Zimmer Inc. v. Beamalloy Reconstructive Medical Products, LLC et al
Plaintiff: |
Zimmer Inc. |
Defendant: |
Beamalloy Reconstructive Medical Products, LLC and Beamalloy Technologies, LLC |
Case Number: |
1:2016cv00355 |
Filed: |
October 4, 2016 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Northern District of Indiana |
Office: |
Fort Wayne Office |
County: |
Kosciusko |
Presiding Judge: |
Susan L Collins |
Presiding Judge: |
Jon E DeGuilio |
Nature of Suit: |
Other Contract |
Cause of Action: |
28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 |
Jury Demanded By: |
None |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
June 27, 2019 |
Filing
144
OPINION AND ORDER GRANTING 133 MOTION for Attorney Fees Following Order Granting in Part Zimmer's Motion to Compel filed by Zimmer Inc.,except that the Court will reduce Zimmer's requested award by $1,317.98, for a total award of $51,371.51. Beamalloy is ORDERED to pay Zimmer $51,371.51 within 30 days. Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan L Collins on 6/27/19. (ksp)
|
March 22, 2019 |
Filing
131
OPINION AND ORDER: The Court GRANTS IN PART Zimmer's 61 Motion to Compel. Zimmer is GRANTED LEAVE to file a motion and supporting documentation seeking to recover the attorney's fees and costs incurred litigating the motion to complel. Zummer's motion is due on or before 3/29/2019. Beamalloy's response is due 7 days after Zimmer's files it's motion, and Zimmer's reply is due 3 days after the response. The Court also GRANTS Zimmer's motion for extens ion of time to complete discovery 64 and sets this case for a scheduling conference 3/26/2019 at 10:00 am. The Court will initiate the call. The Court GRANTS IN PART and DENIES IN PART Howmedica's motion to intervene 73 . Zimmer and Beamalloy, in consultation with Howmedica, are to submit on or before 4/5/2019, an amended agreed protective order consistent with this Opinion and Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan L Collins on 3/21/2019. (jss)
|
January 15, 2019 |
Filing
122
OPINION AND ORDER: The Court, sua sponte, ORDERS Beamalloy to submit for further review on the record, on or before 1/29/2019, affidavits, deposition transcripts, or other evidence supporting its claim of work product protection, as outlined. Beam alloy is further ORDERED to specify in its evidentiary submission, as outlined. The Court will take Zimmer's request for attorney's fees and costs incurred in litigating the production of the 13 "benign" documents 116 under advisement. Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan L Collins on 1/15/2019. (lhc)
|
August 2, 2017 |
Filing
32
OPINION AND ORDER: The Court GRANTS IN PART Zimmer, Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss Count III of the Counterclaim 11 and DISMISSES WITHOUT PREJUDICE Count III of the Defendants' Counterclaim. The Court DENIES IN PART the Motion in so far as dismissing Count III with prejudice and GRANTS the Defendants leave to file a second amended answer and counterclaim. Signed by Chief Judge Theresa L Springmann on 8/2/2017. (lhc)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Indiana Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?