Spearman v. Rudae's, Inc.
Plaintiff: Breanna Spearman
Defendant: Rudae's, Inc.
Not Yet Classified: C Erik Chickedantz
Case Number: 1:2019cv00148
Filed: April 5, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Holly A Brady
Referring Judge: Susan L Collins
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 28, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 28, 2019 Filing 17 MOTION to Amend/Correct #5 State Court Complaint by Plaintiff Breanna Spearman. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Amended Complaint)(Myers, Christopher)
May 15, 2019 Filing 16 TELEPHONIC RULE 16 PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL CONFERENCE held on 5/15/2019 before Magistrate Judge Susan L Collins. Pla appeared by atty Ilene Smith. Dft appeared by attys James Posey and Joshua Burkhardt. The #14 Report of the Parties Planning Meeting is approved in all respects (except dispositive motion deadlines and trial dates) and is hereby made an ORDER of the Court. The Summary Judgment deadline in Fed.R.Civ.P. 56(b) SHALL NOT control. Any dispositive motion SHALL brief out in accordance with L.R. 56-1. DISCOVERY DEADLINE is 1/31/2020. Following the close of discovery, unless otherwise ordered by the Court, the assigned District Judge will establish all further deadlines and dates. Erik Chickedantz appointed as Mediator. Atty Smith to notify Mediator by letter, copy to Attys Posey and Burkhardt. Results of the Mediation shall be filed with the Court no later than 10 days before the Final Pretrial Conference. Magistrate Consent forms due by 6/5/2019. (FTR 1st floor.) (mr)
May 15, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Ilene M Smith on behalf of Breanna Spearman (Smith, Ilene)
May 8, 2019 Filing 14 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Myers, Christopher)
May 6, 2019 Filing 13 ANSWER to #8 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim by Breanna Spearman.(Myers, Christopher)
May 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Holly A Brady for all further proceedings. Chief Judge Theresa L Springmann no longer assigned to case. Signed by Chief Judge Theresa L Springmann on 5/01/19. (efc)
April 18, 2019 Filing 11 Amended Exhibit "B" re 10 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief, #9 MOTION Unopposed Fed.R.Civ.P.5.2(e(2) Motion to Prohibit Nonparty Remote Electronic Access re #8 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim by Counter Claimant Rudae's, Inc., Defendant Rudae's, Inc.. (Posey, James) Modified on 4/18/2019 (mr).
April 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER for Magistrate Judge Susan Collins: #9 Dft/Counterclaim Pla's Unopposed Motion to Prohibit Nonparties from Gaining Remote Electronic Access to Exhibit "B " to its Counterclaim and for permission to File its "Amended Exhibit B" as a Replacement for Exhibit "B" to its Counterclaim is granted. Dft is ordered to file a redacted version of Exhibit B instanter. Text entry order. (mr) Modified on 4/18/2019 (mr). Modified on 4/19/2019 to correct typo(nae).
April 18, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION Unopposed Fed.R.Civ.P.5.2(e(2) Motion to Prohibit Nonparty Remote Electronic Access re #8 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim by Counter Claimant Rudae's, Inc., Defendant Rudae's, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Posey, James)
April 15, 2019 Filing 8 ANSWER to Complaint , COUNTERCLAIM against Breanna Spearman by Rudae's, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Posey, James)
April 9, 2019 Filing 7 MAGISTRATE JUDGE CONSENT FORMS sent to all parties. (mr)
April 9, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Hearing: Telephonic Rule 16 Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 5/15/2019 at 11:00 AM in US District Court - Fort Wayne before Magistrate Judge Susan L Collins. Court to initiate call.(mr)
April 8, 2019 (NEW CASE) Chief Judge Theresa L Springmann and Magistrate Judge Susan L Collins added. (nae)
April 5, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Joshua Alexander Burkhardt on behalf of Rudae's, Inc. (Burkhardt, Joshua)
April 5, 2019 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Rudae's, Inc.. (Posey, James)
April 5, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by James P Posey on behalf of Rudae's, Inc. (Posey, James)
April 5, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0755-3857283.) from Allen Superior Court, Cause No. 02D02-1903-CT-000145, filed by Rudae's, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Posey, James)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Spearman v. Rudae's, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rudae's, Inc.
Represented By: Joshua Alexander Burkhardt
Represented By: James P Posey
Represented By: Joshua A Burkhardt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Breanna Spearman
Represented By: Christopher C Myers
Represented By: Ilene M Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: C Erik Chickedantz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?