Clifton v. Parkview Health System Inc
Plaintiff: Susan Clifton
Defendant: Parkview Health System Inc
Undetermined: Anthony Stites
Case Number: 1:2018cv00289
Filed: September 14, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Paul R Cherry
Referring Judge: Theresa L Springmann
Nature of Suit: Labor: Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 23, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 23, 2018 Filing 13 TELEPHONIC RULE 16 PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL CONFERENCE held on 10/23/2018 before Magistrate Judge Paul R Cherry. Pla appeared by atty Lori Jansen. Dft appeared by atty Robert Moreland. All dates/ddl in Joint Report at #11 through close of discovery are adopted and incorporated herein. Initial Disclosures to be exchanged by 12/17/2018. Any motion for leave to amend pleadings to be filed by 1/22/2019 by Pla, and 2/22/2019 by Dft. Plaintiff expert witness disclosures and reports to be delivered to the defendant by 3/22/2019. Defendant expert witness disclosures and reports to be delivered to the plaintiff by 4/22/2019. Discovery deadline is 9/27/2019. Expert Discovery deadline is 5/22/2019. Magistrate Consent forms due by 11/13/2018. The summary judgment ddl in FRCP 56 shall not apply. All other dates/ddl to be set by presiding trial judge upon conclusion of discovery. Anthony Stites appointed as mediator. (FTR 1st floor.) (mr)
October 18, 2018 Filing 12 ANSWER to Complaint by Parkview Health System Inc.(Moreland, Robert)
October 17, 2018 Filing 11 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Jansen, Lori)
September 26, 2018 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Jennifer L Hitchcock on behalf of Susan Clifton (Hitchcock, Jennifer)
September 25, 2018 Filing 9 MAGISTRATE JUDGE CONSENT FORMS sent to all parties (Standard Track). (mr)
September 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER & NOTICE OF HEARING: Telephonic Rule 16 Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 10/23/2018 at 9:30 AM in US District Court - Fort Wayne before Magistrate Judge Paul R Cherry. Court to initiate call. Parties' proposed joint discovery plan in accordance with FRCP 26(f) to be filed by 10/17/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Paul R Cherry on 9/25/2018. (mr)
September 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER: Each party and each attorney in this case shall take reasonable steps to preserve electronically stored information (ESI) that is relevant to any claim or defense in this case, whether or not the information is admissible at trial. This requirement relates back to the point in time when the party or attorney reasonably anticipated litigation about these matters. Text entry order. By Magistrate Judge Paul R Cherry on 9/21/2018. (mr)
September 17, 2018 Set/Reset Deadlines: Per #5 Defendant Parkview Health System Inc answer due 10/19/2018. (rmc)
September 17, 2018 Chief Judge Theresa L Springmann and Magistrate Judge Paul R Cherry added. (NEW CASE) (rmc)
September 14, 2018 Filing 5 AGREED NOTICE to extend time to file answer filed by Parkview Health System Inc ; answer due by October 19, 2018. (Moreland, Robert)
September 14, 2018 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Parkview Health System Inc. (Moreland, Robert)
September 14, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE by Parkview Health System Inc of Filing and Service of Notification of Removal (Moreland, Robert)
September 14, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert D Moreland on behalf of Parkview Health System Inc (Moreland, Robert)
September 14, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0755-3679560.) from Allen Superior, Cause No. 02D03-1808-CT-451, filed by Parkview Health System Inc. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Moreland, Robert)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Clifton v. Parkview Health System Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Susan Clifton
Represented By: Christopher C Myers
Represented By: Jennifer L Hitchcock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Parkview Health System Inc
Represented By: Robert D Moreland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Undetermined: Anthony Stites
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?