Plumbers & Steamfitters Health and Welfare Fund Trustees of et al v. BMG Mechanical Corp. et al

Plaintiff: Plumbers & Steamfitters Local 166 Health & Welfare Fund, Plumbers & Steamfitters Local 166 Pension Fund, Joint Apprenticeship Training Committee Trust Fund, Plumbers & Steamfitters Local 166 Profit Sharing Annuity Plan, ISPTA/MCAI Drug Program Fund, Local 166 Plumbers & Steamfitters Health and Welfare Fund Trustees of, Local 166 Plumbers & Steamfitters Profit Sharing Annuity Plan and Local 166 Plumbers & Steamfitters Pension Fund
Defendant: BMG Mechanical Corp. and Shermon Gayheart
Case Number: 1:2019cv00157
Filed: April 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Holly A Brady
Referring Judge: Susan L Collins
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 28:1132
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 13, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 13, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by BMG Mechanical Corp.(bas)
May 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Holly A Brady for all further proceedings. Chief Judge Theresa L Springmann no longer assigned to case. Signed by Chief Judge Theresa L Springmann on 5/01/19. (efc)
April 26, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Local 166 Plumbers & Steamfitters Health and Welfare Fund Trustees of, Joint Apprenticeship Training Committee Trust Fund, Local 166 Plumbers & Steamfitters Profit Sharing Annuity Plan, Local 166 Plumbers & Steamfitters Pension Fund, ISPTA/MCAI Drug Program Fund. Shermon Gayheart served on 4/15/2019, answer due 5/6/2019. (Henzi, Matthew)
April 26, 2019 Filing 3 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint on April 15, 2019, filed by Local 166 Plumbers & Steamfitters Health and Welfare Fund Trustees of, Joint Apprenticeship Training Committee Trust Fund, Local 166 Plumbers & Steamfitters Profit Sharing Annuity Plan, Local 166 Plumbers & Steamfitters Pension Fund, ISPTA/MCAI Drug Program Fund., SUMMONS Returned Executed by Local 166 Plumbers & Steamfitters Health and Welfare Fund Trustees of, Joint Apprenticeship Training Committee Trust Fund, Local 166 Plumbers & Steamfitters Profit Sharing Annuity Plan, Local 166 Plumbers & Steamfitters Pension Fund, ISPTA/MCAI Drug Program Fund. BMG Mechanical Corp. served on 4/15/2019, answer due 5/6/2019. (Henzi, Matthew)
April 10, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to BMG Mechanical Corp., Shermon Gayheart. NOTE:The attached document is accessible by court personnel only. Summons forms that were electronically submitted to the court for issuance will be returned to counsel via e-mail. (lns)
April 10, 2019 Chief Judge Theresa L Springmann and Magistrate Judge Susan L Collins added. (NEW CASE) (lns)
April 9, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against BMG Mechanical Corp., Shermon Gayheart( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0755-3859563.), filed by Plumbers & Steamfitters Local 166 Health & Welfare Fund, Joint Apprenticeship Training Committee Trust Fund, Plumbers & Steamfitters Local 166 Profit Sharing Annuity Plan, Plumbers & Steamfitters Local 166 Pension Fund, ISPTA/MCAI Drug Program Fund. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons BMG Mechanical Corp., #3 Proposed Summons Shermon Gayheart)(Henzi, Matthew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Plumbers & Steamfitters Health and Welfare Fund Trustees of et al v. BMG Mechanical Corp. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BMG Mechanical Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shermon Gayheart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Plumbers & Steamfitters Local 166 Health & Welfare Fund
Represented By: Matthew I Henzi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Plumbers & Steamfitters Local 166 Pension Fund
Represented By: Matthew I Henzi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joint Apprenticeship Training Committee Trust Fund
Represented By: Matthew I Henzi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Plumbers & Steamfitters Local 166 Profit Sharing Annuity Plan
Represented By: Matthew I Henzi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ISPTA/MCAI Drug Program Fund
Represented By: Matthew I Henzi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Local 166 Plumbers & Steamfitters Health and Welfare Fund Trustees of
Represented By: Matthew I Henzi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Local 166 Plumbers & Steamfitters Profit Sharing Annuity Plan
Represented By: Matthew I Henzi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Local 166 Plumbers & Steamfitters Pension Fund
Represented By: Matthew I Henzi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?