R3 Composites Corporation v. G&S Sales Corp.
Plaintiff: R3 Composites Corporation
Defendant: G&S Sales Corp.
Counter_claimant: G&S Sales Corp.
Counter_defendant: R3 Composites Corporation
Case Number: 1:2016cv00387
Filed: November 14, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Indiana
Office: Fort Wayne Office
County: Allen
Presiding Judge: Susan L Collins
Presiding Judge: Jon E DeGuilio
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 101 OPINION AND ORDER: Defendant's Motion for Leave to File Sur-Reply Brief Regarding Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File Supplemental Complaint or in the Alternative for Judicial Notice of Facts Relating to MDG Sales Corporation 87 is GR ANTED. The Clerk is DIRECTED to show Defendants proposed surreply (ECF 87-3) as filed. Plaintiff is afforded to and including 10/21/2020, to file a surresponse, not to exceed five pages, if it deems necessary. Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan L Collins on 10/14/2020. (shk)
February 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 53 OPINION AND ORDER DENYING 49 MOTION for Hearing re 37 MOTION for Summary Judgment Defendant's Request for Oral Argument; GRANTING IN PART and DENYING IN PART 37 MOTION for Summary Judgment. By separate order, the Court will set a telephonic scheduling conference for purposes of scheduling the final pre-trial conference and trial. Signed by Chief Judge Theresa L Springmann on 2/27/19. (ksp)
March 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 15 OPINION AND ORDER: The 14 Motion for Protective Order. The parties may submit a new motion, together with a revised proposed protective order consistent with the requirements of Rule 26(c) and Seventh Circuit case law. Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan L Collins on 3/20/17. (jld)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: R3 Composites Corporation v. G&S Sales Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: R3 Composites Corporation
Represented By: Andrew D Boxberger
Represented By: Evan D Carr
Represented By: J Blake Hike
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: G&S Sales Corp.
Represented By: Randall J Gillary PHV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_claimant: G&S Sales Corp.
Represented By: Randall J Gillary PHV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_defendant: R3 Composites Corporation
Represented By: Andrew D Boxberger
Represented By: Evan D Carr
Represented By: J Blake Hike
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?