Jackson v. Himelick et al
Plaintiff: |
Ricky Lynn Jackson, Sr |
Defendant: |
Darrell Himelick, Cathy Lee and Randy Albertson |
Case Number: |
1:2014cv00368 |
Filed: |
November 24, 2014 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Northern District of Indiana |
Office: |
Fort Wayne Office |
County: |
Grant |
Presiding Judge: |
Roger B Cosbey |
Presiding Judge: |
Rudy Lozano |
Nature of Suit: |
Civil Rights |
Cause of Action: |
42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 |
Jury Demanded By: |
None |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
February 15, 2017 |
Filing
112
OPINION AND ORDER: GRANTS 91 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Defendant Cathy Lee and DIRECTS the clerk to close this case. Signed by Judge Rudy Lozano on 2/15/2017. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(lhc)
|
May 13, 2016 |
Filing
80
OPINION AND ORDER: DENYING 78 MOTION for Appointment of Counsel by Plaintiff Ricky Lynn Jackson, Sr. Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan L Collins on 5/13/2016. (lhc)(cc: Jackson)
|
August 10, 2015 |
Filing
38
OPINION AND ORDER: The Court GRANTS Ricky Lynn Jackson, Sr., leave to proceed on a Fourteenth Amendment claim for compensatory damages against Lt. Jail Commander Cathy Lee in her individual capacity for taking his medically prescribed extra mat on May 9, 2015; DISMISSES all other claims; DISMISSES Sheriff Darrell Himelick and Captain Randy Albertson; DIRECTS the Clerk to transmit the summons and USM-285 forms for Lt. Jail Commander Cathy Lee to the USMS along with a copy of the amended comp laint 28 and this order; DIRECTS the USMS, pursuant to 28:1915(d), to effect service of process on Lt. Jail Commander Cathy Lee; and ORDERS, pursuant to 42:1997e(g)(2), that she respond, as provided for in the Fed R Civ P and N.D. Ind. L.R. 10-1(b), only to the claim for which the pla has been granted leave to proceed in this screening order. Signed by Judge Rudy Lozano on 8/10/2015. (lhc)(cc: Pla and USMS)
|
March 6, 2015 |
Filing
14
OPINION AND ORDER: DIRECTING the clerk to place this cause number on a blank 42:1983 Prisoner Complaint form and send it to Pla Ricky Lynn Jackson, Sr.; GRANTING Pla, until 4/16/2015, to file an amended complaint; and CAUTIONING Pla, that if he does not respond by that deadline, this case will be dismissed pursuant to 28:1915A because the current complaint does not state a claim. Signed by Judge Rudy Lozano on 3/6/2015. (lhc)(cc: Forms to Pla)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Indiana Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?