Misener v. Brunswick Leisure Boat Company, LLC

Plaintiff: Tanya Misener
Defendant: Brunswick Leisure Boat Company, LLC
Not Yet Classified: Anthony Stites
Case Number: 1:2019cv00220
Filed: May 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Susan L Collins
Referring Judge: William C Lee
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 26, 2019 Filing 14 RULE 16 PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL CONFERENCE held on 6/26/2019 before Magistrate Judge Susan L Collins. Pla appeared with atty Samuel Bolinger. Atty David Vogel and Adrianne Clark appeared on behalf of Dft. The #12 Report of the Parties Planning Meeting is approved in all respects (except dispositive motions deadline and establishment of a trial date) and is hereby made an ORDER of the Court. The Summary Judgment deadline in Fed.R.Civ.P. 56(b) SHALL NOT control. Any dispositive motion SHALL brief out in accordance with L.R. 56-1. DISCOVERY DEADLINE is 1/17/2020. Following the close of discovery, unless otherwise ordered by the Court, the assigned District Judge will establish all further deadlines and dates. Anthony Stites appointed as Mediator. Atty Vogel to notify Mediator by letter, copy to Atty Bolinger. Results of the Mediation shall be filed with the Court no later than 10 days before the Final Pretrial Conference. Magistrate Consent forms due by 7/17/2019. (FTR 1st floor.) (mr)
June 19, 2019 Filing 13 CERTIFICATE - ATTORNEY CERTIFICATION. (Jarrold, Richard)
June 19, 2019 Filing 12 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Jarrold, Richard)
June 18, 2019 Filing 11 CERTIFICATE Attorney - Client. (Bolinger, Samuel)
May 30, 2019 Filing 10 MAGISTRATE JUDGE CONSENT FORMS sent to all parties. (mr)
May 30, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Hearing: Rule 16 Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 6/26/2019 at 10:00 AM in US District Court - Fort Wayne before Magistrate Judge Susan L Collins. Counsel, Plaintiff, and Defendant representative to attend.(mr)
May 24, 2019 Filing 8 ANSWER to Complaint by Brunswick Leisure Boat Company, LLC.(Jarrold, Richard)
May 21, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Richard Evan Jarrold on behalf of Brunswick Leisure Boat Company, LLC (Jarrold, Richard)
May 21, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by David C Vogel on behalf of Brunswick Leisure Boat Company, LLC (Vogel, David)
May 20, 2019 Judge William C Lee and Magistrate Judge Susan L Collins added. (NEW CASE) (jld)
May 17, 2019 Filing 4 AFFIDAVIT re #1 Notice of Removal, (of Service to All Adverse Parties) by Brunswick Leisure Boat Company, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court Petition for Removal, #2 Exhibit B - Federal Court Notice of Removal)(Oxyer, Alexandra)
May 17, 2019 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Brunswick Leisure Boat Company, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Brunswick Corporation for Brunswick Leisure Boat Company, LLC.. (Oxyer, Alexandra)
May 17, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Alexandra S Oxyer on behalf of Brunswick Leisure Boat Company, LLC (Oxyer, Alexandra)
May 17, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0755-3897213.) from Allen Superior Court, Cause No. 02D09-1904-PL-000148, filed by Brunswick Leisure Boat Company, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court Record -, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Oxyer, Alexandra)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Misener v. Brunswick Leisure Boat Company, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tanya Misener
Represented By: Samuel L Bolinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brunswick Leisure Boat Company, LLC
Represented By: Alexandra S Oxyer
Represented By: Richard Evan Jarrold
Represented By: David C Vogel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: Anthony Stites
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?