Kuntz v. DeKalb County Sheriff's Department et al

Plaintiff: Kailey Kuntz
Defendant: Waterloo, Indiana, Thomas Olinske, Joshua Heffelfinger, DeKalb County Sheriff's Department and Stephen Brady
Undetermined: Daniel Sigler
Case Number: 1:2018cv00272
Filed: September 4, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Indiana
0 Judge: Susan L Collins
1 Judge: William C Lee
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 30, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 30, 2018 Filing 24 CERTIFICATE Attorney Certification. (Atkinson, Joshua)
October 29, 2018 Filing 23 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by DeKalb County Sheriff's Department, Thomas Olinske.(Atkinson, Joshua)
October 29, 2018 Filing 22 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Stephen Brady, Joshua Heffelfinger, Waterloo, Indiana.(Scudder, Mark)
October 29, 2018 Filing 21 RULE 16 PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL CONFERENCE held on 10/29/2018 before Magistrate Judge Susan L Collins. Atty Kenneth Falk and Pla appeared telephonically. Atty Joshua Atkinson appeared in person, and Sheriff Don Lauer appeared telephonically on behalf of Dft DeKalb County Sheriff's Department. Attorney Mark Scudder, Dft Stephen Brady, and Marshall Overhauser appeared in person. Dfts Joshua Heffelfinger, Thomas Olinske and David Bolton appeared telephonically. The #19 Report of the Parties Planning Meeting is approved in all respects (except dispositive motion deadlines and trial dates) and is hereby made an ORDER of the Court. The Summary Judgment deadline in Fed.R.Civ.P. 56(b) SHALL NOT control. Any dispositive motion SHALL brief out in accordance with L.R. 56-1. DISCOVERY DEADLINE is 8/5/2019. Following the close of discovery, unless otherwise ordered by the Court, the assigned District Judge will establish all further deadlines and dates. Daniel Sigler appointed as Mediator. Atty Atkinson to notify Mediator by letter, copy to Attys Falk and Scudder. Results of the Mediation shall be filed with the Court no later than 10 days before the Final Pretrial Conference. Magistrate Consent forms due by 11/19/2018. (FTR 1st floor.) (mr)
October 25, 2018 Filing 20 NOTICE by Kailey Kuntz of Attorney Certification (Falk, Kenneth)
October 18, 2018 Filing 19 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Falk, Kenneth)
October 5, 2018 Filing 18 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Kailey Kuntz. Waterloo, Indiana served on 9/7/2018, answer due 10/29/2018. (Falk, Kenneth)
October 5, 2018 Filing 17 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Kailey Kuntz. DeKalb County Sheriff's Department served on 9/19/2018, answer due 10/29/2018. (Falk, Kenneth)
October 5, 2018 Filing 16 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Kailey Kuntz. Thomas Olinske served on 9/7/2018, answer due 10/29/2018. (Falk, Kenneth)
October 5, 2018 Filing 15 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Kailey Kuntz. Joshua Heffelfinger served on 9/7/2018, answer due 10/29/2018. (Falk, Kenneth)
October 5, 2018 Filing 14 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Kailey Kuntz. Stephen Brady served on 9/7/2018, answer due 10/29/2018. (Falk, Kenneth)
October 1, 2018 Set/Reset Deadlines: Dfts Stephen Brady, Joshua Heffelfinger, and Waterloo, Indiana's Answer DUE 10/29/2018 per #13 Agreed Notice. (lns)
September 28, 2018 Filing 13 AGREED NOTICE to extend time to file answer filed by Stephen Brady, Joshua Heffelfinger, Waterloo, Indiana ; answer due by October 29, 2018. (Scudder, Mark)
September 27, 2018 Filing 12 MAGISTRATE JUDGE CONSENT FORMS sent to all parties (Standard Track). (mr)
September 27, 2018 Filing 11 NOTICE of Hearing: Rule 16 Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 10/29/2018 at 10:00 AM in US District Court - Fort Wayne before Magistrate Judge Susan L Collins. Counsel, Plaintiff and Defendant to appear.(mr)
September 26, 2018 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Stephen L Fink on behalf of Stephen Brady, Joshua Heffelfinger, Waterloo, Indiana (Fink, Stephen)
September 26, 2018 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Mark D Scudder on behalf of Stephen Brady, Joshua Heffelfinger, Waterloo, Indiana (Scudder, Mark)
September 19, 2018 Set/Reset Deadlines: Dfts DeKalb County Sheriff's Department and Thomas Olinsky's Answer DUE 10/29/2018 per #6 Agreed Notice. (lns)
September 19, 2018 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Scott L Bunnell on behalf of Thomas Olinske (Bunnell, Scott)
September 19, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Scott L Bunnell on behalf of DeKalb County Sheriff's Department (Bunnell, Scott)
September 19, 2018 Filing 6 AGREED NOTICE to extend time to file answer filed by DeKalb County Sheriff's Department, Thomas Olinske ; answer due by October 29, 2018. (Atkinson, Joshua)
September 19, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Joshua A Atkinson on behalf of DeKalb County Sheriff's Department, Thomas Olinske (Atkinson, Joshua)
September 5, 2018 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Stephen Brady, DeKalb County Sheriff's Department, Joshua Heffelfinger, Thomas Olinske, Waterloo, Indiana. NOTE:The attached document is accessible by court personnel only. Summons forms that were electronically submitted to the court for issuance will be returned to counsel via e-mail. (sct)
September 5, 2018 Judge William C Lee and Magistrate Judge Susan L Collins added. (New Case) (sct)
September 4, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Jan P Mensz on behalf of Kailey Kuntz (Mensz, Jan)
September 4, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Kenneth J Falk on behalf of Kailey Kuntz (Falk, Kenneth)
September 4, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0755-3668532.), filed by Kailey Kuntz. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Falk, Kenneth)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kuntz v. DeKalb County Sheriff's Department et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kailey Kuntz
Represented By: Kenneth J Falk
Represented By: Jan P Mensz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Waterloo, Indiana
Represented By: Mark D Scudder
Represented By: Stephen L Fink
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas Olinske
Represented By: Joshua A Atkinson
Represented By: Scott L Bunnell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joshua Heffelfinger
Represented By: Mark D Scudder
Represented By: Stephen L Fink
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DeKalb County Sheriff's Department
Represented By: Joshua A Atkinson
Represented By: Scott L Bunnell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stephen Brady
Represented By: Mark D Scudder
Represented By: Stephen L Fink
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Undetermined: Daniel Sigler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?