General Electric Capital Corporation v. General Investment, L.L.C.

Plaintiff: General Electric Capital Corporation
Defendant: General Investment, L.L.C.
Case Number: 1:2014cv00203
Filed: July 7, 2014
Court: Indiana Northern District Court
Office: Fort Wayne Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Referring Judge: Roger B Cosbey
Presiding Judge: James T Moody
Nature of Suit: Negotiable Instrument
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 16, 2014 14 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION AND ORDER re 5 AMENDED COMPLAINT against General Investment, L.L.C., filed by General Electric Capital Corporation. Plaintiff is ORDERED to filed an amended supplement to the amended complaint by 9/30/2014, properly setting forth the citizenship of the parties. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roger B Cosbey on 9/16/2014. (lhc)
July 14, 2014 6 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION AND ORDER re 5 AMENDED COMPLAINT filed by Plaintiff General Electric Capital Corporation. Plaintiff ORDERED to file by 7/28/2014 a supplement to the Amended Complaint reciting the parties' citizenship on the basis of personal knowledge and properly alleging the citizenship of the member of Defendant. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roger B Cosbey on 7/14/14. (cer)
July 8, 2014 4 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION AND ORDER: Plaintiff is ORDERED to supplement the record on or before 7/22/2014, by filing an Amended Complaint as outlined in Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roger B Cosbey on 7/8/2014. (lhc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: General Electric Capital Corporation v. General Investment, L.L.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: General Electric Capital Corporation
Represented By: Ann Elizabeth Pille
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: General Investment, L.L.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?