United States of America v. Shull et al
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Kenneth D. Shull, CrossRoads Financial Federal Credit Union, Bank of America, National Association, Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC, Bank of America National Association and Portland Forge Employee FCU
Case Number: 1:2019cv00122
Filed: March 26, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Holly A Brady
Referring Judge: Susan L Collins
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1345
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Holly A Brady for all further proceedings. Chief Judge Theresa L Springmann no longer assigned to case. Signed by Chief Judge Theresa L Springmann on 5/01/19. (efc)
April 23, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by United States of America. Bank of America National Association served on 4/4/2019, answer due 4/25/2019. (Leonard - AUSA, Deborah)
April 23, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by United States of America. Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC served on 4/4/2019, answer due 4/25/2019. (Leonard - AUSA, Deborah)
April 23, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by United States of America. Crossroads Financial Federal Credit Union served on 4/5/2019, answer due 4/26/2019. (Leonard - AUSA, Deborah)
March 27, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Bank of America National Association, Crossroads Financial Federal Credit Union, Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC, Kenneth D. Shull. NOTE:The attached document is accessible by court personnel only. Summons forms that were electronically submitted to the court for issuance will be returned to counsel via e-mail. (rmc)
March 27, 2019 Chief Judge Theresa L Springmann and Magistrate Judge Susan L Collins added. (NEW CASE) (rmc)
March 26, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Proposed Summons, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(Leonard - AUSA, Deborah)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Shull et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kenneth D. Shull
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CrossRoads Financial Federal Credit Union
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank of America, National Association
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank of America National Association
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Portland Forge Employee FCU
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Deborah M Leonard - AUSA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?