Craftline Graphics, Inc et al v. Total Press Sales & Service LLC
Plaintiff: |
Craftline Graphics, Inc and Kappa Graphics, LP |
Defendant: |
Total Press Sales & Service LLC |
Case Number: |
1:2017cv00462 |
Filed: |
November 6, 2017 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Northern District of Indiana |
Office: |
Fort Wayne Office |
County: |
Allen |
Presiding Judge: |
Susan L Collins |
Presiding Judge: |
Theresa L Springmann |
Nature of Suit: |
Other Contract |
Cause of Action: |
28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 |
Jury Demanded By: |
Plaintiff |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
June 13, 2019 |
Filing
33
OPINION AND ORDER: The Court GRANTS in part and DENIES in part Plaintiffs' Second Verified Motion for Entry of Default Judgment. This Court enters judgment in favor of the Plaintiffs and against Defendant in the amount of $1.00. Signed by Judge Holly A Brady on 6/13/19. (nal)
|
May 16, 2019 |
Filing
29
OPINION AND ORDER re 27 MOTION Request for Ruling on Motion for Default Judgment re 25 Second MOTION for Default Judgment as to Total Press Sales & Service, LLC , 25 Second MOTION for Default Judgment as to Total Press Sales & Service, LLC filed by Kappa Graphics, LP, Craftline Graphics, Inc. The Court hereby GRANTS the Plaintiffs 10 days from the date of this Order to submit admissible evidence relative to its claim for damages related to Kappa's repair costs arising from the breach and admissible evidence establishing the need to disassemble, reassemble, and reinstall the press. Signed by Judge Holly A Brady on 5/16/19. (ksp)
|
September 19, 2018 |
Filing
23
OPINION AND ORDER: The Court DENIES WITHOUT PREJUDICE and with LEAVE TO REFILE, the Plaintiffs' Motion for Default 17 , 20 and Motion for Attorneys' Fees and Costs 13 , 21 . As the Court has now ruled on the pending Motions, the Plaintiff's Status Report, Request for Ruling on Motion for Default Judgment 22 is rendered MOOT. Signed by Chief Judge Theresa L Springmann on 9/19/2018. (lhc)
|
April 17, 2018 |
Filing
18
OPINION AND ORDER: Plaintiffs are granted until 5/17/2018, to provide the additional requested documentation and citation in support of the 17 Motion for Default Judgment and 13 Motion for Attorney Fees, Costs and Expenses. Court DISMISSES AS MOOT the first 11 Motion for Default Judgment. Signed by Chief Judge Theresa L Springmann on 4/17/2018. (tc)
|
November 8, 2017 |
Filing
4
OPINION AND ORDER Plaintiffs are ORDERED to supplement the record by filing an amended complaint that properly alleges the citizenship of each of the parties on or before November 22, 2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan L Collins on 11/8/17. (kjp)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Indiana Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?