Biomet 3i, LLC et al v. Land
Plaintiff: |
Biomet 3i, LLC and Zimmer US Inc |
Defendant: |
Heather Land |
Case Number: |
1:2016cv00125 |
Filed: |
April 12, 2016 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Northern District of Indiana |
Office: |
Fort Wayne Office |
County: |
Kosciusko |
Presiding Judge: |
Susan L Collins |
Presiding Judge: |
Theresa L Springmann |
Nature of Suit: |
Other Contract |
Cause of Action: |
28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 |
Jury Demanded By: |
None |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
March 30, 2017 |
Filing
107
OPINION AND ORDER: The Court OVERRULES the Defendant's Objections to the Report and Recommendation of United States Magistrate Judge 88 and ADOPTS the Magistrate Judge's Report and Recommendation 85 on the Plaintiffs' Motion for Pr eliminary Injunction. Accordingly, the Court now GRANTS the Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction 8 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction , as outlined in Opinion and Order. The Defendan t is required to file with the Court and serve on the Plaintiffs periodic written reports every thirty (30) days after service of the Preliminary Injunction, under oath, as outlined in Opinion and Order. Signed by Chief Judge Theresa L Springmann on 3/30/2017. (lhc)
|
February 27, 2017 |
Filing
100
ORDER: ADOPTING 83 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS in its entirety and incorporates the Magistrate Judge's recommendations into this Order. The Court now DENIES 19 the Defendants Combined Motion to Transfer Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1404(a) or, in the Alternative, to Dismiss Pursuant to Rules 12(b)(6) and 12(d). Signed by Chief Judge Theresa L Springmann on 2/27/17. (jld)
|
February 8, 2017 |
Filing
92
OPINION AND ORDER: GRANTING 77 MOTION for Leave to File First, Amended MOTION to Amend/Correct 1 Complaint, by Plaintiffs Biomet 3i, LLC, Zimmer US Inc. The Clerk is DIRECTED to show Zimmer Biomet's amended complaint and its exhibits as filed (DE 77 -1, DE 77 -2, DE 77 -3, DE 77 -4, DE 77 -5). Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan L Collins on 2/8/2017. (lhc)
|
June 29, 2016 |
Filing
46
OPINION AND ORDER DENYING 33 Motion for TRO. The evidentiary hearing on the Plaintiffs Motion for Preliminary Injunction is CONFIRMED for July 11, 2016. Signed by Judge Theresa L Springmann on 6/29/16. (mlc)
|
June 3, 2016 |
Filing
32
OPINION AND ORDER The parties joint motion for entry of the stipulated protective order DE 28 is DENIED with leave to re-file. The parties may submit a joint motion with a revised proposed protective order consistent with the requirements of Rule 26(c) and Seventh Circuit case law. Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan L Collins on 6/3/16. (kjp)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Indiana Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?