Hatch v. Indiana Department of Child Services et al
Plaintiff: |
DeAngelo L Hatch |
Defendant: |
Indiana Department of Child Services, Chrystal Graham, Jennifer Fletcher and Louise Dietzer |
Case Number: |
1:2017cv00357 |
Filed: |
August 21, 2017 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Northern District of Indiana |
Office: |
Fort Wayne Office |
County: |
Allen |
Presiding Judge: |
Susan L Collins |
Presiding Judge: |
Theresa L Springmann |
Nature of Suit: |
Other Civil Rights |
Cause of Action: |
42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 |
Jury Demanded By: |
None |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
April 9, 2018 |
Filing
36
AMENDED OPINION AND ORDER: GRANTING 17 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction. The Court finds that the circumstances of this case require abstention. There is an ongoing state court proceeding regarding the same issue, child custody and welfare is an important state interest, and the Plaintiffs constitutional claims have an adequate remedy in state court. Signed by Chief Judge Theresa L Springmann on 4/9/2018. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(lhc)
|
April 5, 2018 |
Filing
34
OPINOIN AND ORDER granting 17 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction. The Court finds that the circumstances of this case require abstention. Thereis an ongoing state court proceeding regarding the same issue, child custody and welfare is an important state interest, and the Plaintiffs constitutional claims have an adequate remedy in state court. Signed by Chief Judge Theresa L Springmann on 4/5/18. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(mlc)
|
October 20, 2017 |
Filing
6
OPINION AND ORDER: The Court GRANTS the Plaintiff's 5 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis; WAIVES payment of the filing fee; DISMISSES the Plaintiff's Fifth and Sixth Amended claims against all Defendants and DISMISSES the Plai ntiff's § 1983 claims against the Indiana Department of Child Services; DIRECTS, pursuant to 28 USC § 1915(d), the United States Marshals Service to effect service of process on the Defendants. Signed by Chief Judge Theresa L Springmann on 10/20/2017. (Copy mailed to pro se party; USMS)(jss)
|
August 28, 2017 |
Filing
3
OPINION AND ORDER: The Court DENIES the Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis 2 ; DISMISSES the Complaint 1 ; GRANTS the Plaintiff until October 2, 2017, to file an amended complaint complaint, accompanied by a new Petitio n to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees and Costs or the filing fee; CAUTIONS the Plaintiff that if he does not respond by that deadline, this case will be dismissed without further notice; any amended complaint must identify the individual defendants and specify the manner in which their actions, or failure to take action, violated the Plaintiffs' statutory or constitutional rights. Signed by Chief Judge Theresa L Springmann on 8/28/2017. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(jss)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Indiana Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?