed by Judge Stephen P. McGlynn on 5/9/2022. (jce)
February 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 177 ORDER granting 147 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Jim Winters, Scott Opolka, Jacqueline Lashbrook, Howard Harner, Theodore Meininger, Gustave Vanderhove, Roger Kern, Lloyd Hanna, David Seals, Billy Rose, Robert Delre, Roge r Holt, Richard Harrington, Kimberly Butler. All pending motions are terminated as moot. Final pretrial conference and video writ are cancelled. Trial setting is vacated. Clerk to enter judgment accordingly. Signed by Judge Stephen P. McGlynn on 2/25/2022. (jce)
February 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 166 ORDER denying 159 Motion for Summary Judgment as untimely. Signed by Judge Stephen P. McGlynn on 2/11/2022. (jce)
January 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 112 ORDER: The 86 Motion for Leave to File Amended Complaint filed by Watford, the Motions to Strike filed by Defendants (Docs. 87 , 92 ), the Motions for Leave to File Notice of Hearing filed by Watford (Docs. 100 , 102 ), and the Motions to Objec t and Strike filed by Watford (Docs. 101 , 109 ) are DENIED. The 97 Motion for Leave to Substitute filed by Defendants is DENIED as moot. The second 88 Motion to Compel Evidence filed by Watford is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. Defendants shall have until January 28, 2021, to respond to discovery as provided in this Order. Defendants are DIRECTED to file a Notice of Compliance when they have served Watford with the required discovery. Watford shall then have until February 11, 2021, to notify the Court whether he disputes the responses and documents produced. Any discovery motion filed after February 11, 2021, will be denied as untimely filed. The 108 Amended Motion for Leave to Substitute filed by Defendants is GRANTED. Exhib it B and E attached to Doc. 108 are deemed filed and substituted for Exhibits B and E attached to Doc. 95 . The 111 Motion for Extension of Time filed by Watford (Doc. 111) is GRANTED. Watford shall file a response to the Motion for Summary Judgment by March 8, 2021. Signed by Judge Stephen P. McGlynn on 1/14/2021. (jrj)
March 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 78 Order: The 69 Motion to Compel Evidence filed by Watford is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. Defendant Vanderhove SHALL respond to Interrogatory #1, as now clarified, by May 4, 2020. Defendants Opolka and Meininger SHALL respond to Interrogatory #6 by May 4, 2020, and Defendant Meininger SHALL respond to Interrogatory #7 by May 4, 2020. Defendants are further ORDERED to produce document requests #1, #2, #3, #4, and #5 in accordance with this Order by May 4, 2020. The 71 Motion for Discove ry and the 74 Motion to Produce Deposition filed by Watford are DENIED. The Motions for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery (Docs. 73 and 76 ) are GRANTED. Defendants' responses to Watford's First Request for Admissions are due April 30, 2020. The Clerk of Court is DIRECTED to modify the docket sheet in accordance with this Order. Signed by Chief Judge Nancy J. Rosenstengel on 3/19/2020. (jrj)
March 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS: The Court ADOPTS in PART the proposed disposition to deny injunctive relief set forth in the Report and Recommendation (Doc. 42 ) as to the request for additional peanut butter and jelly packets. How ever, the Court DENIES in PART the R&R as it pertains to the provision of the proper Lacto-Ovo-Veg tray on Wednesday mornings. Menard is hereby DIRECTED to provide Watford with the standard Lacto-Ovo-Veg tray every Wednesday morning for the duration of this litigation. Documentation shall be kept by Menard to avoid future swearing contests about whether the tray was or was not provided. Signed by Chief Judge Michael J. Reagan on 3/19/2019. (rah)
July 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Stephen C. Williams. Signed by Chief Judge Michael J. Reagan on 7/16/2018. (tjk)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Watford v. Harner et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marlon L. Watford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chaplain Harner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Winters
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kerns
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Opoka
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Van Deckerhoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Holt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warden Harrington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Butler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lashbrook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sgt. Rose
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer Seals
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Theo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lloyd Hanna
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jan Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?