Crawford v. Allen County Jail
Plaintiff: Gemarcus D Crawford, Sr
Defendant: Allen County Jail
Case Number: 1:2017cv00185
Filed: April 27, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Indiana
Office: Fort Wayne Office
County: Allen
Presiding Judge: Susan L Collins
Referring Judge: William C Lee
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 7, 2017. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 7, 2017 Filing 7 Mail Returned from Gemarcus D. Crawford Sr. as Undeliverable - No Longer Here - #4 Order Dismissing Case, #5 Clerks Judgment. (lhc)
June 30, 2017 Filing 6 NOTICE from Allen County Jail Matron that Plaintiff Gemarcus D Crawford Sr has been transferred to another facility. (cer)
June 27, 2017 Filing 5 CLERK'S ENTRY OF JUDGMENT. (Copy mailed to pro se party) (lns)
June 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER DISMISSING CASE pursuant to 28 USC 1915A because it does not state a claim. Pla to pay (and cust agy to remit) payments as outlined until the $400.00 filing fee is paid in full. Clerk DIRECTED to create a ledger for receipt of these funds. Clerk DIRECTED to ensure that a copy of this Order is mailed to each facility where the Pla is housed until the filing fee has been paid in full. Signed by Judge William C Lee on 6/26/2017. (Copy mailed to pro se party and Superintendent)(lns)
May 30, 2017 Filing 3 Mail Returned from Germarcus D. Crawford as Undeliverable - No longer here re #2 Order. (lhc)
May 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER DISMISSING Dft Allen County Jail; DIRECTING Clerk to place this cause number on a blank Prisoner Complaint form and Prisoner Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis and send them to Pla; GRANTING Pla until 6/15/2017, to file an Amended Complaint on that complaint form and resolve his filing fee status; and CAUTIONING Pla that if he does not respond by that ddl, this case will be dismissed w/o further notice as outlined. Signed by Judge William C Lee on 5/17/2017. (Copy mailed to pro se party with forms)(lns)
April 27, 2017 Filing 1 PRO SE COMPLAINT with 0 copies of summons forms and 0 copies of USM-285 forms against Allen County Jail, filed by Gemarcus D Crawford, Sr. (No filing fee paid or IFP submitted) (lhc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Crawford v. Allen County Jail
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gemarcus D Crawford, Sr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allen County Jail
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?