Neier v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Mitchal D Neier
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security Administration and Commissioner of Social Security
Not Yet Classified: SSA (Court Use Only)
Case Number: 1:2019cv00196
Filed: May 3, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Jon E DeGuilio
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 10, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by USM obo Mitchal D Neier. Commissioner of Social Security and US Attorney's Office served on 5/21/2019 and Attorney General served on 5/20/2019, answer due 7/22/2019. (mrm)
May 7, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Commissioner of Social Security, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. NOTE: The attached document is accessible by court personnel only.(Copy to USM)(mrm)
May 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER GRANTING #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. The payment of the filing fee is WAIVED. The US Marshals Service is DIRECTED to effect service of process on the defendant. Signed by Judge Jon E DeGuilio on 5/7/2019. (mrm)
May 6, 2019 Judge Jon E DeGuilio added. (New Case) (IFP Motion Pending) (sct)
May 3, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by C David Little on behalf of Mitchal D Neier (Little, C)
May 3, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis accompanied by 3 copies of summons forms and 3 copies of USM-285 forms by Plaintiff Mitchal D Neier. (Little, C)
May 3, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR DISABILITY BENEFITS against Commissioner of Social Security Administration, filed by Mitchal D Neier. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons Regional Chief Counsel, #3 Proposed Summons United States Attorney General, #4 Proposed Summons Assistant United States Attorney, #5 Supplement USM-285 Regional Chief Counsel, #6 Supplement USM-285 United States Attorney General, #7 Supplement USM-285 Assistant United States Attorney)(Little, C)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Neier v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mitchal D Neier
Represented By: C David Little
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: SSA (Court Use Only)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?