Tucci v. Ward et al
Plaintiff: Jeffery Tucci
Defendant: Cheif of Police, Jeffrey Todd, Mathen O'Banion, Corey Ward, Reggie Nevels and Mark Spitzer
Case Number: 1:2019cv00217
Filed: May 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Holly A Brady
Referring Judge: Susan L Collins
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 8, 2019 Filing 5 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed as to Jeffrey Tucci on 7/5/2019 re #4 Clerks Judgment, #3 Order Dismissing Case. (ksp)
July 1, 2019 Filing 4 CLERK'S ENTRY OF JUDGMENT. (cc: copy mailed to pro se party via certified mail, receipt no. 7018 0360 0001 4183 8408) (ksp)
July 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER: The Court DISMISSES this case pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915A; WAIVES the initial partial filing fee; ORDERS Plaintiff Jeffery Tucci, IDOC # UNKNOWN, Grant County Jail #23603, to pay (and the facility having custody to automatically remit) to the Clerk 20% of the money received for each calendar month during which $10.00 or more is received, until the $400.00 filing fee is paid in full; DIRECTS the Clerk to create a ledger for receipt of these funds; and DIRECTS the Clerk to send a copy of this Order to each facility where Plaintiff is housed until the filing fee has been paid in full. Signed by Judge Holly A Brady on 7/1/19. (Copy mailed to pro se party via certified mail, receipt no. 7018 0360 0001 4183 8408 and Sheriff, Grant Co. Jail)(ksp)
May 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER re #1 Pro Se Complaint. The Court DIRECTS the clerk to write this cause number on a blank Prisoner Motion to Proceed in Forma Pauperis AO 240 (Rev. 7/10) (INND Rev. 8/16) and send it to Jeffrey Tucci. The Court GRANTS Jeffrey Tucci until 06/21/2019 to either pay the filing fee or file an in forma pauperis motion accompanied by his trust fund ledgers for the past six months and CAUTIONS Jeffrey Tucci that, if he does not respond by the deadline, this case may be dismissed without further notice. Signed by Judge Holly A Brady on 05/21/2019. (Copy mailed as directed in Order) (jat)
May 17, 2019 Filing 1 PRO SE COMPLAINT with 0 copies of summons forms and 0 copies of USM-285 forms and with Jury Demand against Cheif of Police, Reggie Nevels, Mathen O'Banion, Mark Spitzer, Jeffrey Todd, Corey Ward, filed by Jeffery Tucci.(bas)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tucci v. Ward et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cheif of Police
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeffrey Todd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mathen O'Banion
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Corey Ward
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Reggie Nevels
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Spitzer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeffery Tucci
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?