Trewyn v. Commissioner of Social Security

Plaintiff: Catherine L. Trewyn
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Not Yet Classified: SSA (Court Use Only)
Case Number: 1:2019cv00218
Filed: May 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Holly A Brady
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 24, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 24, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by USM obo Catherine L. Trewyn. Commissioner of Social Security and US Attorney served on 6/10/2019, Attorney General served on 6/7/2019, answer due 8/9/2019. (mrm)
June 14, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Sharon Jefferson - AUSA on behalf of Commissioner of Social Security (Jefferson - AUSA, Sharon)
June 14, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Jill S Reeder on behalf of Commissioner of Social Security (Reeder, Jill)
May 21, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Commissioner of Social Security, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. NOTE: The attached document is accessible by court personnel only. (cc: USM) (sct)
May 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER GRANTS the Plaintiff leave to proceed in forma pauperis (ECF #2 ). WAIVES payment of the filing fee. DIRECTS, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(d), the United States Marshals Service to effect service of process on the Defendant. Signed by Judge Holly A Brady on 5/21/2019. (cc: USM) (sct)
May 20, 2019 Judge Holly A Brady added. (New Case) (IFP Motion Pending) (sct)
May 17, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Adriana M de la Torre on behalf of Catherine L. Trewyn (de la Torre, Adriana)
May 17, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis accompanied by 3 copies of summons forms and 3 copies of USM-285 forms by Plaintiff Catherine L. Trewyn. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons, #2 Proposed Summons USM Form 285)(de la Torre, Adriana)
May 17, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security, filed by Catherine L. Trewyn. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons)(de la Torre, Adriana)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Trewyn v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: Jill S Reeder
Represented By: Sharon Jefferson - AUSA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Catherine L. Trewyn
Represented By: Adriana M de la Torre
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: SSA (Court Use Only)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?