A. K. v. Toyota Motor Sales, U.S.A., Inc. et al
Plaintiff: A. K.
Defendant: Toyota Motor Corporation and Toyota Motor Sales, U.S.A., Inc.
Case Number: 1:2018cv00371
Filed: November 9, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Paul R Cherry
Referring Judge: William C Lee
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 19, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 11 MINUTE ORDER granting #10 Joint Motion to Hold Case in Abeyance Pending Settlement Discussions, finding good cause shown. The Court ORDERS that this matter is STAYED pending early settlement discussions. The Court VACATES the preliminary pretrial conference set for 12/18/2018. The Court ORDERS the parties to FILE a status report on or before 3/18/2019. Text entry order by Magistrate Judge Paul R Cherry on 11/19/2018. (lns)
November 16, 2018 Filing 10 Joint MOTION Hold Case in Abeyance Pending Settlement Discussions by Defendants Toyota Motor Corporation, Toyota Motor Sales, U.S.A., Inc.. (Hyslop, Chelsea)
November 15, 2018 Filing 9 MAGISTRATE JUDGE CONSENT FORMS sent to all parties (Standard Track). (mr)
November 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER & NOTICE OF HEARING: Rule 16 Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 12/18/2018 at 9:30 AM in US District Court - Fort Wayne before Magistrate Judge Paul R Cherry. Counsel, Plaintiff and Defendant representative to attend. Parties' proposed joint discovery plan in accordance with FRCP 26(f) to be filed by 12/11/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Paul R Cherry on 11/15/2018. (mr)
November 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER: Each party and each attorney in this case shall take reasonable steps to preserve electronically stored information (ESI) that is relevant to any claim or defense in this case, whether or not the information is admissible at trial. This requirement relates back to the point in time when the party or attorney reasonably anticipated litigation about these matters. Text entry order. By Magistrate Judge Paul R Cherry on 11/14/2018. (mr)
November 13, 2018 Judge William C Lee and Magistrate Judge Paul R Cherry added. NEW CASE (kjp)
November 9, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Chelsea Steele Hyslop on behalf of Toyota Motor Corporation, Toyota Motor Sales, U.S.A., Inc. (Hyslop, Chelsea)
November 9, 2018 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Toyota Motor Corporation. (Schiferl, Kevin)
November 9, 2018 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Toyota Motor Sales, U.S.A., Inc.. (Schiferl, Kevin)
November 9, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Kevin C Schiferl on behalf of Toyota Motor Corporation, Toyota Motor Sales, U.S.A., Inc. (Schiferl, Kevin)
November 9, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0755-3730382.) from Whitley Circuit Court, Cause No. 92C01-1809-CT-000331, filed by Toyota Motor Corporation, Toyota Motor Sales, U.S.A., Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court Record, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Schiferl, Kevin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: A. K. v. Toyota Motor Sales, U.S.A., Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: A. K.
Represented By: Fred Schultz
Represented By: Donald H Slavik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Toyota Motor Corporation
Represented By: Chelsea Steele Hyslop
Represented By: Kevin C Schiferl
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Toyota Motor Sales, U.S.A., Inc.
Represented By: Chelsea Steele Hyslop
Represented By: Kevin C Schiferl
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?